In Re: Telexfree Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: UKACHI OKEHIE, Stanley Onyeabo, Paulo Eduardo Ferrari, Ngozi Wakama, EMEKA NWOKORO, John Nkata, Chinedu Chidebe, CHIMA IRECHUKWU, Edivaldo Reis, Ojebe Ifegwu, ALICE MBUTHIA, Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes, JOHN KALU, UCHECHUCKWU OKAM, FESTO KYANDA, Bose Ndukwe, Samuel Elekwachi, Okoji Ndukwe, Hannah Ngugi, Liaison Counsel, Waldermara Martin, Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee, Maduako C Ferguson, Sr., Bernadette Igboanugo, Rita Dos Santos, Joseph Shikhman, Samuel E. Griffith, ANTHONIA A. OCHIJE, Todd Cook, EBERECHUKWU NWOBODO, LISA PATTON, Christopher McCormick, Plaintiffs, DLI Inc, Anthony Cellucci, Esam Abdelgadir, Felicia Guevara, EZINNE P. ONYEGBULE, Rafaela Serrano, Nmah Abbah, Ana P Oliveira, LUCKY IMAFIDON, Kingsley Igboanugo, Ihuoma Igboanugo, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Reverend Jeremiah Githere, RUBY G. WALKER, Veronica Saccoh, Suru Iyesi, Uduka Okoafor, Jamilly Lake, Violet Smart, Leandro Valentim, Celio Da Silva, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Orineia Silva, Rubens Bourguignon and Igor Shikhman
Defendant: Doe Payment Processing Services, Babener & Associates, Doe Inside Promoters, John F. Merrill, Doe Licensed Professionals, Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, John Yurick, Bank Card Consultants, Inc., Richard W Waak, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Jason Borromei, Waddell & Reed Financial, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Jeffrey A Babener, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Steven M. Labriola, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, John Kirchhefer, Doe Banks, Telexfree Financial, Inc., Scott Miller, Synovus Financial Corporation, Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, Synovus Bank, Samuel C Kauffman, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, TD Bank NA, Brian Bonfiglio, Ann Genet, Wells Fargo & Company, Randy N. Crosby, Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Garvey Schubert Barer, P.C., Doe Top Level Promoters, Base Commerce, LLC, PNC Bank, N.A., Middlesex Savings Bank, Sara P Sandford, James M. Merrill, Gerald P. Nehra, Allied Wallet, Ltd., The Sheffield Group, Inc., Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, Andreia B Moreira, Paralegal Doe, Merrill F. John, Faith R. Sloan, Doe Payment Processors, Katia B. Wanzeler, Credit Processors Doe, Carlos D. Costa, Propay, Inc., Santiago De La Rosa, Opt3 Solutions, Inc., Daniil Shoyfer, Mauricio Cardenas, Telex Mobile Holdings, Inc., Telexfree, Inc., Jason Doolittle, Telexfree, LLC, International Payout Systems, Inc., Waddell & Reed, Inc., Gary P Tober, Bank of America Corporation, Dustin Sparman, Alexander Sidel, John Hughes, TelexElectric, LLLP, TD Bank, Doe Professional Services Providers, Doe Investment Services Providers, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC, Vantage Payments, LLC, Robert Weaver, Carlos N. Wanzeler, Joseph H. Craft, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., FMR LLC, WWW Global Business, Inc., RSB Citizens, N.A., Fidelity Investments, Common Cents Communications, Fidelity Bank, Joe H. Craft, Thomas A Wells, Gregg Rodgers, Patrick C Conti, Richard Colabella, Ryan James Mitchell, Garvin L DeShazer, Moe Diab, Kenneth Lind, Telecom Logic, LLC, Carlos Roberto Costa, Jayme Amirrie, Kathryn Coffin, Top Level Promoter, AlliedWallet d/b/a Allied Wallet, Davene Peruzzini, Ahmad Khawaja, Priority Payout, Corp., Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, Jerry Puzey, Amy Rountree, Garvey Schubert Barer, Patrick J Conti, AlliedWallet, Inc., Richard W Waak individually doing business as Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Propay, Inc. doing business as Propay.com, Gerald P. Nehra individually doing business as Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Common Cents Communications, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC doing business as Phoenix Payments and AlliedWallet, Inc. doing business as Allied Wallet
Petitioner: Lee M. Pollack
Interested Party: Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee, United States of America, Kevin Staten, Michael Montalvo and Banc of America Merchant Services
In Re: Telexfree Securities Litigation and Robert J. Bonsignore
Intervenor: Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014md02566
Filed: October 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 1083 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2020 re #983 MOTION to Amend Complaint, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court continues hearing, ( Motion Hearing continued to 10/7/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman), (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1082 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Sinnott on behalf of Plaintiffs (Sinnott, William)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1081 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting TELEPHONE Hearing on Motion #1055 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Fidelity Co-Operative Bank and John Merrill : TELEPHONE Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1080 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #965 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs. (Sinnott, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1079 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Hatfield, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1078 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1073 Motion for Joinder. (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1077 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1064 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and granting #1072 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the documents for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1076 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting TIME OF TELEPHONE Hearing on Motion #983 MOTION to Amend: Telephone Motion Hearing time reset for 9/22/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Call in number remains the same. (Castles, Martin)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1075 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1074 MOTION to Strike #1065 Reply to Response to Motion, #1066 Declaration, filed by Jeffrey A Babener. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1074 MOTION to Strike #1065 Reply to Response to Motion, #1066 Declaration, by Jeffrey A Babener.(O'Donnell, Jordan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1073 NOTICE by Mauricio Cardenas re #1072 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Notice - Joinder (Chaffin, David) Modified on 8/24/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1072 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Sur-Reply in Oppn to Motion for Leave to Amend)(Hatfield, Christopher)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1071 REPLY to Response to #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend (Reply to GPG Opposition) filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wall, Alexander)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1070 DECLARATION re #1069 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum to PNC Bank's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend by Anthony Cellucci, Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore)(Bonsignore, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1069 REPLY to Response to #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum to PNC Bank's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Anthony Cellucci, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1068 DECLARATION re #1067 Reply to Response to Motion Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore in Support of Omnibus Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Anthony Cellucci, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1067 REPLY to Response to #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend Omnibus Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Anthony Cellucci, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1066 DECLARATION re #1065 Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend (Reply to Babener Opposition) by Anthony Cellucci, Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-22 to Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1065 REPLY to Response to #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend Plaintiffs' Response to the Opposition of the Estate of Jeffrey A. Babener to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Anthony Cellucci, Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1064 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC's Second Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 965) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinnott, William)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1063 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1062 Transcript of Hearing Re: Settlement Approval held on July 22, 2020, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 8/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1061 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #1039 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting #1042 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Castles, Martin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1060 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS JOSEPH CRAFT AND CRAFT FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS, INC.(Castles, Martin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1059 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTSBASE COMMERCE, LLC, SYNOVUS BANK, JOHN HUGHES, BRIAN BONFIGLIO,JOHN KIRCHHEFER, AND ALEX SIDEL.(Castles, Martin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1058 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting #1040 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. (Castles, Martin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1057 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting #1040 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. (Castles, Martin) (Castles, Martin).
July 24, 2020 Filing 1056 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1055 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Fidelity Co-Operative Bank and John Merrill filed by Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore, #3 Attachment 2 - Declaration of Eric Schachter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Eric Schachter, #5 Attachment 3 - Proposed Class Notice, #6 Attachment 4 - General Biography of Jed D. Melnick, Esq., JAMS Mediator and Arbitrator)(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1055 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Fidelity Co-Operative Bank and John Merrill by Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Order Preliminarily Approving Settlements with Defendants Fidelity Co-Operative Bank and John Merrill)(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1054 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1051 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1053 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Hearing re Settlement Approval held on 7/22/2020, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for Final Approval of Settlement, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #1040 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1052 RESPONSE to Motion re #1040 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Propay, Inc.. (Chally, Jonathan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1051 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Memorandum In Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, John Merrill and Related Individuals and Entities by Igor Shikhman.(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1050 Proposed Document(s) re #1040 submitted . Document received: Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Base Synovus Settlement and Exhibits, Proposed Judgment Dismissing Base Synovus Defendants and Exhibits, Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Craft Settlement and Exhibits, Proposed Judgment Dismissing Craft Defendants and Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment Dismissing Base Synovus Defendants and Exhibits 1 & 2, #2 Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Craft Settlement and Exhibits 1 & 2, #3 Proposed Judgment Dismissing Craft Defendants and Exhibits 1 & 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 7/16/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
July 13, 2020 Filing 1049 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #983 MOTION to Amend Complaint: Motion Hearing reset for 9/22/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1048 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #1045 Motion for Leave to File Reply Briefs and to Re-schedule Oral Argument. (Castles, Martin)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1047 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander R. Zwillinger on behalf of Banc of America Merchant Services (Zwillinger, Alexander)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1046 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony B. Fioravanti on behalf of Banc of America Merchant Services (Fioravanti, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1045 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Briefs and to Re-schedule Oral Argument by Plaintiffs.(Sinnott, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1044 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay M. Burke on behalf of Banc of America Merchant Services (Burke, Lindsay)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1043 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1042 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Reimbursement of Attorneys Expenses Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reimbursement of Attorneys Expenses filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Bonsignore Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Class Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Common Expenses Chart)(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1042 MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Reimbursement of Attorneys Expenses by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1041 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1040 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Schacter Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Objections, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Exclusion Report, #5 Attachment B - Bonsignore Declaration)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
July 8, 2020 Filing 1040 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1039 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Disregard - Exhibit 1, #2 Disregard - Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order #4 Disregard - duplicate of attachment 3)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
July 8, 2020 Filing 1038 Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore in Support of #1040 Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Partie by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Disregard see docket entry #1040, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Affidavit of Eric A. Schachter)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 7/9/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
July 7, 2020 Filing 1037 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to Fidelity Bank Defendants and Notice of Settlement by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John.(Roffman, Ian)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1036 AFFIDAVIT of James C. Huber in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Batson, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1035 AFFIDAVIT of Jayme Amirie in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Batson, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1034 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Batson, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1033 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by International Payout Systems, Inc.. (Van Leeuwen, Diana)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1032 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe. (Long, Danielle)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1031 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Dustin Sparman, Vantage Payments, LLC. (Westfall, Richard)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1030 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend (The Dismissed Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend) filed by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, Jarrod)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1029 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John. (Toomey, Joseph)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1028 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Michael J. Pineault (as counsel for John Merrill) (Pineault, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1027 Cross MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service and Violation of Rule 15.1 by Mauricio Cardenas.(Chaffin, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1026 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend and in Support of #1027 Cross-Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service and Violation of Rule 15.1 filed by Mauricio Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mauricio Cardenas, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David B. Chaffin With Exhibit)(Chaffin, David) Modified on 7/6/2020 (Jones, Sherry).
July 2, 2020 Filing 1025 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B Hermanson on behalf of Mauricio Cardenas (Hermanson, Eric)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1024 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Propay, Inc.. (Chally, Jonathan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1023 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Victoria Fuller on behalf of Mauricio Cardenas (Fuller, R.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1022 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Chaffin on behalf of Mauricio Cardenas (Chaffin, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1021 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatfield, Christopher)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1020 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1019 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Michael Montalvo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Montalvo with Exhibit, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David B. Chaffin with Exhibit)(Chaffin, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1018 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B Hermanson on behalf of Michael Montalvo (Hermanson, Eric)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1017 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Victoria Fuller on behalf of Michael Montalvo (Fuller, R.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1016 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Chaffin on behalf of Michael Montalvo (Chaffin, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1015 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew J. Connolly (Connolly, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1014 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie A. Conroy on behalf of Kathryn Coffin (Conroy, Melanie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1013 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Kathryn Coffin. (Vesely, Liam)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1012 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam J. Vesely on behalf of Kathryn Coffin (Vesely, Liam)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1011 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Kevin Staten. (Downey, Alicia)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1010 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia L. Downey on behalf of Kevin Staten (Downey, Alicia)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1009 DECLARATION re #1008 Opposition to Motion To Amend Complaint by Banc of America Merchant Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Burke, Lindsay)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1008 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Banc of America Merchant Services. (Burke, Lindsay)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1007 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Richard Colabella, Jerry Puzey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 5/18/2020 Bonsignore Letter, #2 Exhibit B, 5/29/2020 Sinnott Letter, #3 Exhibit C, 12/18/2019 Balassa Letter, #4 Exhibit D, 5/13/2020 Balassa Letter, #5 Exhibit E, 6/9/2020 Balassa Letter, #6 Exhibit F, 7/23/14 Babener Letter, #7 Exhibit G, 12/02/19 Craft Resp. to Wells Fargo RFPs, #8 Exhibit H, 5/12/20 Trustee Email, #9 Exhibit I, 1/23/18 Bonsignore Email, #10 Exhibit J, 3/27/19 Craft Affidavit)(O'Connor, Paul)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1006 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul P. O'Connor on behalf of Richard Colabella, Jerry Puzey (O'Connor, Paul)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1005 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabor Balassa on behalf of Richard Colabella, Jerry Puzey (Balassa, Gabor)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1004 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Steiner, David)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1003 Opposition re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Jeffrey A Babener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Donnell, Jordan)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1002 REPLY to Response to #965 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1001 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #996 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #999 Motion for Leave to File Document; and granting #1000 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the documents for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1000 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc..(Huber, James)
June 12, 2020 Filing 999 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of its Second Motion to Compel by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Fuller, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 998 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 12, 2020 Filing 997 Transcript of Show Cause Hearing held on March 18, 2020, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 9, 2020 Filing 996 MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Twenty Pages (Unopposed Motion of the Estate of Jeffrey A. Babener) by Jeffrey A Babener.(O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 995 Opposition re #965 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs. (Sinnott, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 994 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 is hereby canceled. (Castles, Martin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 993 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Telephone Hearing on Motion #983 MOTION to Amend complaint: Telephone Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 992 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #990 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #983 MOTION to Amend and granting #991 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #983 MOTION to Amend. Responses from all parties due by 7/2/2020. (Castles, Martin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 991 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend (Corrected) by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatfield, Christopher)
May 21, 2020 Filing 990 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatfield, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 989 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #987 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Priya Roy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
May 20, 2020 Filing 988 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #986 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David L. Axelrod. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
May 19, 2020 Filing 987 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Priya Roy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8247782 by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Priya Roy)(Hatfield, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 986 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David L. Axelrod Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8247752 by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David L. Axelrod)(Hatfield, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 985 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC re 982 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #965 Second MOTION to Compel [SUBMISSION OF WELLS FARGO ADVISORS, LLC OF EXHIBIT K IN SUPPORT OF SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Filing by the Bankruptcy Trustee for Telexfree)(Fuller, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Filing 984 MEMORANDUM in Support re #983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Newly Discovered Evidence in 5th CAC as to Dismissed Defendants and Related Individual Proposed New Defendants, #2 Exhibit Newly Discovered Evidence in 5th CAC as to Other Proposed New Defendants, #3 Exhibit Sampling of Newly Discovered Evidence in 5th CAC as to Select Current Defendants, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore, executed on April 30, 2020, #5 Affidavit of Joseph. H. Craft Executed April 30, 2020, #6 Affidavit of Joseph H. Craft Executed January 22, 2020, #7 Affidavit of John Hughes executed February 23, 2019)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Filing 983 MOTION to Amend Motion to Amend by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Filing 982 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #977 Motion for leave to file. (Castles, Martin)
May 18, 2020 Filing 981 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Hatfield on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. (Hatfield, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Filing 980 CERTIFICATE of Compliance pursuant to Local Rule 15.1(b) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 15.1(b) by Rita Dos Santos. (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 979 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit and Memorandum of Reasons by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, #2 Attachment A Proposed Fifth Consolidated Amended complaint, #3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Leave to Amend, #4 Newly Discovered Evidence in 5th CAC as to Dismissed Defendants and Related Proposed New Defendants, #5 Exhibit 2: Newly Discovered Evidence in 5th CAC as to Other Proposed New Defendants, #6 Exhibit 3: Newly Discovered Evidence in 5th CAC as to Select Current Defendants, #7 Exhibit 4: Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore, executed on April 30, 2020)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 978 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit and Memorandum of Reasons by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 13, 2020 Filing 977 MOTION To Submit Supplemental Exhibit in Support of Second Motion to Compel (No Objection by Plaintiffs) re #965 Second MOTION to Compel by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Filing by Bankruptcy Trustee for Telexfree)(Fuller, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 976 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 12, 2020 Filing 975 Transcript of Telephonic Motion Hearing held on April 28, 2020, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 6/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 5, 2020 Filing 974 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #973 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #965 Second MOTION to Compel . Response due by 5/26/2020. (Castles, Martin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 973 MOTION for Extension of Time /Date of Plaintiffs' Response to [DOC 965] Second Motion to Compel of Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC and Memorandum of Reasons by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinnott, William) Modified on 5/5/2020 (Castles, Martin).
