Cooley v. Southwest Airlines Company
Plaintiff: Jessie Cooley
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv30001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER OF SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Southwest Airlines Company.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John J. Gagliano. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered granting #11 Defendant's Assented-to Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing a Responsive Pleading. Defendant's responsive pleading is now due on or before 2/24/2021. (Zamorski, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily D. Amrhein on behalf of Southwest Airlines Company (Amrhein, Emily)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 24, 2021 to File a Responsive Pleading ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR FILING A RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Southwest Airlines Company.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwest Airlines Company. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Southwest Airlines Company (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John J. Gagliano Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8596752 by Jessie Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Low, Terrence)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jessie Cooley served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Low, Terrence)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Southwest Airlines Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #2 Complaint, by Jessie Cooley. (Low, Terrence)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Remark - Counsel filed the complaint twice in order to pay the filing fee and add the cover sheet - see doc. 02 . (Finn, Mary)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines Company filed. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8576298 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jessie Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Low, Terrence) Modified on 1/5/2021 (Finn, Mary).
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines Company filed by Jessie Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Low, Terrence) Modified on 1/5/2021 (Finn, Mary).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Southwest Airlines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Cooley
Represented By: Terrence A. Low
Represented By: John J. Gagliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Company
Represented By: Emily D. Amrhein
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?