Sifton v. North Adams, City of et al
Plaintiff: Richard F Sifton
Defendant: North Adams, Berkshire County, North Adams, City of, Kevin Fitzpatrick, Trevor Manning and Ivan Cardeno
Case Number: 3:2021cv30057
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER FROM THE BERKSHIRE COUNTY SHERIFF'S RE: Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement of Richard F. Sifton. They received the notice from the Clerk's Office dated 6/9/2021. Mr. Sifton was released from our custody at the end of his sentence on June 11, 2021 and all proceeds from his inmate account were paid to him at that time. (Finn, Mary)
June 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE re Payment of Fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at Berkshire County House of Correction. (Rivera, Melissa)
June 9, 2021 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #5 Motion for service by regular mail. "There is no absolute constitutional right to a free lawyer in a civil case[,]" DesRosiers v. Moran, 949 F.2d 15, 23 (1st Cir. 1991), and under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1), and plaintiff fails to show exceptional circumstances which, along with indigency, must be demonstrated for appointment of counsel. Id.; accord Cookish v. Cunningham, 787 F.2d 1, 2 (1st Cir. 1986). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), the Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $26.00. The remainder of the fee, $324.00, shall be collected in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk shall issue a Notice for Payment of Prisoner Filing Fee to the Berkshire County House of Correction. (Rivera, Melissa)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni no longer assigned to the case. (Healy, Bethaney)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ivan Cardeno, Kevin Fitzpatrick, Trevor Manning, North Adams, City of.. (Lawless, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ivan Cardeno, Kevin Fitzpatrick, Trevor Manning, North Adams, City of.(Lawless, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor Manning. Trevor Manning waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Lawless, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Fitzpatrick. Kevin Fitzpatrick waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Lawless, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ivan Cardeno. Ivan Cardeno waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Lawless, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by North Adams, City of. North Adams, City of waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Lawless, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Lawless on behalf of Ivan Cardeno, Kevin Fitzpatrick, Trevor Manning, North Adams, City of (Lawless, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson Referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). Motions referred: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Further information: this case is referred to Magistriate Judge Katherine A. Robertson for motion to proceed IFP (Lindsay, Maurice) Motions referred to Katherine A. Robertson.
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for service by regular mail by Richard F Sifton.(Castilla, Francis)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Richard F Sifton (Castilla, Francis)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard F Sifton.(Castilla, Francis)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Richard F Sifton.(Castilla, Francis)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard F Sifton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 1)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sifton v. North Adams, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Adams, Berkshire County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Adams, City of
Represented By: David S. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David S. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Manning
Represented By: David S. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Cardeno
Represented By: David S. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F Sifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?