April 29, 2020 Filing 972 NOTICE to counsel for the plaintiffs. Please provide the Court with a courtesy copy of the proposed Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint. Counsel may email it to the Courtroom Clerk. (Castles, Martin)
April 28, 2020 Filing 971 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2020 re #941 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #941 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
April 28, 2020 Filing 970 NOTICE to counsel. Please email the court reporter,(justicehill@aol.com) your appearance if you are planning to attended the telephone motion hearing this afternoon. The call in number is 888-675-2535 - access code 9932461. Thank you. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 4/28/2020 (Castles, Martin).
April 27, 2020 Filing 969 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING THE STATUS CONFERENCE ONLY. The telephone Status Conference set for April 28, 2020 is continued to June 17, 2020 at 2:00PM. THE TELEPHONE MOTION HEARING WILL REMAIN SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 28, 2020. At that Status Conference the Court intends to address whether to lift the moratorium on discovery entered on March 25, 2020 (document #934) and to set a date for the completion of "paper" discovery (Fed. R. Civ. P. 33, 34, and 36) for all parties except any Defendants which may be added. To the extent that any party wishes to place an item on the agenda for the Status Conference they are to confer and propose any agenda items in advance of that date. Status Conference reset for 6/17/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
April 21, 2020 Filing 968 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 21, 2020 Filing 967 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on March 18, 2020, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 5/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 21, 2020 Filing 966 MEMORANDUM in Support re #965 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
April 21, 2020 Filing 965 Second MOTION to Compel by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Fuller, Robert)
April 20, 2020 Filing 964 Opposition re #941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A., TD Bank NA. (McChesney, S.)
April 20, 2020 Filing 963 RESPONSE to Motion re #941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment filed by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Balassa, Gabor)
April 17, 2020 Filing 962 NOTICE to Counsel and Parties. The status conference and motion hearing scheduled for 4/28/20 will be held by telephone. The call in number is 888-675-2535 - access code 9932461. (Castles, Martin)
April 14, 2020 Filing 961 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #957 Motion for Extension of Time to file a motion for leave to file a further (5th) Amended Complaint. (Castles, Martin)
April 14, 2020 Filing 960 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #956 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin)
April 14, 2020 Filing 959 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #958 Motion for Extension of Time to April 27, 2020 to Respond to Jurisdictional Discovery. (Castles, Martin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 958 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2020 to Respond to Jurisdictional Discovery by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc..(Huber, James)
April 12, 2020 Filing 957 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Filing Date of Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking Leave to File and Memorandum of Reasons by Plaintiffs.(Sinnott, William)
April 10, 2020 Filing 956 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (unopposed) by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Van Leeuwen, Diana)
April 10, 2020 Filing 955 RESPONSE to Motion re #941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Propay, Inc.. (Chally, Jonathan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 954 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #951 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ernest Warren, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2020 Filing 953 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entry 952 corrected because: document is a proposed order. Counsel please note proposed orders should be attached to the Motion. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 9, 2020 Filing 952 Proposed Order re #951 Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ernest Warren, Jr., on Behalf of All Plaintiffs by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 4/10/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
April 9, 2020 Filing 951 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ernest Warren, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8190313 by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ernest Warren, Jr., in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 9, 2020 Filing 950 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Castles, Martin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 949 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 948 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT entered. (Castles, Martin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 947 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #943 Motion for Clarification. The Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of March 2, 2020 Amended Order is granted as follows: Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to file a further (5th)Amended Complaint. Said motion shall be filed on or before April 30, 2020 and shall comply with the Local Rules of this court. (Castles, Martin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 946 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #945 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #941 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Responses due by 4/20/2020. (Castles, Martin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 945 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Certain Defendants' Assented to Motion for Extension of Time by TD Bank NA.(Shaw, Jarrod)
April 3, 2020 Filing 944 MEMORANDUM in Support re #943 MOTION for Clarification Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification of March 2, 2020 Amended Order filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 3, 2020 Filing 943 MOTION for Clarification Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification of March 2, 2020 Amended Order by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 27, 2020 Filing 942 MEMORANDUM in Support re #941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 27, 2020 Filing 941 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 26, 2020 Filing 940 Objection to #939 Proposed Document(s) submitted, by Propay, Inc. . (Chally, Jonathan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 939 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Rita Dos Santos. Document received: Order Preliminary Approving Settlements With Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank, and Certain Related Parties, Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Scheduling Hearing on Fairness of Settlement Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 23(e). (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 26, 2020 Filing 938 NOTICE by Rita Dos Santos Plaintiffs Notice of Compliance with Court Order (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 25, 2020 Filing 937 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #931 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Payout Systems, Inc. answer due 4/21/2020. (Castles, Martin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 936 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #934 Motion stay deadlines. (Castles, Martin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 935 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #933 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin)
March 24, 2020 Filing 934 MOTION for Temporary Relief of Deadlines Due to Public Health Emergency, Pending This Court's Next Status Conference (Unopposed) by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, John F. Merrill.(Roffman, Ian)
March 24, 2020 Filing 933 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint (by Deceased Defendant Jeffrey A. Babener) by Jeffrey A Babener.(Schneiderman, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 932 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #335 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #335 Motion to Stay; finding as moot #336 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #336 Motion to Stay (Jones, Sherry)
March 20, 2020 Filing 931 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/21/2020 to File Answer Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint (unopposed) by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Van Leeuwen, Diana)
March 20, 2020 Filing 930 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Jeffrey A. Babener by Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates. (Schneiderman, Andrew)
March 19, 2020 Filing 929 ANSWER to #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank.(Roffman, Ian)
March 19, 2020 Filing 928 ANSWER to #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, (Defendant John F. Merrill's Answer to Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint) by John F. Merrill.(Pineault, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 927 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/28/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 926 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. After hearing on this courts Order for Attorney Bonsignore to Show Cause why he should not be removed as Plaintiffs Interim Lead Counsel (Docket #897), and after review of the filings on behalf of Attorney Bonsignore, this court will, for the time being, allow Attorney Bonsignore to continue as Plaintiffs Interim Lead Counsel. Attorney Bonsignore is cautioned that any further transgressions, including rules violations will be dealt with summarily. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 925 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Final Approval Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 924 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties by Telexfree Securities Litigation. "The Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC., Synovus Bank, and Certain Related Parties (Document #762) is granted subject to the following additions to the Proposed Order (Document #763-4). The Plaintiffs shall add the language referenced at the top of page 2 of the Responding Defendants Response to Plaintfiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements (Document #774) to the Order. The Plaintiffs shall add Stephen Darr, as Trustee of the Estates of Telexfree, LLC., and Telexfree Financial, Inc., as persons to whom notice should be given, including those to whom notice should be given under paragraph 9 of the Proposed Order. The Final Approval Hearing shall take place on July 22, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 2 Worcester. Any other papers, or applications for attorneys fees and expenses shall be filed with the court on, or before April 24, 2020." (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 923 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #899 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #503 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT; Jeffrey A Babener answer due 3/30/2020. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 922 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #906 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Twenty Pages (Unopposed) by Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 921 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #904 Joint MOTION to Substitute Century Bank and Trust Company as Escrow Account Bank for Settlement re [762} MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties with Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 920 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/18/2020. Case called, Counsel appear in person and by telephone, Counsel argue, Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Assorted) (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 919 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2020 re #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Case called, Counsel appear in person and by telephone, Counsel argue motion, Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Assorted) (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 18, 2020 Filing 918 NOTICE TO COUNSEL. If you appeared by telephone for proceedings that took place on March 18, 2020, please email the Court Reporter, Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com so your appearance can be added to the record. (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 917 DECLARATION re #911 Objection - Declaration in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause by Robert J. Bonsignore. (Noonan, D.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 916 NOTICE by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. re #907 Proposed Document(s) submitted OBJECTION (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Huber In Support of Notice of Objection)(Huber, James)
March 17, 2020 Filing 915 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Status Conference set for 3/18/2020 is hereby canceled. Both the Settlement Approval Hearing and the show cause hearing will proceed as scheduled. The call in number is 888-675-2535 - access code 9932461. (Castles, Martin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 914 AFFIDAVIT of Mark R. Meehan re #911 Objection to 898 Order,,, filed by Robert J. Bonsignore. (Howard, Edwin) Modified docket text on 3/17/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
March 17, 2020 Filing 913 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald P. Passatempo on behalf of Rubens Bourguignon, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Edivaldo Reis (Passatempo, Ronald)
March 17, 2020 Filing 912 Affidavit of Edwin H. Howard re #911 filed by Robert J. Bonsignore. (Howard, Edwin) Modified docket text on 3/18/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
March 16, 2020 Filing 911 Objection to 898 Order,,, by Robert J. Bonsignore Response to Order to Show Cause dated March 2, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sinnott, William)
March 16, 2020 Filing 910 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #909 Motion to Continue March 18, 2020 Hearing of Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. "The Motion to Continue March 18, 2020 Hearing of Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC (Document #909) is granted in part and denied in part. The Plaintiffs' motion for approval of Settlement and the hearing with respect to the potential removal of Interim Lead Counsel will held as scheduled with counsel permitted, and encouraged, to attend by telephone. The status conference will be rescheduled." (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 16, 2020 Filing 909 MOTION to Continue March 18, 2020 Hearing of Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Fuller, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 908 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Sinnott on behalf of Robert J. Bonsignore (Sinnott, William)
March 13, 2020 Filing 907 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs. Document received: Proposed Status Conference Agenda. (Wall, Alexander)
March 13, 2020 Filing 906 MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Twenty Pages (Unopposed) by Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates.(Schneiderman, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 905 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #903 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan C. Crafts terminated. (Castles, Martin)
March 11, 2020 Filing 904 Joint MOTION to Substitute Century Bank and Trust Company as Escrow Account Bank for Settlement re #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties with Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs.(Wall, Alexander)
March 11, 2020 Filing 903 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 902 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin H. Howard on behalf of Rita Dos Santos (Howard, Edwin)
March 11, 2020 Filing 901 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #900 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher M. Hynes. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 10, 2020 Filing 900 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher M. Hynes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8148691 by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher M. Hynes)(Dwyer, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Filing 899 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 30, 2020 to Answer to Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates.(Schneiderman, Andrew) Modified on 3/6/2020 (Jones, Sherry).
