COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS v. Joseph Freedman Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Defendant: Joseph Freedman Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv30047
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. CONSENT DECREE and FINAL JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Rivera, Melissa)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree. (Rivera, Melissa)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Decree, #2 Exhibit Letter from the US)(Mitchell, Emily)
May 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee D. Hoffman on behalf of Joseph Freedman Co., Inc. (Hoffman, Lee)
May 12, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lee D. Hoffman.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Finn, Mary)
May 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lee D. Hoffman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9319892 by Joseph Freedman Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Carannante, Megan)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M. Carannante on behalf of Joseph Freedman Co., Inc. (Carannante, Megan)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, Joseph Freedman Co., Inc. = see doc. 06 for consent form). (Finn, Mary)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document 05 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge corrected because: Form signed in both places - consenting to jurisdiction and refusing consent to jurisdiction - see doc. #6 for the correct consent form consenting to jurisdiction before a US Magistrate Judge. (Finn, Mary)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Mitchell, Emily)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Mitchell, Emily)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joseph Freedman Co., Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service.. (Finn, Mary)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS of Commencement of 45 Days (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree)(Mitchell, Emily)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Freedman Co., Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9280212 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form)(Mitchell, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS v. Joseph Freedman Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Emily K. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Freedman Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lee D. Hoffman
Represented By: Megan M. Carannante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?