Lavalley v. Natrol, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Lavalley and David Barnard
Defendant: Natrol, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv30104
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed As Of Right against Natrol, LLC, filed by Jessica Lavalley, David Barnard.(Zelman, Yitzchak)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Zelman, Yitzchak)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Leventhal on behalf of Natrol, LLC (Leventhal, Jonathan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Natrol, LLC. (Scarborough, Lawrence)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Class Allegations Under FRCP 23(d)(1)(D) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Class Allegations Under FRCP 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Natrol, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scarborough, Lawrence)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Class Allegations Under FRCP 23(d)(1)(D), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, In the Alternative, Motion to Strike Class Allegations Under FRCP 23(d)(1)(D) ( Responses due by 11/23/2021) by Natrol, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Lawrence)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan D. Leventhal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Finn, Mary)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan D. Leventhal Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9047040 by Natrol, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jonathan D. Leventhal)(Scarborough, Lawrence)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Scarborough on behalf of Natrol, LLC (Scarborough, Lawrence)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Natrol, LLC served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Yitzchak Zelman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney.. (Finn, Mary)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9002580 by Jessica Lavalley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Crick, Kevin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice ey. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Healy, Bethaney)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Natrol, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-8997081 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jessica Lavalley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Crick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavalley v. Natrol, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lavalley
Represented By: Kevin V.K. Crick
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Barnard
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natrol, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Leventhal
Represented By: Lawrence G. Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?