March 2, 2020 Filing 898 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: AMENDED ELECTRONIC ORDER entered entered denying #783 Motion for Reconsideration. I deny the Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider and to Permit Amendment of the dismissals of the Defendants Bank of America, TD Bank, PriceWaterhouseCoopers, and Wells Fargo Bank. I reserve ruling on Plaintiffs' request for reconsideration as to Global Payroll Gateway (see endorsement on document #781). I deny the Plaintiffs' request to amend the Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint. The Plaintiffs seek to amend that complaint by, among other things, adding 19 new Defendants, and have, once again, failed to follow Local Rule 15.1. Since the Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel has been previously admonished by this Court for failing to follow this, and other procedural rules, I will hold a hearing, to be set shortly, for Attorney Robert Bonsignore to show cause why he should not be removed as Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 897 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman for Attorney Robert Bonsignore to show cause why he should not be removed as Plaintiffs Interim Lead Counsel. Court will further hold a status conference on this date. Status Conference set for 3/18/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 896 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties: Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 895 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #853 Request for Issuance of Summonses filed by Rita Dos Santos. See endorsement on document #783. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 894 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #828 Motion to Compel without prejudice to renew for failure to comply with Local Rule 37.1. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 893 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #834 Motion for Extension of Time; denying #867 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. See endorsement on document #783. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 892 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #804 Motion to Strike; granting #804 Motion to Dismiss; granting #807 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting #839 Motion to Strike. See endorsement on document #783. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 891 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #792 Motion to Dismiss. No opposition having been filed. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 890 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #783 Motion for Reconsideration. I deny the Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider and to Permit Amendment of the dismissals of the Defendants Bank of America, TD Bank, and Wells Fargo Bank. I reserve ruling on Plaintiffs' request for reconsideration as to Global Payroll Gateway (see endorsement on document #781). I deny the Plaintiffs' request to amend the Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint. The Plaintiffs seek to amend that complaint by, among other things, adding 19 new Defendants, and have, once again, failed to follow Local Rule 15.1. Since the Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel has been previously admonished by this Court for failing to follow this, and other procedural rules, I will hold a hearing, to be set shortly, for Attorney Robert Bonsignore to show cause why he should not be removed as Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2020 Filing 889 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #781 Motion for Reconsideration. I grant so much of the Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery that seeks jurisdictional discovery. Jurisdictional discovery shall be completed with 60 days of the date of this order. I reserve ruling on whether to reconsider dismissal. (Castles, Martin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 888 REPLY to Response to #843 filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore in Further Support of Motions for Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal, or in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdicational Discover, and to Reconsider and to Permit Amendment, #2 Attachment 1 - The Forward section of Flashner Judicial Center Bench Book Deconstructing Rule 23 - A Comparison of Massachusetts and Federal Class-Action Litigation, #3 Attachment 2 - Rockingham County Letter of Recommendation, #4 Attachment 3 - CRT Article, #5 Attachment 4 - Craft Affidavit, #6 Attachment 5 - November 2011 Base Commerce Contract, #7 Attachment 6 - GPG Invoices to TelexFree)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 2/28/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
February 27, 2020 Filing 887 REPLY to Response to #835 , #836 , #837 , #838 , #841 , #843 filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore In Further Support of Motions to Reconsider and to Permit Amendment, and For Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, #2 Attachment 1 The Forward section of Flashner Judicial Center Bench Book Deconstructing Rule 23 - A Comparison of Massachusetts and Federal Class-Action Litigation, #3 Attachment 2 -- Rockingham County Letter of Recommendation, #4 Attachment 3 -- CRT Article, #5 Attachment 4 Redlined Comparison of the 5th CAC and the Corrected 5th CAC, #6 Attachment 5 Redlined Comparison of the 4th CAC and the 5th CAC, #7 Attachment 6 Excerpts Transcript of November 2, 2015 Hearing, #8 Attachment 7 -- Letter of Reference Dated February 19, 2014, by Michael Montalvo, Vice President of Wells Fargo, vouching for Carlos Wanzeler and TelexFree in strong terms and Investigation Report, #9 Attachment 8 -- Craft Affidavit, #10 Attachment 9 Professor McCoy Bank of America, N.A. Report, #11 Attachment 10 Professor McCoy TD Bank, N.A. Report, #12 Attachment 11 -- Professor McCoy Wells Fargo Advisors and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Report)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 2/28/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
February 27, 2020 Filing 886 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #855 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 885 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Castles, Martin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 884 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #874 Motion for Protective Order. (Castles, Martin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 883 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #798 Motion to Withdraw as attorney; granting #800 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #801 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah W. Walsh; Robert M. Goldstein and Paul V. Kelly terminated. (Castles, Martin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 882 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #875 Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Reply Brief. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 881 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #877 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 880 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan L. Hale on behalf of Dustin Sparman, Vantage Payments, LLC (Hale, Allan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 879 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Westfall on behalf of Dustin Sparman, Vantage Payments, LLC (Westfall, Richard)
February 24, 2020 Filing 878 First RESPONSE to Motion re #874 Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Joint Motion of Plaintiffs, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, ProPay, Inc., Fidelity Bank, International Payout Systems, Inc., and John F. Merrill] filed by Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates. (O'Donnell, Jordan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 877 Second MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider Order, or in the Alternative, To Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore in further Support of Motions For Reconsideration or Order of Dismissal, or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, and to Reconsider and to Permit Amendment, #3 The Forward section of Flashner Judicial Center Bench Book Deconstructing Rule 23 - A Comparison of Massachusetts and Federal Class-Action Litigation, #4 Attachment 2 Rockingham County Letter of Recommendation, #5 Attachment 3 Craft Article, #6 Attachment 4 Craft Affidavit, #7 Attachment 5 November 2011 Base Commerce Contract, #8 Attachment 6 - GPG Invoices to TelexFree)(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 876 Attachment A re #875 Motion for Leave to file filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Bonsignore In Further Support of Motions to Reconsider and to Permit Amendment, and For Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, #2 The Forward section of Flashner Judicial Center Bench Book Deconstructing Rule 23 - A Comparison of Massachusetts and Federal Class-Action Litigation on class actions includes a special mention dedication to me, #3 Rockingham County Letter of Recommendation, #4 CRT Article, #5 Redlined Comparison of the 5th CAC and the Corrected 5th CAC, #6 Redlined Comparison of the 4th CAC and the 5th CAC, #7 Excerpts Transcript of November 2, 2015 Hearing, #8 Letter of Reference Dated February 19, 2014, by Michael Montalvo, Vice President of Wells Fargo, vouching for Carlos Wanzeler and TelexFree in strong terms and Investigation Report, #9 Craft Affidavit, #10 Professor McCoy Bank of America, N.A. Report, #11 Professor McCoy TD Bank, N.A. Report, #12 -- Professor McCoy Wells Fargo Advisors and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Report)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 2/21/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
February 20, 2020 Filing 875 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Reply Brief to #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG, #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/21/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
February 20, 2020 Filing 874 Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Joint Motion of Plaintiffs, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, ProPay, Inc., Fidelity Bank, International Payout Systems, Inc., and John F. Merrill] by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fuller, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 873 Joint MOTION Modifications to Discovery Schedule re 756 Scheduling Order,, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, ProPay, Inc., Fidelity Bank, International Payout Systems, Inc. and John F. Merrill] ( Responses due by 3/5/2020) by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fuller, Robert) Modified on 2/21/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
February 14, 2020 Filing 872 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The status conference set for 2/28/20 is hereby canceled. (Castles, Martin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 871 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #870 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard Allen Westfall and Allan L. Hale. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 13, 2020 Filing 870 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Allen Westfall and Allan L. Hale Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8106815 by Vantage Payments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit or RIchard Allen Westfall, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing RAW, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Allan L Hale, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Standing ALH)(Crandell, Gary)
February 10, 2020 Filing 869 DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by Rita Dos Santos MDL 2566 Plaintiffs First Expert Disclosures Statement. (Attachments: #1 Revised Declaration of Patricia A. McCoy Regarding Bank of America, N.A., #2 Revised Declaration of Patricia A. McCoy Regarding Wells Fargo Advisors and Wells Fargo Bank, #3 Revised Declaration of Patricia A. McCoy Regarding TDBank, N.A., #4 Curriculum Vitae of Patricia A. McCoy, #5 Curriculum Vitae of Lisa T. Wilhelm, #6 Curriculum Vitae of Alexander Zapata, MBA, #7 Curriculum Vitae of Richard Flamm, #8 Curriculum Vitae of Joseph L. Leauanae)(Bonsignore, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 868 MEMORANDUM in Support re #867 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #790 Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc.. (Long, Danielle)
January 31, 2020 Filing 867 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #790 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc..(Long, Danielle)
January 29, 2020 Filing 866 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas G. Kline on behalf of Anthony Cellucci (Kline, Nicholas)
January 28, 2020 Filing 865 Joinder Opposition/ Response by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. to #853 Notice (Other) . (Huber, James)
January 28, 2020 Filing 864 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #861 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Edward A. Salanga. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 28, 2020 Filing 863 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #860 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lauren Elliott Stine. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 27, 2020 Filing 862 Opposition / Response by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. to #853 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Request for Issuance of Summons. (O'Connor, Paul)
January 27, 2020 Filing 861 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edward A. Salanga Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8074645 by Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charpentier, Julianna)
January 27, 2020 Filing 860 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lauren Elliott Stine Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8074472 by Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charpentier, Julianna)
January 24, 2020 Filing 859 First Opposition re #839 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint and Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint (Corrected) filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Bonsignore, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Filing 858 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Andrews Long on behalf of Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc. (Long, Danielle)
January 23, 2020 Filing 857 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra L. Berardi on behalf of Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc. (Berardi, Kendra)
January 23, 2020 Filing 856 NOTICE of Appearance by Julianna M. Charpentier on behalf of Garvin L DeShazer, Kenneth Lind, Davene Peruzzini, Michael L Sheffield, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, The Sheffield Group, Inc. (Charpentier, Julianna)
January 23, 2020 Filing 855 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel (Docket No. 828) by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Reply Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Proposed Reply Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Proposed Reply Brief, #5 Exhibit D to Proposed Reply Brief)(Fuller, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Filing 854 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The Status Conference and motion hearing set for 1/28/2020 is hereby canceled. The Court will be setting a hearing on all pending motions as well as a status conference for a date in February. Notice to issue.(Castles, Martin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 853 NOTICE by Rita Dos Santos Plaintiff's Renewed Notice and Request for Issuance of Summonses (Bonsignore, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 852 First Opposition re #828 First MOTION to Compel filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail Correspondence from Attorney Alex Wall, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Bonsignore in Support of Opposition to Wells Fargo Advisors, LLCs First Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit Correspondence from Attorney Robert Bonsignore, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Request to Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC to Withdraw or Narrow Its Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Supplemental Answers to First Interrogatories From Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Wells Fargo Advisors, LLCs Request for Production of Documents)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 1/21/2020, the main document attached is 2 copies of the opposition. (Jones, Sherry).
January 17, 2020 Filing 851 NOTICE of Appearance by Fitz E. Barringer on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC (Barringer, Fitz)
January 15, 2020 Filing 850 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Davene Peruzzini waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 1/16/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
January 15, 2020 Filing 849 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Garvin L DeShazer waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 1/16/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
January 15, 2020 Filing 848 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Kenneth Lind waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 1/16/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
January 15, 2020 Filing 847 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Michael L Sheffield waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 1/16/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
January 15, 2020 Filing 846 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. The Sheffield Group, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bonsignore, Robert)
January 15, 2020 Filing 845 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Bonsignore, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 844 AFFIDAVIT of Defendant Global Payroll Gateway In Support of Omnibus Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider Order of Dismissal and Motion to Reconsider and Permit Amendment in Opposition re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG, #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Huber, James)
January 13, 2020 Filing 843 Opposition re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG, #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Huber, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 841 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Propay, Inc.. (Chally, Jonathan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 840 MEMORANDUM in Support re #839 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint and Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint (Corrected) filed by International Payout Systems, Inc.. (Van Leeuwen, Diana)
January 10, 2020 Filing 839 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint and Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint (Corrected) by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Van Leeuwen, Diana)
January 10, 2020 Filing 838 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Bank of America, N.A., PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(McChesney, S.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 837 First Opposition re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by International Payout Systems, Inc.. (Van Leeuwen, Diana)
January 10, 2020 Filing 836 Opposition re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John. (Toomey, Joseph)
January 10, 2020 Filing 835 RESPONSE to Motion re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 834 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Fifth Amended Complaint and to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates.(Schneiderman, Andrew)
January 9, 2020 Filing 833 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #832 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Karla L. Johnson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 8, 2020 Filing 832 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Karla L. Johnson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8045161 by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hestin, Nellie)
January 6, 2020 Filing 831 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Meehan on behalf of Rita Dos Santos (Meehan, Mark)
January 6, 2020 Filing 830 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #825 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Fitz E. Barringer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 3, 2020 Filing 829 MEMORANDUM in Support re #828 First MOTION to Compel filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1-111919 Email, #2 Ex. 2-102519 Disclosures, #3 Ex. 3- 121119 Letter, #4 Ex. 4-121119 Email, #5 Ex. 5-121619 Email, #6 Ex. 6-122319 Email, #7 Ex. 7-Jan 2020 Exchanges)(Fuller, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 828 First MOTION to Compel by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-WFA 1st Rogs, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-WFA 1st RFPS, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-Pl Resp to 1st Rogs, #4 Exhibit Ex. D-Pl Resp to 1st RFPs)(Fuller, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 827 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #825 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-8037852. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Samson, Paul)
January 2, 2020 Filing 826 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. O'Donnell on behalf of Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates (O'Donnell, Jordan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 825 MOTION for Leave to File Fitz E. Barringer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Samson, Paul) Modified on 1/3/2020 (Burgos, Sandra).
