Validity, Inc. v. Precisely Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Validity, Inc.
Defendant: Precisely Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv10681
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time For Defendant Precisely Holdings, LLC to Respond to Complaint by Validity, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie E. Hartford on behalf of Validity, Inc. (Hartford, Leslie)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Precisely Holdings, LLC to Answer Complaint by Validity, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Validity, Inc.. Precisely Holdings LLC served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Validity, Inc.. (Kravitz, Jason)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Validity, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Zamorski, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Danieli, Chris)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/23/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-10681. (Danieli, Chris)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Kravitz, Jason)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Validity, Inc. (Baker, Casey)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Baker, Casey)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Precisely Holdings LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8741587 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Validity, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, # 7 Local Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement - removed and refiled as separate docket entry, see dkt. no. #3 )(Kravitz, Jason) Modified on 4/23/2021 (Baker, Casey).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Validity, Inc. v. Precisely Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Validity, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. Kravitz
Represented By: Leslie E. Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precisely Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?