Malanowski v. WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1
Plaintiff: Ruth Magdalena Malanowski
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1
Case Number: 3:2021cv11628
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED: A Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2021 at 2:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Springfield before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 12/22/2021. See attached Notice for complete details. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Rivera, Melissa)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 Letter/request (non-motion) from Ruth Magdalena Malanowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, Category Sheet & State Court docket sheet) (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Lake, Hale)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). (Healy, Bethaney)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1 identifying Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1.. (Lake, Hale)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Petition) by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1.(Lake, Hale)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ruth Magdalena Malanowski. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/25/2021 to include entire document) (Figueroa, Tamara).
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Remark: Certified Notice of Removal emailed to Defendants counsel for service on the state court in order to obtain the certified state court record. (Figueroa, Tamara)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie M. Grandoit on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1 (Grandoit, Marie)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield). (Jones, Sherry)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1 ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-8994674 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Lake, Hale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malanowski v. WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Magdalena Malanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. TRUSTEE OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION TRUST 2005-1 ASSET-BACKED-CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-1
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Represented By: Marie M. Grandoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?