December 30, 2019 Filing 824 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #807 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Nehra Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Anthony Cellucci. (Bonsignore, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 823 EXHIBIT by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 822 First Opposition re #804 MOTION to Strike AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Bonsignore, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 821 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #797 Motion for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider and Permit Amendment. (Castles, Martin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 820 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Grossbaum on behalf of Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates (Grossbaum, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 819 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Schneiderman on behalf of Jeffrey A Babener, Babener & Associates (Schneiderman, Andrew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 818 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plaintiffs. Babener & Associates waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Wall, Alexander)
December 20, 2019 Filing 817 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plaintiffs. Jeffrey A Babener waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Wall, Alexander)
December 20, 2019 Filing 816 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #794 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment. Response due by 1/10/2020. (Castles, Martin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 815 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #793 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration and #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment ( Responses due by 1/13/2020); and granting #793 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 814 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #791 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment Response due by 1/10/2020. (Castles, Martin)
December 19, 2019 Filing 813 RESPONSE to Motion re #793 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 12, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG, #783 MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Gerivaldo Pacheco. (Bonsignore, Robert)
December 19, 2019 Filing 812 ANSWER to #790 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Katia B. Wanzeler.(Kelly, Paul)
December 19, 2019 Filing 811 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew J. Holmes (Holmes, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 810 NOTICE by John F. Merrill re #790 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Notice of Objection of John F. Merrill to Plaintiffs' Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint (Pineault, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 809 NOTICE by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. re #790 Amended Complaint,,,,,, OBJECTION OF DEFENDANTS, GLOBAL PAYROLL GATEWAY INC. AND JAYME AMIRIE, TO PLAINTIFFS (CORRECTED) FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (Huber, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 808 MEMORANDUM in Support re #807 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Nehra Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Nehra Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra. (Sinclair, Kent)
December 17, 2019 Filing 807 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Nehra Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra.(Sinclair, Kent)
December 13, 2019 Filing 806 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG, #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment JOINDER NOTICE OF OBJECTION OF DEFENDANT, GLOBAL PAYROLL GATEWAY, TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND PERMIT AMENDMENT AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY (Huber, James) Modified on 12/16/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
December 13, 2019 Filing 805 MEMORANDUM in Support re #804 MOTION to Strike AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) filed by Propay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chally, Jonathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 804 MOTION to Strike AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) by Propay, Inc..(Chally, Jonathan). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 12/16/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
December 13, 2019 Filing 803 OBJECTION by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment [NOTICE OF OBJECTION OF DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TD BANK, N.A. AND PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND PERMIT AMENDMENT] (Fuller, Robert) Modified on 12/16/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
December 13, 2019 Filing 802 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment [NOTICE OF OBJECTION OF WELLS FARGO ADVISORS, LLC TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND PERMIT AMENDMENT] (Fuller, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 801 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney To Carlos Wanzeler by Carlos N. Wanzeler.(Walsh, Sarah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 800 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney To Carlos Wanzeler by Carlos N. Wanzeler.(Kelly, Paul)
December 11, 2019 Filing 799 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by John M. Milso with certificate of service (Milso, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 798 MOTION to Withdraw Limited Appearance of Robert M. Goldstein by James M. Merrill.(Goldstein, Robert)
December 10, 2019 Filing 797 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider and Permit Amendment by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Van Leeuwen, Diana)
December 10, 2019 Filing 796 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #795 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Timothy H. Lee. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 795 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Timothy H. Lee Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8004912 by Propay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Douglas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 794 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment by Defendants Propay, Inc., Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC and Fidelity Co-Operative Bank (including its President, John F. Merrill) by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Fuller, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Filing 793 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 12, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG, #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment, #790 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huber, James). Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 12/9/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
December 6, 2019 Filing 792 MOTION to Dismiss and Vacate Preliminary Injunction by Daniil Shoyfer.(Nemtsev, Maksim)
December 5, 2019 Filing 791 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020 to File Response/Reply by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, Jarrod)
December 4, 2019 Filing 790 AMENDED COMPLAINT TO FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) against Sara P Sandford, Jayme Amirrie, Michael L Sheffield, Gerald P. Nehra, Brian Bonfiglio, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, Jeffrey A Babener, Ana P Oliveira, Bank Card Consultants, Inc., Paralegal Doe, Thomas A Wells, Kenneth Lind, AlliedWallet d/b/a Allied Wallet, The Sheffield Group, Inc., Gary P Tober, PNC Bank, N.A., TelexElectric, LLLP, Garvey Schubert Barer, P.C., Garvin L DeShazer, John F. Merrill, Alexander Sidel, Babener & Associates, Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Telecom Logic, LLC, Steven M. Labriola, Ahmad Khawaja, John Yurick, Jason Doolittle, Carlos N. Wanzeler, Mauricio Cardenas, Bank of America, N.A., Doe Banks, John Kirchhefer, Telex Mobile Holdings, Inc., Doe Investment Services Providers, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Priority Payout, Corp., Andreia B Moreira, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., Katia B. Wanzeler, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Robert Weaver, Propay, Inc., Vantage Payments, LLC, Patrick C Conti, Moe Diab, Dustin Sparman, Synovus Bank, Doe Licensed Professionals, Joseph H. Craft, Richard Colabella, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Allied Wallet, Ltd., Jerry Puzey, Base Commerce, LLC, Amy Rountree, James M. Merrill, Samuel C Kauffman, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Ryan James Mitchell, International Payout Systems, Inc., Davene Peruzzini, Carlos Roberto Costa, TD Bank NA, John Hughes, RSB Citizens, N.A., Doe Payment Processing Services, Kathryn Coffin, filed by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 789 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Allied Wallet, Ltd..(Steiner, David)
December 4, 2019 Filing 788 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #787 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary J. Hackett terminated (Castles, Martin)
December 3, 2019 Filing 787 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary J. Hackett by TD Bank NA.(Hackett, Mary)
November 29, 2019 Filing 786 EXHIBIT re #785 Exhibit TO ATTACHMENT A - FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 785 EXHIBIT re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment ATTACHMENT A by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 784 MEMORANDUM in Support re #783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment filed by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 783 MOTION for Reconsideration and to Permit Amendment by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman.(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 782 MEMORANDUM in Support re #781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG filed by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman. (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 781 MOTION for Reconsideration Order of Dismissal or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, with Respect to Defendant GPG by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman.(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 780 EXHIBIT TO FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Omnibus Decl. of William H. Runge, Case No. 14-125234-ABL, Doc. 13, #2 Exhibit 3 Part 1 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 2 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 4 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 5 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #6 Exhibit 4 - Decl. Carol L. Harris, #7 Exhibit 5 - TelexFree, LLC Balance Sheet as of December 31, 2013, #8 Exhibit 6 - TelexFree Promotional Advertisements, #9 Exhibit 7 - deposited by TelexFree into its account with Fidelity Bank, #10 Exhibit 8 - Allied Wallet Bank Information Form for Bank of America, #11 Exhibit 9 September 20, 2013 OCCurrency Consent Decree, #12 Exhibit 10 - SOC Consent Order E 2014-0073, #13 Exhibit 11 - email from John Hughes, dated May 22, 2013, #14 Exhibit 12 - email from Hughes to Merrill, dated August 28, 2013, #15 Exhibit 13 - email from Jayme Amirie to James Merrill dated September 3,2013, #16 Exhibit 14 - email from Jayme Amirie to Jay Borromei dated September 27, 2013, #17 Exhibit 15 - Letter from John Hughes to James Merrill, dated August 20, 2013, #18 Exhibit 16 - email from Hughes to Merrill, dated September 27, 2013, #19 Exhibit 17 - Allied Wallet Card Payment Processing Agreement, dated August 26, 2013, #20 Exhibit 18 - email from Dustin Sparman to James Merrill, dated November, #21 Exhibit 19 - Vantage Payments CDRN Portal Agreement, #22 Exhibit 20 - email from James Merrill to Dustin Sparman, dated January 15, 2014, #23 Exhibit 21 - email from Sparman to Merrill, dated December 27, 2013)(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 779 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIFTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sara P Sandford, Opt3 Solutions, Inc., Gerald P. Nehra, Brian Bonfiglio, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, Jeffrey A Babener, Ana P Oliveira, Bank Card Consultants, Inc., Paralegal Doe, Faith R. Sloan, Gary P Tober, PNC Bank, N.A., Santiago De La Rosa, Telexfree, LLC, TelexElectric, LLLP, John F. Merrill, Alexander Sidel, Babener & Associates, Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Steven M. Labriola, Scott Miller, John Yurick, Telexfree, Inc., Jason Doolittle, Carlos N. Wanzeler, Mauricio Cardenas, Bank of America, N.A., John Kirchhefer, Telex Mobile Holdings, Inc., Doe Investment Services Providers, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Doe Banks, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., Katia B. Wanzeler, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Robert Weaver, Jason Borromei, Propay, Inc., Vantage Payments, LLC, Daniil Shoyfer, Dustin Sparman, Synovus Bank, Randy N. Crosby, Doe Licensed Professionals, Joseph H. Craft, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Allied Wallet, Ltd., Base Commerce, LLC, Samuel C Kauffman, James M. Merrill, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Doe Top Level Promoters, Ann Genet, Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, International Payout Systems, Inc., TD Bank NA, John Hughes, RSB Citizens, N.A., Doe Payment Processing Services, Garvin L DeShazer, Gregg Rodgers, Carlos Roberto Costa, Thomas A Wells, Moe Diab, Debbie (Debra) Stenmoe, Ryan James Mitchell, Michael L Sheffield, AlliedWallet d/b/a Allied Wallet, Jerry Puzey, Ahmad Khawaja, Amy Rountree, Patrick C Conti, Kenneth Lind, Top Level Promoter, Telecom Logic, LLC, Davene Peruzzini, Priority Payout, Corp., Jayme Amirrie, Richard Colabella, The Sheffield Group, Inc., Garvey Schubert Barer, filed by Anthony Cellucci, Rita Dos Santos, Jamilly Lake, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Igor Shikhman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 778 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 777 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties : Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 776 RESPONSE to Motion re #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Propay, Inc.. (Chally, Jonathan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 774 RESPONSE to Motion re #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 773 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #770 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anna H. Karabachev. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 15, 2019 Filing 772 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Bonsignore on behalf of Telexfree Securities Litigation (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 771 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anna H. Karabachev on Behalf of all Plaintiffs by Telexfree Securities Litigation.(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 11/15/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
November 14, 2019 Filing 770 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anna H. Karabachev Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7970352 by Telexfree Securities Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anna H. Karabachev in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Exhibit A)(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 769 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #764 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah Van Culin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 768 MEMORANDUM in Support re #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Base Commerce, LLC, Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, Synovus Bank. (Mirick, John)
November 8, 2019 Filing 767 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #761 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 766 MOTION for Order to [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Van Culin on Behalf of All Plaintiffs by Telexfree Securities Litigation.(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 765 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing. (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 764 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah Van Culin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7962527 by Telexfree Securities Litigation.(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 763 MEMORANDUM in Support re #762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties filed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald A. Dardeno in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions Inc, Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties, #2 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendants Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank, and Certain Related Individuals, Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., #3 Proposed Class Notice, #4 Proposed Order Preliminary Approving Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Scheduling Hearing on Fairness of Settlement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e))(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 762 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Joseph Craft and Craft Financial Solutions, Inc., Base Commerce, LLC, Synovus Bank and Certain Related Parties by Telexfree Securities Litigation.(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 11/6/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
November 5, 2019 Filing 761 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Telexfree Securities Litigation.(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 11/6/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
November 4, 2019 Filing 760 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Van Leeuwen on behalf of International Payout Systems, Inc. (Van Leeuwen, Diana)
October 25, 2019 Filing 759 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
October 4, 2019 Filing 758 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
September 23, 2019 Filing 756 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures by 10/25/19, Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2019, Requests for production of documents and interrogatories served by 12/6/19, Requests for admissions served by 1/17/20, Fact Discovery to be completed by 2/28/2020, Status Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman, Plaintiff's trial experts must be designated by 2/10/20, Plaintiff's trial experts must be deposed by 3/20/20, Defendants' trial experts must be designated by 3/10/20, Defendants trial experts must be deposed by 4/10/20, Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020, All motions for class certification due by 6/1/20, Responses to dispositive motions due 60 days after service. (Castles, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 755 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #747 Motion to Amend. (Castles, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 754 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #735 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Castles, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 753 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #657 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #726 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 752 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #507 Motion to Quash. (Castles, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 751 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice #484 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 750 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #749 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica S. Dormitzer terminated (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 749 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica S. Dormitzer by Merrill F. John.(Pineault, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 747 MOTION to Amend Answer to Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Vantage Payments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Amended Answer to FCAC)(Crandell, Gary)
July 9, 2019 Filing 746 ANSWER to #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Fuller, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 744 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #707 Motion for Leave to File Document and denying #713 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Castles, Martin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 743 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #614 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion is granted as to the Third and Fourth Claims for Relief and denied as to the Tenth Claim for Relief. (Castles, Martin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 742 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: FINDINGS AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #666 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Defendant's motion is granted as to the Third and Fourth Claim for Relief and denied as to the Tenth Claim for Relief (Castles, Martin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 740 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #739 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 20 days after the Plaintiffs file their Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint or denial of motion to amend. (Castles, Martin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 739 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 738 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #735 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Rubens Bourguignon, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Orineia Silva. (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 737 Defendants Vantage Payments LLC and Dustin Sparman's ANSWER to #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, with Affirmative Defenaes by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
May 14, 2019 Filing 736 MEMORANDUM in Support re #735 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Propay, Inc.. (Chally, Jonathan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 735 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Propay, Inc..(Chally, Jonathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 733 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #730 Motion for Extension of Time respond to the complaint until 20 days after the Plaintiffs file their Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Castles, Martin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 732 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #729 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 6/1/2019; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 6/1/2019. (Castles, Martin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 731 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #727 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dustin Sparman answer due 5/24/2019; Vantage Payments, LLC answer due 5/24/2019. (Castles, Martin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 730 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or to Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Daniil Shoyfer.(Nemtsev, Maksim)
May 1, 2019 Filing 729 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 1, 2019 to File Answer by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 728 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Gary L Crandell (Crandell, Gary)
May 1, 2019 Filing 727 MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/24/2019 to File Answer of Defendants Vantage Payments LLC and Dustin Sparman by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
April 19, 2019 Filing 726 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Toomey, Joseph)
April 19, 2019 Filing 725 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Michael J. Pineault (Pineault, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 724 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #657 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Rubens Bourguignon, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Orineia Silva. (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 11, 2019 Filing 723 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #613 Motion for relief from and reconsideration of order dated 1/29/19. The Defendants Dustin Sparman and Vantage Payments, LLC's Motion For Relief From and Reconsideration of an Order Dated January 29, 2019 Denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Document #368) is Granted. Upon reconsideration of the issue of whether there is subject matter jurisdiction, I find that the SCAC establishes that the Plaintiffs are seeking to represent a class comprised of those who purchased TelexFree packages and suffered losses. I find that the SCAC sufficiently alleges injury in fact to those who sustained losses that are causally connected to Vantage and Sparman; namely that the allegations relative to their conduct in concert with Defendants Hughes and Base Commerce, and Defendant Allied Wallet are sufficient to provide the requisite subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, upon reconsideration, the above motion (#368) is Denied. (Castles, Martin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 722 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER.(Castles, Martin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 721 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #699 Motion for Protective Order. (Castles, Martin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 720 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #697 Motion to Stay. (Castles, Martin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 719 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #701 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting #714 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. (Castles, Martin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 718 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #654 Motion for Reconsideration. (Castles, Martin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 717 Opposition re #697 MOTION to Stay [Motion for Order Staying Discovery as to Allied Wallet, Ltd.] filed by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 8, 2019 Filing 716 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 715 Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on March 20, 2019, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net Redaction Request due 4/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
April 5, 2019 Filing 714 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint by International Payout Systems, Inc..(O'Brien, Justin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 713 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Allied Wallet Ltd.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Steiner, David)
April 4, 2019 Filing 712 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #696 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William J. Hanlon terminated (Castles, Martin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 711 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #707 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Wells Fargo Advisors LLC's Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Filing 710 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #708 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 5/1/2019; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 5/1/2019. (Castles, Martin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 709 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #705 Motion to Withdraw. (Castles, Martin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 708 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 1, 2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 707 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Wells Fargo Advisors LLC's Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Surreply to Wells Fargo Advisors LLC's Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6))(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Filing 706 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #654 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Denial of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Tortious Aiding and Abetting filed by Rubens Bourguignon, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Orineia Silva. (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Filing 705 MOTION to Withdraw Burns & Levinson LLP, David M. Losier and Dennis J. Kelly's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Losier, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 704 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony E. Fuller on behalf of International Payout Systems, Inc. (Fuller, Anthony)
April 1, 2019 Filing 703 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia W. McLetchie on behalf of International Payout Systems, Inc. (McLetchie, Julia)
April 1, 2019 Filing 702 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. O'Brien on behalf of International Payout Systems, Inc. (O'Brien, Justin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 701 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 20 days after order on Defendants motion to dismiss to File Answer to Fourth Amended Consolidated Complaint by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
March 27, 2019 Filing 700 Opposition re #666 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rubens Bourguignon, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Orineia Silva. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 27, 2019 Filing 699 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Telexfree Securities Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gayan, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 698 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank. (Roffman, Ian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 697 MOTION to Stay [Motion for Order Staying Discovery as to Allied Wallet, Ltd.] by Allied Wallet, Ltd..(Steiner, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 696 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Richard W Waak.(Hanlon, William)
March 21, 2019 Filing 695 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #692 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 694 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen F. Francella, III on behalf of Katia B. Wanzeler (Francella, Carmen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 693 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by John F. Merrill. (Pineault, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 692 MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Katia B. Wanzeler.(Kelly, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2019 (Castles, Martin).
