Warner v. Warner
Plaintiff: Philip E Warner
Defendant: Barbara J Warner
Case Number: 3:2022cv10865
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Appearance by Barbara J Warner filed. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by Barbara J Warner re #10 Letter/request (non-motion) re: papers from Sarpy County, Nebraska Court Case - PR 15-277 and this case. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 Letter/request (non-motion) from Barbara Jo Warner re: Litigation pending in the Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska. (Finn, Mary)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed on or before the close of business on August 10, 2022. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at #www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Rivera, Melissa)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/31/2022 at 3:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Springfield before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 8/14/2022. See attached Notice for complete details. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Rivera, Melissa)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Barbara J Warner, Pro Se filed.(Finn, Mary)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Barbara J Warner. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Philip E Warner.(Hoffman, Devin)
June 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
June 23, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 6/6/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-10865. (Danieli, Chris)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (McManus, Caetlin)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philip E Warner Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number CMADC-9352798 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Philip E Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip E Warner
Represented By: Devin L. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?