UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Chicopee Housing Authority, et al.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Chicopee Housing Authority and Executive Director Monica Blazic
Case Number: 3:2021cv10649
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Leung on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Leung, Michelle)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Monica Blazic waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Dorchak, Gregory)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Chicopee Housing Authority waiver sent on 4/22/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Dorchak, Gregory)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. (Dorchak, Gregory)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monica Blazic, Chicopee Housing Authority. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/19/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-10649. (Danieli2, Chris)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Kelly, Danielle)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Dorchak, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Chicopee Housing Authority, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicopee Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director Monica Blazic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gregory J. Dorchak
Represented By: Michelle L. Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?