March 20, 2019 Filing 691 REPLY to Response to #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Fuller, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 690 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Santiago De La Rosa, Scott Miller, Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, Faith R. Sloan (Castles, Martin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 689 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #360 Request for notice of default filed by Rita Dos Santos, #361 Request for notice of default filed by Rita Dos Santos, #353 Request for notice of default filed by Rita Dos Santos, and #363 Request for notice of default filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Castles, Martin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 688 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #682 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Court rules granting #684 Motion for Extension of Time to 20 Days From Filing of 5th Consolidated and Amended Complaint or Court's Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to Answer Complaint. (Castles, Martin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 687 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/2019, Case called, Counsel appear for scheduling conference, Court and counsel discuss various issues including pending motions, Filing of a 5th Amended Complaint, Issuance of summons, the discovery schedule, etc., Court takes scheduling order deadlines under advisement, (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 686 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M. Craig on behalf of Joseph Shikhman (Craig, Christine)
March 20, 2019 Filing 685 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Michael Noonan on behalf of Joseph Shikhman (Noonan, D.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 684 MOTION for Extension of Time to 20 Days From Filing of 5th Consolidated and Amended Complaint or Court's Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to Answer Complaint by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra.(Sinclair, Kent)
March 19, 2019 Filing 683 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Daniil Shoyfer.(Nemtsev, Maksim)
March 15, 2019 Filing 682 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief)(Fuller, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 681 ProPay, Inc.'s ANSWER to #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Propay, Inc..(Chally, Jonathan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 680 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew Shayefar and Valentin Gurvits (Shayefar, Matthew)
March 14, 2019 Filing 679 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Evan M. Fray-Witzer (Fray-Witzer, Evan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 678 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #645 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 20 days after Plaintiffs file a Fifth Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Castles, Martin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 677 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #664 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #654 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Denial of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Tortious Aiding and Abetting Responses due by 4/2/2019 (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 676 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #663 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #657 MOTION for Reconsideration Responses due by 4/12/2019 (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 675 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #661 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine R. Moskop and Christopher F. Robertson terminated. (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 674 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #659 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Daniil Shoyfer answer due 5/6/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 673 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #644 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Joseph H. Craft answer due 4/1/2019; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 4/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 672 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #642 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer International Payout Systems, Inc. answer due 4/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 671 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #639 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 3/18/2019 (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 670 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #637 Motion for order staying discovery. (Jones, Sherry)
March 14, 2019 Filing 669 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #641 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. (Castles, Martin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 668 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Telexfree Securities Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Gayan, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 667 MEMORANDUM in Support re #666 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steiner, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 666 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Allied Wallet, Ltd..(Steiner, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 665 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by John J. Commisso (Commisso, John)
March 12, 2019 Filing 664 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 2, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #654 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Denial of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Tortious Aiding and Abetting by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 3/13/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
March 12, 2019 Filing 663 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 12, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #657 MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified docket text on 3/13/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
March 12, 2019 Filing 662 Opposition re #637 MOTION to Stay [Motion for Order Staying Discovery as to Wells Fargo Advisors LLC] filed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. (Gayan, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 661 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra.(Robertson, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 660 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent D.B. Sinclair on behalf of Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra (Sinclair, Kent)
March 8, 2019 Filing 659 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 6, 2019 to File Answer or to Otherwise Respond to the Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint by Daniil Shoyfer.(Nemtsev, Maksim)
March 8, 2019 Filing 658 MEMORANDUM in Support re #657 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, John F. Merrill. (Roffman, Ian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 657 MOTION for Reconsideration by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John.(Roffman, Ian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 656 NOTICE of Appearance by Maksim Nemtsev on behalf of Daniil Shoyfer (Nemtsev, Maksim)
March 5, 2019 Filing 655 MEMORANDUM in Support re #654 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Denial of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Tortious Aiding and Abetting filed by Propay, Inc.. (Sumner, Phyllis)
March 5, 2019 Filing 654 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Denial of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Tortious Aiding and Abetting by Propay, Inc..(Sumner, Phyllis)
March 5, 2019 Filing 653 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #650 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan R. Chally. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 4, 2019 Filing 652 EXHIBIT re #651 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Rubens Bourguignon, Rita Dos Santos, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda, Plaintiffs, Orineia Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-30)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 651 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rita Dos Santos, Plaintiffs, Rubens Bourguignon, Orineia Silva, Lauriana Laves, Luci E Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 30)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 650 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan R. Chally Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7566191 by Propay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Douglas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 649 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #648 Motion to remove hearing. (Castles, Martin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 648 Joint MOTION Remove Hearing from List re #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes by John Hughes.(Dunlap, Ben)
March 1, 2019 Filing 647 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The Motion Hearing set for 3/04/2019 is hereby canceled. (Motion hearing canceled at Plaintiffs' counsel's request)(Castles, Martin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 646 ANSWER to #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Allied Wallet, Ltd..(Steiner, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 645 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John.(Toomey, Joseph)
February 28, 2019 Filing 644 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 643 Opposition re #641 MOTION for Extension of Time to after March 20, 2019 Scheduling Conference to File Response/Reply as to #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #615 Memorandum in Support of Motion And Response to Wells Fargo Advisor L [Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Extension] filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Doerr, Adam)
February 27, 2019 Filing 642 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Kelly, Dennis)
February 26, 2019 Filing 641 MOTION for Extension of Time to after March 20, 2019 Scheduling Conference to File Response/Reply as to #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #615 Memorandum in Support of Motion And Response to Wells Fargo Advisor LLC's Objection to Motion by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 25, 2019 Filing 640 RESPONSE to Motion re #639 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #615 Memorandum in Support of Motion [Objection and Response to Motion by Plaintiffs for Time Extension] filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, Robert)
February 25, 2019 Filing 639 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #615 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee.(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 20, 2019 Filing 638 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Telexfree Securities Litigation. Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Gayan, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 637 MOTION to Stay [Motion for Order Staying Discovery as to Wells Fargo Advisors LLC] by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Fuller, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 636 RESPONSE to Motion re #613 First MOTION to Vacate January 29, 2019 Order Denying Defendant Vantage Payments LLC and Dustin Sparman's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Bonsignore, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 635 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #625 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Vantage Payments, LLC answer due 3/29/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 634 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #623 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Allied Wallet, Ltd. answer due 3/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 633 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #622 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Base Commerce, LLC answer due 3/21/2019; John Hughes answer due 3/21/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 632 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #621 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Joseph H. Craft answer due 3/1/2019; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 3/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 631 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #620 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Katia B. Wanzeler answer due 3/21/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 630 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #612 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Propay, Inc. answer due 3/15/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 629 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #619 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer International Payout Systems, Inc. answer due 3/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 628 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #618 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gerald P. Nehra answer due 3/21/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 627 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #617 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer John F. Merrill answer due 3/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 626 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #616 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fidelity Co-Operative Bank answer due 3/1/2019. (Jones, Sherry)
February 14, 2019 Filing 625 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2019 to File Answer by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 624 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Dormitzer on behalf of John F. Merrill (Dormitzer, Jessica)
February 13, 2019 Filing 623 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Allied Wallet, Ltd..(Steiner, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 622 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 21, 2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes.(Radke, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 621 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/1/2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 620 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Katia B. Wanzeler.(Kelly, Paul)
February 12, 2019 Filing 619 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Kelly, Dennis)
February 12, 2019 Filing 618 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 21, 2019 to File Answer by Gerald P. Nehra.(Robertson, Christopher)
February 12, 2019 Filing 617 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/1/2019 to File Answer re #503 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Merrill F. John.(Pineault, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 616 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2019 to File Answer by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank.(Toomey, Joseph)
February 11, 2019 Filing 615 MEMORANDUM in Support re #614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Filing 614 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Fuller, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Filing 613 First MOTION to Vacate January 29, 2019 Order Denying Defendant Vantage Payments LLC and Dustin Sparman's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Dustin Sparman.(Crandell, Gary)
February 11, 2019 Filing 612 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint to File by Propay, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 611 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #171 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 610 First NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Steven Jay German (German, Steven)
February 1, 2019 Filing 609 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #583 Motion for oral argument. (Castles, Martin)
February 1, 2019 Filing 608 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #535 Motion to Dismiss. The litigation stay has been lifted and the Court finds that the Defendant has suffered no prejudice from any dilatory service. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 607 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 606 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY.(Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 605 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered VACATING 604 Order Denying as Moot #171 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 604 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #171 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 603 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying #368 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 602 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #166 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting #183 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Defendant Bank of America and TD Bank's Motions to Dismiss are granted. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 601 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #173 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Defendant's Motion is granted as to the Third and Fourth Claims for Relief and denied as to the Fifth and Tenth Claims for Relief. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 600 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #175 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants motion is granted as to the Third and Fourth Claim for Relief and denied as to the Tenth Claim for Relief. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 599 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #178 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Synovus Banks motion to dismiss all counts against it is granted. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 598 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #167 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting #167 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant GPGs motion to dismiss all counts against it is granted. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 597 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #180 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Defendants' Motion is granted, as to the Plaintiffs' Third and Fourth Claims for Relief and denied as to the Fifth and Tenth Claims for Relief. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 596 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #187 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Waaks Motion is granted as to all claims against him. This Motion is also granted as to the Third, Fourth, and Sixth Claims for Relief against all Defendants. The Motion is denied as to all other Claims for Relief. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 595 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #170 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 594 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #164 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting in part and denying in part #164 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Defendants' Motion is granted as to the Third and Fourth Claims for Relief and denied as to the Fifth and Tenth Claims for Relief. (Castles, Martin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 592 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 3/4/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 591 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #590 Motion to Continue. (Castles, Martin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 590 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to 3/4/2019 by John Hughes.(Dunlap, Ben)
November 1, 2018 Filing 587 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 1/3/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 586 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #585 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 585 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Injunctive Relief to January 3, 2019 or next available date by John Hughes.(Dunlap, Ben)
October 9, 2018 Filing 584 MEMORANDUM in Support re #583 MOTION Request for Oral Argument filed by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Steiner, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 583 MOTION Request for Oral Argument by Allied Wallet, Ltd..(Steiner, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 580 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 11/2/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 579 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #578 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
August 9, 2018 Filing 578 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to October 16, 2018 by John Hughes.(Dunlap, Ben)
June 15, 2018 Filing 575 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 8/14/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
May 17, 2018 Filing 573 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by William R. Baldiga for Kiersten A. Taylor (Baldiga, William)
May 7, 2018 Filing 571 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered denying #193 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
April 18, 2018 Filing 570 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #563 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Glen Guidry and David E. Meadows terminated; granting #564 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Glen Guidry and David E. Meadows terminated (Castles, Martin)
April 18, 2018 Filing 569 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 6/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
April 18, 2018 Filing 568 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #567 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
April 12, 2018 Filing 567 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes to June 25, 2018 with certificate of service by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
March 23, 2018 Filing 565 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #562 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J Andrew Pratt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
March 22, 2018 Filing 564 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for David Glen Guidry by Propay, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas)
March 22, 2018 Filing 563 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for David E. Meadows by Propay, Inc..(Brooks, Douglas)
March 22, 2018 Filing 562 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of J. Andrew Pratt Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7061056 by Propay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Good Standing)(Brooks, Douglas)
February 16, 2018 Filing 560 REPLY to Response to #535 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Steiner, David)
February 16, 2018 Filing 559 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #551 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
February 16, 2018 Filing 558 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
February 16, 2018 Filing 557 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #556 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
February 13, 2018 Filing 556 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes to April 26, 2018 with certificate of service by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
February 13, 2018 Filing 555 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin H. Howard on behalf of Rita Dos Santos (Howard, Edwin) Modified docket text on 2/14/2018 (Burgos, Sandra).
