Marceau et al v. Bear Mountain Staffing Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Marceau and Colleen Smith
Defendant: Bear Mountain Staffing, Bear Mountain Healthcare LLC, Bear Mountain Management Company LLC and Bear Mountain Staffing Solutions
Case Number: 3:2021cv30095
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Referring Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Kristen Marceau, Colleen Smith. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Kristen Marceau, Colleen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service to Bear Mountain Management Company LLC, #2 Affidavit of Service to Bear Mountain Healthcare LLC)(Lizana, Arnold)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Case referred for Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). (Healy, Bethaney)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bear Mountain Healthcare LLC, Bear Mountain Management Company LLC, Bear Mountain Staffing Solutions. (Tully, Guy)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bear Mountain Healthcare LLC, Bear Mountain Management Company LLC, Bear Mountain Staffing Solutions.(Tully, Guy)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristen Marceau, Colleen Smith Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8952561 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kristen Marceau, Colleen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lizana, Arnold) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2021: #2 Category Sheet) (Figueroa, Tamara).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marceau et al v. Bear Mountain Staffing Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Marceau
Represented By: Arnold J. Lizana, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Smith
Represented By: Arnold J. Lizana, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Mountain Staffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Mountain Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Guy P. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Mountain Management Company LLC
Represented By: Guy P. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Mountain Staffing Solutions
Represented By: Guy P. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?