I.N.S.A., Inc. v. Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: I.N.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC, Cultiva Systems, LLC, Addison HVAC, LLC, Mueller Refrigeration Products Company and Growroom Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv30140
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court(Zamorski, Michael)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Electronic order entered re: [6} Response to Order to Show Cause. As Defendant Hensor Engineering Associates, PLLC (the removing party) acknowledges, this court lacks subject matter jurisdiction because "the citizenship of [Plaintiff] is the same as the citizenship of one of the defending limited liability company's members." (Dkt. No. 6 at 2.) Accordingly, this action shall be remanded back to state court. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) ("If at any time before final judgment it appears that the district court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the case shall be remanded.").(Zamorski, Michael)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC. (Mattie, Matthew)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/22/2022. (Figueroa, Tamara)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC. (Mattie, Matthew)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC. (Mattie, Matthew)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9573595 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Mattie, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.N.S.A., Inc. v. Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.N.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Zuckerman
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Michael McAndrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hesnor Engineering Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Mattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cultiva Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison HVAC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Refrigeration Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growroom Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?