February 13, 2018 Filing 554 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Meehan on behalf of Edwin H. Howard (Meehan, Mark) Modified on 2/14/2018 (Burgos, Sandra).
December 15, 2017 Filing 551 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A to Defendant Allied Wallet, Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Steiner, David)
December 12, 2017 Filing 550 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 2/26/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
December 12, 2017 Filing 549 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #546 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
December 8, 2017 Filing 548 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #535 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gray Echavarria)(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 30, 2017 Filing 546 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes to February 26, 2018 with certificate of service by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
November 29, 2017 Filing 545 Withdrawal of motion: #540 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, #539 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and 12(b)(5) and Local Rule 4.1 filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.. (Fuller, Robert)
November 28, 2017 Filing 544 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #542 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #535 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint and granting #543 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #539 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and 12(b)(5) and Local Rule 4.1. Responses due by 12/8/2017 (Castles, Martin)
November 22, 2017 Filing 543 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/08/2017 to File Response/Reply as to #539 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and 12(b)(5) and Local Rule 4.1 by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
November 22, 2017 Filing 542 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/08/2017 to File Response/Reply as to #535 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
November 14, 2017 Filing 541 MEMORANDUM in Support re #535 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (re-entered, as memorandum should be filed as separate entry) (Burgos, Sandra)
November 13, 2017 Filing 540 MEMORANDUM in Support re #539 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and 12(b)(5) and Local Rule 4.1 filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email between Counsel regarding Acceptance of Service)(Fuller, Robert)
November 13, 2017 Filing 539 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and 12(b)(5) and Local Rule 4.1 by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Fuller, Robert)
November 13, 2017 Filing 538 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul S. Samson on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC (Samson, Paul)
November 13, 2017 Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Doerr on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC (Doerr, Adam)
November 13, 2017 Filing 536 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Fuller on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC (Fuller, Robert)
November 10, 2017 Filing 535 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration)(Steiner, David)
November 2, 2017 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by Myles W. McDonough on behalf of Allied Wallet, Ltd. (McDonough, Myles)
November 2, 2017 Filing 532 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan B. MacDonald on behalf of Allied Wallet, Ltd. (MacDonald, Ryan)
October 19, 2017 Filing 531 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 12/18/2017 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 19, 2017 Filing 530 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #529 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
October 17, 2017 Filing 529 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by an Additional Sixty (60) Days to 12/18/2017 by Rita Dos Santos.(Bonsignore, Robert)
October 6, 2017 Filing 528 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #527 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Allied Wallet, Ltd. answer due 11/15/2017. (Castles, Martin)
October 5, 2017 Filing 527 STIPULATION Extending Time to File and Serve Answer or Other Response by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Steiner, David) Modified on 10/6/2017 (Burgos, Sandra).
October 5, 2017 Filing 525 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #523 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David P. Steiner; granting #524 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan C. Balfus. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 4, 2017 Filing 524 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan C. Balfus Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6827351 by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steiner, David)
October 4, 2017 Filing 523 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David P. Steiner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6827324 by Allied Wallet, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steiner, David)
September 7, 2017 Filing 522 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 10/25/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 7, 2017 Filing 521 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #519 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
August 31, 2017 Filing 519 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 484) to 10/18/2017 or date thereafter by John Hughes.(Dunlap, Ben)
July 19, 2017 Filing 517 REPLY to Response to #507 MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order with Respect to the Subpoena Served on the TelexFree Trustee filed by TD Bank NA. (Shaw, Jarrod)
July 19, 2017 Filing 516 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #509 Motion to join and granting #515 Motion for Leave to File Document; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
July 14, 2017 Filing 515 MOTION for Leave to File Certain Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Their Motion to Quash or for a Protective Order with Respect to the Subpoena Served on the Telexfree Trustee by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, Jarrod)
July 7, 2017 Filing 514 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2017 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Jones, Sherry)
July 7, 2017 Filing 513 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #512 Motion to Continue, Motion Hearing reset to 9/11/17 @ 4:00 pm. (Jones, Sherry)
July 6, 2017 Filing 512 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes to September 12, 2017 with certificate of service by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
July 3, 2017 Filing 510 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #507 MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order with Respect to the Subpoena Served on the TelexFree Trustee And Cross-Motion To Compel, For Sanctions And For Further Permission filed by Plaintiffs. (Feinstein, Nicholas)
June 28, 2017 Filing 509 MOTION Defendant Int'l Payout Systems' Motion to Join in and to Adopt Certain Defendants' Motion to Quash or for a Protective Order with Respect to the Subpoena Served on the TelexFree Trustee by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Kelly, Dennis) Modified on 6/28/2017 (Jones, Sherry).
June 22, 2017 Filing 508 MEMORANDUM in Support re #507 MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order with Respect to the Subpoena Served on the TelexFree Trustee filed by Bank of America, N.A., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Propay, Inc., TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (McGee, Amanda)
June 22, 2017 Filing 507 MOTION to Quash or for a Protective Order with Respect to the Subpoena Served on the TelexFree Trustee by Bank of America, N.A., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Propay, Inc., TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(McGee, Amanda)
June 21, 2017 Filing 506 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #210 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
June 6, 2017 Filing 505 EXHIBIT EXHIBITS TO FOURTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Celio Da Silva, Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Omnibus Decl. of William H. Runge, Case No. 14-125234-ABL, Doc. 13, 61,, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 1 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 2 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 4 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Part 5 - Decl. of Gray Echavarria, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Decl. Carol L. Harris, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - TelexFree, LLC Balance Sheet as of December 31, 2013, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - TelexFree Promotional Advertisements, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - deposited by TelexFree into its account with Fidelity Bank, to wit, account number 211370707, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Allied Wallet Bank Information Form for Bank of America, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 September 20, 2013 OCCurrency Consent Decree, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - SOC Consent Order E 2014-0073, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - email from John Hughes, dated May 22, 2013, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - email from Hughes to Merrill, dated August 28, 2013, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - email from Jayme Amirie to James Merrill dated September 3, 2013, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - email from Jayme Amirie to Jay Borromei dated September 27, 2013, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Letter from John Hughes to James Merrill, dated August 20, 2013, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - email from Hughes to Merrill, dated September 27, 2013, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Allied Wallet Card Payment Processing Agreement, dated August 26, 2013, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - email from Dustin Sparman to James Merrill, dated November 13, 2013, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Vantage Payments CDRN Portal Agreement, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - email from James Merrill to Dustin Sparman, dated January 15, 2014, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - email from Sparman to Merrill, dated December 27, 2013)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 6, 2017 Filing 503 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Opt3 Solutions, Inc., Gerald P. Nehra, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC, Paralegal Doe, Faith R. Sloan, Santiago De La Rosa, Telexfree, LLC, TelexElectric, LLLP, John F. Merrill, Telexfree Financial, Inc., Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Steven M. Labriola, Scott Miller, Telexfree, Inc., Carlos N. Wanzeler, Bank of America, N.A., Telex Mobile Holdings, Inc., Doe Investment Services Providers, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., Katia B. Wanzeler, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Jason Borromei, Propay, Inc., Richard W Waak, Vantage Payments, LLC, Daniil Shoyfer, Dustin Sparman, Synovus Bank, Randy N. Crosby, Joseph H. Craft, Carlos D. Costa, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Allied Wallet, Ltd., Base Commerce, LLC, James M. Merrill, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Ann Genet, Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, International Payout Systems, Inc., TD Bank NA, John Hughes, RSB Citizens, N.A., Jeffrey A Babener, Robert Weaver, Ana P Oliveira, Doe Licensed Professionals, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC, The Sheffield Group, Inc., Alexander Sidel, Gary P Tober, Bank Card Consultants, Inc., Jason Doolittle, Doe Payment Processing Services, John Yurick, Mauricio Cardenas, Garvey Schubert Barer, P.C., Doe Banks, PNC Bank, N.A., Babener & Associates, Doe Top Level Promoters, Brian Bonfiglio, John Kirchhefer, Samuel C Kauffman, Andreia B Moreira, Sara P Sandford, filed by Celio Da Silva, Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 1, 2017 Filing 502 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 1, 2017 Filing 501 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on May 17, 2017, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 1, 2017 Filing 500 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing reset for 7/10/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
June 1, 2017 Filing 499 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #496 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
June 1, 2017 Filing 498 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #497 Motion to Withdraw #439 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (Castles, Martin)
May 31, 2017 Filing 497 MOTION to Withdraw #439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
May 31, 2017 Filing 496 Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes to July 5, 2017 by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
May 26, 2017 Filing 495 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (473) Motion to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH, 4:16-cv-40018-TSH(Castles, Martin)
May 26, 2017 Filing 494 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #310 Motion to Modify the Discovery Stay for the limited purpose of serving a subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc., and TelexFree Financial, Inc. (Castles, Martin)
May 24, 2017 Filing 493 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #239 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants Dustin Sparman and Vantage Payments, LLC ("Vantage") filed a joint motion to dismiss all claims against them for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) on the basis that neither Defendant has the necessary contacts with Massachusetts to support this court's jurisdiction (Docket No. 239). However, "[i]n an MDL case, personal jurisdiction is derived from the transferor court." In re WellNx Mktg. & Sales Practices Litig., No. 07-MD-1861, 2010 WL 3652457, at *1 (D. Mass. Sept. 15, 2010) (citing In re Papst Licensing GMBH & Co. KG Litigation, 602 F.Supp.2d 10, 14 (D.D.C.2009) ("In multidistrict litigation such as this, the transferee court must apply the law of the transferor forum to determine personal jurisdiction."); In re Sterling Foster & Co., Inc. Sec. Litig., 222 F.Supp.2d 289, 300 (E.D.N.Y.2002) (applying the LongArm Statute of the transferor forum in multidistrict litigation); In re Plumbing Fixtures Litig., 342 F.Supp. 756, 758 (J.P.M.L.1972) (same)). In enacting the multidistrict litigation statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, Congress "authoriz[ed] the federal courts to exercise nationwide personal jurisdiction.and "[t]ransfers under Section 1407 are simply not encumbered by considerations of in personam jurisdiction." In re Agent Orange Prod. Liab. Litig. MDL No. 381, 818 F.2d 145, 163 (2d Cir. 1987). On September 23, 2015, Plaintiff Rita Dos Santos, putative class representative, filed a Complaint in the District of Arizona, which was served on Defendants Sparman and Vantage, and the case transferred to this court on October 20, 2015 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 as part of the present MDL. Sparman is a resident of the state of Arizona, and Vantage is an Arizona limited liability company, and thus both are subject to the jurisdiction of the Arizona transferor court. Defendants provide no basis in law for their assertion that Plaintiffs' filing and serving on them a duplicate of the Third Consolidated Amended Complaint in the District of Arizona somehow waived Plaintiffs' argument that Section 1407 confers "nationwide personal jurisdiction." Accordingly, this court has personal jurisdiction over both Sparman and Vantage Payments for all pretrial purposes, and their motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Docket No. 239) is DENIED. (Castles, Martin)
May 24, 2017 Filing 492 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #152 Motion for Order. (Castles, Martin)
May 23, 2017 Filing 491 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft, and #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
May 18, 2017 Filing 490 Opposition re #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes filed by John Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Hughes)(Dunlap, Ben)
May 17, 2017 Filing 489 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Status Conference held on 5/17/2017, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Court and counsel discuss status of case/discovery and pending motions, including #473 motion to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints, Parties propose plans for moving forward, Court takes motion and all other matters under advisement, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
May 15, 2017 Filing 488 REPLY to Response to #473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints / Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints and in Response to Partial Opposition of Base Commerce, LLC, d/b/a Phoenix Payments, LLC filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Baldiga, William)
May 15, 2017 Filing 487 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #482 Motion for Leave to File Document; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
May 15, 2017 Filing 486 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #480 Motion to Join In and Adopt Memo of Responding Defs. (Castles, Martin)
May 5, 2017 Filing 485 MEMORANDUM in Support re #484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes and Proposed Order filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wall, Alexander)
May 5, 2017 Filing 484 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant John Hughes by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
May 2, 2017 Filing 482 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baldiga, William)
April 24, 2017 Filing 481 NOTICE by Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee re #473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints Notice of Compromise with Respect to Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Modify Stay and to Amend Complaints (Baldiga, William)
April 21, 2017 Filing 480 MOTION Int'l Payout Systems' Motion to Join In and Adopt Memo of Responding Defs. Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Modify Stay & to Amend Complaint by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Losier, David)
April 21, 2017 Filing 479 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #478 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints . Responses due by 5/2/2017 (Castles, Martin)
April 18, 2017 Filing 478 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/02/2017 to File Response/Reply as to #473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP.(Holmes, Matthew)
April 18, 2017 Filing 477 Opposition re #473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints filed by Base Commerce, LLC. (Radke, James)
April 13, 2017 Filing 476 RESPONSE to Motion re #473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints filed by Bank of America, N.A., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Propay, Inc., Synovus Bank, TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (McGee, Amanda)
April 13, 2017 Filing 475 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda V. McGee on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (McGee, Amanda)
April 12, 2017 Filing 474 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #427 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Seth M. Kean; James F. Radke; Jonathan R. Doolittle and Patrick M. Emery terminated; granting #461 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Seth M. Kean; James F. Radke; Jonathan R. Doolittle and Patrick M. Emery terminated (Jones, Sherry)
April 4, 2017 Filing 473 MOTION to Partially Modify Stay on a Limited Basis and to Amend Complaints by Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Baldiga, William)
March 23, 2017 Filing 471 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 5/17/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
March 22, 2017 Filing 470 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 5/10/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
