Francis et al v. Troy-Bilt LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erin Francis and Camden Francis
Defendant: Troy-Bilt LLC and Briggs & Stratton Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv11385
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 STATE COURT Record. (Larson, Adam)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Erin Francis (Conley, J.)
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document #10 notice (Other). corrected because: Event redockted due to the incorrect event was chosen when initially docketed - see document #11 . (Finn, Mary)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Erin Francis, Troy-Bilt LLC.. (Finn, Mary)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Troy-Bilt LLC Notice of Consent to Proceed (Larson, Adam)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Troy-Bilt LLC.(Larson, Adam)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Conley, J.)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 8/24/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-11385. (Danieli, Chris)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Troy-Bilt LLC.(Larson, Adam)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Dore, Samantha)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Troy-Bilt LLC. (Larson, Adam)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Larson on behalf of Troy-Bilt LLC (Larson, Adam)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Troy-Bilt LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8916770 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-LF Counsel for the Plan Admin to Pltf's Counsel, #5 Exhibit C--State Court Removal)(Larson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis et al v. Troy-Bilt LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Francis
Represented By: Francis W. Bloom
Represented By: J. Michael Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camden Francis
Represented By: Francis W. Bloom
Represented By: J. Michael Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy-Bilt LLC
Represented By: Adam A. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Stratton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?