March 20, 2017 Filing 469 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference is reset for 5/5/2017 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Court is hopeful that the related criminal case against James Merrill will be completed by that date and the Court can begin addressing the many outstanding civil motions. The court appreciates the parties' patience with these delays. (Castles, Martin)
February 28, 2017 Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Losier on behalf of International Payout Systems, Inc. (Losier, David)
February 28, 2017 Filing 466 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Kelly on behalf of International Payout Systems, Inc. (Kelly, Dennis)
February 27, 2017 Filing 465 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 3/29/2017 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
January 30, 2017 Filing 463 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #462 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jarrod D. Shaw. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 26, 2017 Filing 462 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jarrod D. Shaw Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6469931 by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Jarrod D. Shaw, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hestin, Nellie)
January 6, 2017 Filing 461 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant John Hughes by Thomas S. Vangel, John C. Wyman and James F. Radke by John Hughes.(Radke, James)
December 23, 2016 Filing 459 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 3/3/2017 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
December 21, 2016 Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben N. Dunlap on behalf of John Hughes (Dunlap, Ben)
December 21, 2016 Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Kenneally on behalf of John Hughes (Kenneally, Kevin)
December 21, 2016 Filing 456 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
December 21, 2016 Filing 455 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #454 Motion for Status Hearing. (Castles, Martin)
December 12, 2016 Filing 454 MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 28, 2016 Filing 450 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
September 27, 2016 Filing 449 REPLY to Response to #439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Wall, Alexander)
September 27, 2016 Filing 448 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #447 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
September 26, 2016 Filing 447 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Joseph H. Craft by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Wall, Alexander)
September 22, 2016 Filing 446 Opposition re #439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft filed by Joseph H. Craft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Crafts, Jonathan)
September 20, 2016 Filing 445 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joseph H. Craft. (Crafts, Jonathan)
September 15, 2016 Filing 444 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #442 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Joseph H. Craft answer due 9/28/2016; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 9/28/2016. (Castles, Martin)
September 13, 2016 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Crafts on behalf of Joseph H. Craft (Crafts, Jonathan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 442 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/28/16 to File Answer re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
September 8, 2016 Filing 441 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Rita Dos Santos re #439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft, #440 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Wall, Alexander)
September 8, 2016 Filing 440 MEMORANDUM in Support re #439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft filed by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Wall, Alexander)
September 8, 2016 Filing 439 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Joseph H. Craft by Rita Dos Santos.(Wall, Alexander)
July 5, 2016 Filing 435 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re (7 in 4:16-cv-40018-TSH) Amended Complaint, filed by Elisangela Oliveira. "Despite the Court's entering a stay on all action in this case, Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint, as of right. No summons shall be issued and no pleadings shall be served until the stay is lifted by the Court. The stay shall remain in place until further order of the Court pending resolution of certain matters in the Telexfree Chapter 11 cases."Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH, 4:16-cv-40018-TSH(Jones, Sherry)
June 27, 2016 Filing 434 STATUS REPORT Second Status Report as to Related Bankruptcy Court Proceedings Regarding Recovery of Payments Made Directly by Victims to TelexFree Promoters by Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Baldiga, William)
June 20, 2016 Filing 433 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (Samson, Paul)
June 20, 2016 Filing 432 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #431 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 9/14/2016; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 9/14/2016. (Castles, Martin)
June 20, 2016 Filing 431 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 14, 2016 to File Answer re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
April 22, 2016 Filing 427 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion For Leave To Withdraw As Counsel by TD Bank NA.(Emery, Patrick)
April 7, 2016 Filing 425 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Nellie E. Hestin and Mary J. Hackett (Hestin, Nellie)
April 1, 2016 Filing 423 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #420 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 6/16/2016; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 6/16/2016. (Castles, Martin)
March 31, 2016 Filing 422 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 17, 2016 Filing 421 NOTICE by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee Notice of Papers Filed in Related Bankruptcy Court Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baldiga, William)
March 16, 2016 Filing 420 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 16, 2016 to File Answer by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
March 10, 2016 Filing 419 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS.(Castles, Martin)
March 10, 2016 Filing 418 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #415 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrea Lynn Marconi terminated (Castles, Martin)
March 3, 2016 Filing 417 AFFIDAVIT re 411 Order,,,,,,, Regarding Service of Documents upon Defendant Daniil Shoyfer by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wall, Alexander)
March 3, 2016 Filing 415 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes.(Marconi, Andrea)
March 2, 2016 Filing 414 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered staying all action case.(Castles, Martin)
February 29, 2016 Filing 413 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, Joseph H. Craft. Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 4/25/2016; Joseph H. Craft answer due 4/25/2016. (Crafts, Jonathan)
February 25, 2016 Filing 412 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In connection with its February 22, 2016 Order, the Court will also unseal Docket Entry No. 49. (Castles, Martin)
February 22, 2016 Filing 411 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On February 17, 2016, I issued an ex parte Order which: (1) required that the Plaintiffs advise the Court by 11:00 a.m. on Friday February 19, 2016 of the status of the writ of attachment of real property granted by the Court on April 23, 2015, including whether notice of the writ of attachment was served on Daniil Shoyfer; and (2) advised the Plaintiffs that unless they showed good cause as to why they should remain sealed, their motion for the attachment of real property and related submissions, and the Court's Orders by endorsement granting the motion (and waiver of the bond requirement)(Docket Nos. 40,41,42,74,135,138 and 139) would be unsealed on February 19, 2106, after 12:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' response to this Order (Docket No. 409) states that the writ of attachment was recorded on May 20, 2015. It further states that a copy was served on Mr. Shoyfer on May 29, 2015 and a copy of the executed Summons and Proof of Service was filed with the Court on June 4, 2015. However, that Summons and Proof of Service (Docket No. 206) relates to the service of the Complaint, not the writ of attachment. Given that Mr. Shoyfer is now aware that the writ of attachment was recorded, I find that the issue of notice is now moot. Nevertheless, Plaintiffs are ordered to file an affidavit detailing how service of the notice of attachment and related documents on Mr. Shoyfer was accomplished, together with executed copies of the documents that were served. I also find Plaintiffs' argument that the pleadings relating to the attachment should remain sealed unpersuasive. Further, since Plaintiffs' response was filed in the public record, any need for sealing is obviated, and therefore, Docket entry Nos. 40,41,42,74,135,138,139 and 407 shall be unsealed. (Castles, Martin)
February 19, 2016 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Radke on behalf of Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes (Radke, James)
February 19, 2016 Filing 409 Response by Plaintiffs to Ex Parte Order of February 17, 2016. (Wall, Alexander)
February 19, 2016 Filing 408 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Carol E. Head (Head, Carol)
February 17, 2016 Filing 407 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC Ex-Parte ORDER entered. The Plaintiffs shall advise the Court by 11:00 a.m. on Friday February 19, 2016 of the status of the writ of attachment of real property granted by the Court on April 23, 2015, including whether notice of the writ of attachment was served on Daniil Shoyfer. Additionally, the Plaintiffs' motion for the attachment of real property and related submissions and the Court's Orders by endorsement granting the motion and waiver of the bond requirement (Docket Nos. 40,41,42, 74,135, 138 and 139) shall be unsealed on February 19, 2106, after 12:00 p.m., unless the Plaintiffs can show good cause as to why they should remain sealed. (Castles, Martin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 406 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #233 Motion to Dismiss. (Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Celio Da Silva). No opposition having been filed. (Castles, Martin)
February 12, 2016 Filing 405 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(Castles, Martin)
February 12, 2016 Filing 404 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #403 Motion to Correct. (Castles, Martin)
February 12, 2016 Filing 403 Emergency MOTION to Correct #402 Preliminary Injunction Scrivener's Error, with Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs.(Wall, Alexander)
February 12, 2016 Filing 402 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(Castles, Martin)
February 10, 2016 Filing 401 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #400 Motion for Leave to File. (Castles, Martin)
February 9, 2016 Filing 400 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 8, 2016 Filing 399 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. FURTHER EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER.(Castles, Martin)
February 8, 2016 Filing 398 Supplemental Opposition re #342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniil Shoyfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email thread)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
February 8, 2016 Filing 397 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #396 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
February 6, 2016 Filing 396 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition by Daniil Shoyfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Opposition)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
February 4, 2016 Filing 395 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER.(Castles, Martin)
February 4, 2016 Filing 394 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
February 1, 2016 Filing 393 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Monica P. Snyder (Snyder, Monica)
January 29, 2016 Filing 392 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. Extension of TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and request for further briefing.(Castles, Martin)
January 26, 2016 Filing 391 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #388 Motion for Reconsideration. (Castles, Martin)
January 26, 2016 Filing 390 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wall, Alexander)
January 26, 2016 Filing 389 Second AFFIDAVIT in Support re #342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wall, Alexander)
January 25, 2016 Filing 388 MOTION for Reconsideration re 379 Order on Motion to Amend by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
January 25, 2016 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott P. Lopez on behalf of Randy N. Crosby (Lopez, Scott)
January 25, 2016 Filing 386 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #383 Motion for Leave to File Document. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
January 25, 2016 Filing 385 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2016 re #342 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #342 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
January 23, 2016 Filing 383 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavits in Reply to Defendant Daniil Shoyfer's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs.(Wall, Alexander)
January 22, 2016 Filing 382 Opposition re #342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniil Shoyfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Affidavit of Daniil Shoyfer)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
January 19, 2016 Filing 381 REPLY to Response to #368 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Vantage Payments, LLC. (Crandell, Gary)
January 15, 2016 Filing 380 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #378 Motion for Clarification re #375 Order on Motion for TRO. To the extent that Mr. Shoyfer is permitted to expend money and other assets to pay for ordinary living expenses necessary to house, clothe, transport and feed himself and his family. Mr. Shoyfer shall file an accounting with the Court at the time of the preliminary injunction hearing setting forth all expenditures and/or transfers made pursuant to this Order from today until the time of the hearing. The accounting shall be filed under the seal. (Castles, Martin)
January 15, 2016 Filing 379 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #252 Motion to Amend complaint. (Castles, Martin)
January 15, 2016 Filing 378 Emergency MOTION for Clarification re #375 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Daniil Shoyfer.(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
January 15, 2016 Filing 377 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER WITHDRAWING THE REFERENCE OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO THE BANKRUPTCY COURT entered. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH et al.(Jones, Sherry)
January 15, 2016 Filing 376 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #342 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2016 at 10:30AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
January 15, 2016 Filing 375 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered granting #342 Motion for TRO. (Castles, Martin)
January 5, 2016 Filing 373 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #345 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Timothy J. Durken terminated. (Castles, Martin)
December 30, 2015 Filing 372 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered taking under advisement #345 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting #345 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jason Borromei answer due 1/13/2016; Opt3 Solutions, Inc. answer due 1/13/2016. (Castles, Martin)
December 28, 2015 Filing 371 Opposition re #368 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 21, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 21, 2015 Filing 369 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 11, 2015, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 1/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2015 Filing 368 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Vantage Payments, LLC.(Crandell, Gary)
December 11, 2015 Filing 367 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2015 re #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay, #266 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC, and #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #252 Motion to Amend; granting #266 Motion to Intervene; taking under advisement #310 Motion Modifying the Discovery Stay, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
December 9, 2015 Filing 364 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Plaintiffs as to Randy N. Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 9, 2015 Filing 363 Request for notice of default by Rita Dos Santos against Defendant Scott Miller, with certificate of service. (Wall, Alexander)
December 9, 2015 Filing 362 SUMMONS Returned Executed Scott Miller served on 5/30/2015, answer due 6/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wall, Alexander)
December 9, 2015 Filing 361 Request for notice of default by Rita Dos Santos against Defendant Santiago De La Rosa, with certificate of service. (Wall, Alexander)
December 9, 2015 Filing 360 Request for notice of default by Rita Dos Santos against Defendant Sanderley Rodrigues de Vasconcelos, with certificate of service. (Wall, Alexander)
December 9, 2015 Filing 359 REPLY to Response to #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served filed by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Baldiga, William)
December 9, 2015 Filing 358 Supplemental Opposition re #266 MOTION to Intervene filed by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Baldiga, William)
December 9, 2015 Filing 357 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #355 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 3/17/2016; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 3/17/2016. (Castles, Martin)
December 9, 2015 Filing 356 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #354 Motion for Leave to File. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
December 9, 2015 Filing 355 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 17, 2016 to File Answer by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
December 8, 2015 Filing 354 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Trustee's Motion to Intervene by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baldiga, William)
December 7, 2015 Filing 353 Request for notice of default by Rita Dos Santos against Defendant Faith R. Sloan, with certificate of service. (Wall, Alexander)
December 7, 2015 Filing 352 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rita Dos Santos. John Hughes waiver sent on 12/4/2015, answer due 2/2/2016. (German, Steven)
December 7, 2015 Filing 351 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rita Dos Santos. Base Commerce, LLC waiver sent on 12/4/2015, answer due 2/2/2016. (German, Steven)
November 25, 2015 Filing 350 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served, #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint, #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery , #266 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2015 at 9:15AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 349 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Rita Dos Santos as to John Hughes. (German, Steven)
November 24, 2015 Filing 348 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Rita Dos Santos as to Base Commerce, LLC. (German, Steven)
November 24, 2015 Filing 347 SUMMONS Returned Executed (German, Steven)
November 24, 2015 Filing 346 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rita Dos Santos served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (German, Steven)
November 19, 2015 Filing 345 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jager Smith P.C. and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond (w/ Certificate of Service) by Jason Borromei, Opt3 Solutions, Inc..(Durken, Timothy). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 11/20/2015 (Burgos, Sandra).
November 18, 2015 Filing 344 Response by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes to #340 Reply to Response to Motion . (Snyder, Monica)
November 18, 2015 Filing 343 MEMORANDUM in Support re #342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Igor Joseph Shikhman, #2 Affidavit of Igor Joseph Shikhman, #3 Certification of Plaintiff's Counsel)(Burgos, Sandra)
November 18, 2015 Filing 342 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 12/2/2015) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Preliminary Injunction)(Burgos, Sandra)
November 17, 2015 Filing 341 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #338 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steven J. German. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 16, 2015 Filing 340 REPLY to Response to #336 MOTION to Strike #335 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
November 16, 2015 Filing 339 Opposition re #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena filed by Bank of America, N.A., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Propay, Inc., TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Meadows, David)
November 16, 2015 Filing 338 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven J. German Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5843838 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 12, 2015 Filing 337 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #331 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served Responses due by 11/16/2015 (Castles, Martin)
November 10, 2015 Filing 336 MOTION to Strike or in the alternative Motion to Stay and OPPOSITION RE: #335 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5))(ORIGINALLY FILED IN 15CV13614 ON 10/19/15)(Jones, Sherry)
November 10, 2015 Filing 335 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, MOTION to Stay this action pending resolution of the first filed action in the US District Court of Massachusetts by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2)(ORIGINALLY FILED IN 15CV13614 ON 10/5/15)(Jones, Sherry)
November 10, 2015 Filing 334 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re (18 in 1:14-cv-12058-TSH) Amended Complaint filed by Igor Kunyanksi, Svetlana Nayman. " As a responsive pleading had been filed, Plaintiff was required to obtain leave of Court in order to amend his complaint; because Plaintiff failed to obtain such leave, the pleading is stricken. Plaintiff is reminded that when making filings, he must comply with this Courts case management orders: Case Management Order No. 1 requires that those filings which relate only to an individual action within the MDL be made in both the individual action and the master docket. Additionally, Plaintiff shall provided the Court with proof that the original complaint has been served as required by this Courts Federal Rules of Civil Procedure."Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH, 1:14-cv-12058-TSH(Jones, Sherry)
November 9, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 9, 2015 Filing 332 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on November 2, 2015, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 11/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 9, 2015 Filing 331 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/16/15 to File Response/Reply as to #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served by Bank of America Corporation, Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Propay, Inc., TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sumner, Phyllis)
November 4, 2015 Filing 330 Sur-REPLY to Response to #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Daniil Shoyfer. (Fray-Witzer, Evan) Modified on 11/5/2015 (Burgos, Sandra).
November 3, 2015 Filing 329 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #327 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
November 2, 2015 Filing 328 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2015 re #173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by International Payout Systems, Inc., #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., #175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Propay, Inc., #193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Katia B. Wanzeler, #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John F. Merrill, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dustin Sparman, #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by TD Bank NA, #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Synovus Bank, #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard W Waak, Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Gerald P. Nehra, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC, #233 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Celio Da Silva filed by Plaintiffs, #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann Genet, #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Hughes, Base Commerce, LLC, #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #233 Motion to Dismiss; taking under advisement #239 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #164 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #164 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #166 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #167 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #167 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; taking under advisement #170 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #171 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #173 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #175 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #178 Motion to Dismiss; taking under advisement #180 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #183 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #187 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #193 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement #210 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Court will reschedule a hearing on the motion to amend and motion to intervene, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
November 2, 2015 Filing 327 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Daniil Shoyfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
October 30, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Notice of Plaintiffs' Response to Certain Bank Defendants' Proposed Schedule for Oral Argument on Their Motions to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule (Bonsignore, Robert)
October 30, 2015 Filing 325 Errata by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee to #318 Opposition to Motion, . (Baldiga, William)
October 30, 2015 Filing 324 REPLY to Response to #266 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC. (Bennett, Charles)
October 30, 2015 Filing 323 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #321 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
October 30, 2015 Filing 322 RESPONSE to Motion re #310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served filed by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC. (Bennett, Charles)
October 30, 2015 Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Docket. No. 266 by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Charles)
October 29, 2015 Filing 320 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2015 re #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, Case called, Counsel and dft Rodrigues De Vasconcelos appear by telephone for motion hearing, Dft does not speak English, Counsel translates for the dft, Court hears counsel on motion to withdraw, Successor counsel might be filing an appearance soon, Dft will proceed pro-se until and unless new counsel appears, Court rules granting #225 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ludovino P. Gardini and Erica Petkov terminated; granting #226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ludovino P. Gardini and Erica Petkov terminated. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Gardini,Petkov) (Castles, Martin)
October 29, 2015 Filing 319 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #316 Motion to appear by telephone. The call in number is 888-675-2535 - access code 9932461. (Castles, Martin)
October 28, 2015 Filing 318 Opposition re #266 MOTION to Intervene / Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee's Opposition to Trustee's Motion to Intervene filed by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Baldiga, William)
October 28, 2015 Filing 317 NOTICE by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes Opposition to Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Snyder, Monica)
October 28, 2015 Filing 316 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at October 29, 2015 Hearing by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Petkov, Erica)
October 28, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John, John F. Merrill, Synovus Bank, TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Proposed Schedule for Oral Argument on Their Motions to Dismiss (Pickering, Kenneth)
October 27, 2015 Filing 314 REPLY to Response to #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bonsignore, Robert)
October 27, 2015 Filing 313 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #312 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
October 26, 2015 Filing 312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum)(Bonsignore, Robert)
October 26, 2015 Filing 311 REPLY to Response to #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Vantage Payments, LLC. (Crandell, Gary)
October 26, 2015 Filing 310 MOTION (I) Modifying the Discovery Stay; (II) Granting them Leave to Serve a Subpoena on Stephen B. Darr, as Chapter 11 Trustee of TelexFree, LLC, TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree Financial, Inc.; and Compelling the Trustee to Comply with Properly Served Subpoena by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baldiga, William)
October 21, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander D. Wall on behalf of Rita Dos Santos (Wall, Alexander)
October 21, 2015 Filing 308 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #303 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Cadio Zirpoli. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 21, 2015 Filing 307 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #302 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Carl Hammarskjold. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 21, 2015 Filing 306 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #301 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard Alexander Saveri. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 21, 2015 Filing 305 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint and #266 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2015 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 21, 2015 Filing 304 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part #300 Motion for Extension of Time Response re #266 MOTION to Intervene . ( Responses due by 10/28/2015). The Court will hear oral argument on the motion to intervene on 11/2/15 at the afternoon session. (Castles, Martin)
October 20, 2015 Filing 303 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cadio Zirpoli Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5801440 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonsignore, Robert)
October 20, 2015 Filing 302 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carl Hammarskjold Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5801437 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonsignore, Robert)
October 20, 2015 Filing 301 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Alexander Saveri Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5801436 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonsignore, Robert)
October 20, 2015 Filing 300 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Trustee's Motion to Intervene , MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee.(Baldiga, William)
October 20, 2015 Filing 299 Conditional Transfer order number 2 in MDL 2566 dated 10/16/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Timothy S. Hillman for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
October 16, 2015 Filing 298 REPLY to Response to #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann Genet. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 16, 2015 Filing 297 REPLY to Response to #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, John F. Merrill. (Roffman, Ian)
October 16, 2015 Filing 296 REPLY to Response to #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (O'Connor, Paul)
October 16, 2015 Filing 295 REPLY to Response to #175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Propay, Inc.. (Meadows, David)
October 16, 2015 Filing 294 REPLY to Response to #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by TD Bank NA. (Hackett, Mary)
October 16, 2015 Filing 293 REPLY to Response to #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (in further support) filed by Synovus Bank. (Mirick, John)
October 16, 2015 Filing 292 REPLY to Response to #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Samson, Paul)
October 16, 2015 Filing 291 DECLARATION re #290 Reply to Response to Motion of S. Elaine McChesney by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(McChesney, S.)
October 16, 2015 Filing 290 REPLY to Response to #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (McChesney, S.)
October 16, 2015 Filing 289 REPLY to Response to #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America, N.A., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Merrill F. John, Synovus Bank, TD Bank NA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (McChesney, S.)
October 16, 2015 Filing 288 REPLY to Response to #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra, Richard W Waak. (Robertson, Christopher)
October 16, 2015 Filing 287 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #282 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul K. Silverberg and Kraig S. Weiss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 16, 2015 Filing 286 REPLY to Response to #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes. (Snyder, Monica)
October 15, 2015 Filing 285 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , and #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing reset for 10/29/2015 at 3:15PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 15, 2015 Filing 284 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #283 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
October 15, 2015 Filing 283 Second MOTION to Continue Hearing on Counsels' Motion to Withdraw by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Gardini, Ludovino)
October 15, 2015 Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul K. Silverberg, Esq. and Kraig S. Weiss, Esq. Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-5793285 by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Weiss, Ronald)
October 14, 2015 Filing 281 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #277 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jason Borromei answer due 12/14/2015; Opt3 Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/14/2015. (Castles, Martin)
October 14, 2015 Filing 280 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #276 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in joint reply. (Castles, Martin)
October 14, 2015 Filing 279 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing reset for 10/16/2015 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 14, 2015 Filing 278 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #274 Motion to appear by telephone. The motion hearing will be continued to Friday 10/16/15 at 3:00PM. (Castles, Martin)
October 14, 2015 Filing 277 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to December 14, 2015 to File Answer with certificate of service by Jason Borromei, Opt3 Solutions, Inc..(Durken, Timothy)
October 13, 2015 Filing 276 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Joint Reply Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss by Synovus Bank.(Pickering, Kenneth)
October 13, 2015 Filing 275 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #270 Motion for Leave to File reply in Excess of Page limit. (Castles, Martin)
October 13, 2015 Filing 274 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at October 14, 2015 Hearing re #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Gardini, Ludovino)
October 13, 2015 Filing 273 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #271 Motion to appear by telephone. Call in number is 888-675-2535 - access code 9932461. (Castles, Martin)
October 13, 2015 Filing 272 Reset Deadlines as to #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2015 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. Entry is made to correct date. Previous notice had the year as 2016. (Castles, Martin)
October 13, 2015 Filing 271 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at October 14, 2015 Hearing re #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Petkov, Erica)
October 13, 2015 Filing 270 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes.(Snyder, Monica)
October 7, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan M. Fray-Witzer on behalf of Daniil Shoyfer (Fray-Witzer, Evan)
October 7, 2015 Filing 268 Opposition re #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Daniil Shoyfer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shoyfer Affidavit With Exhibits)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
October 7, 2015 Filing 267 MEMORANDUM in Support re #266 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Bennett, Charles)
October 7, 2015 Filing 266 MOTION to Intervene by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC.(Bennett, Charles)
October 6, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes of Filing Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Stay the Newly Filed Action in the United States District Court for the District of Arizona (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Monica)
October 6, 2015 Filing 264 RESPONSE to Motion re #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint Memorandum of Responding Defendants Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Samson, Paul)
October 6, 2015 Filing 263 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Motion Hearing reset for 10/14/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 6, 2015 Filing 262 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #261 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 261 MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing on Counsels' Motion to Withdraw by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Petkov, Erica)
October 2, 2015 Filing 260 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and #226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2015 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. Only counsel for the moving defendant are required to attend hearing. Counsel are to instruct defendant that he is required to attend hearing as well.(Castles, Martin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 259 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #244 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan H. Kaskel; Angel A. Cortinas and William K. Hill terminated (Castles, Martin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 258 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #249 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas S. Vangel; John C. Wyman; Andrea Lynn Marconi and Monica P. Snyder terminated; granting #250 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas S. Vangel; John C. Wyman; Andrea Lynn Marconi and Monica P. Snyder terminated (Castles, Martin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 257 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #255 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 12/18/2015; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 12/18/2015. (Castles, Martin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 256 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #245 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jason Borromei answer due 10/15/2015; Opt3 Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/15/2015. (Castles, Martin)
September 25, 2015 Filing 255 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/18/2015 to File Answer by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
September 24, 2015 Filing 254 Opposition re #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 23, 2015 Filing 253 MEMORANDUM in Support re #252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Third Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 23, 2015 Filing 252 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 18, 2015 Filing 251 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #248 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James C. Huber. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 17, 2015 Filing 250 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc..(Marconi, Andrea)
September 17, 2015 Filing 249 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc..(Snyder, Monica)
September 17, 2015 Filing 248 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James C. Huber Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5750881 by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Batson, Michael)
September 17, 2015 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Milso on behalf of Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. (Milso, John)
September 17, 2015 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Batson on behalf of Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. (Batson, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 245 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to October 15, 2015 to File Answer with certificate of service by Jason Borromei, Opt3 Solutions, Inc..(Durken, Timothy)
September 9, 2015 Filing 244 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Cortinas, Angel)
September 8, 2015 Filing 243 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting TIME OF Hearing on Motion #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #233 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Celio Da Silva, #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing TIME reset for 11/2/2015 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. Each party will be allowed 30 minutes to argue. Any party who has booked airfare to arrive the morning of 11/2/15 will be excused from the morning session and allowed to argue in the afternoon session. The Court will sit 10:00AM to 12:00PM and again from 1:00PM to 5:00PM.(Castles, Martin)
September 4, 2015 Filing 242 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dustin Sparman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Dustin Sparman, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of Dustin Sparman)(Crandell, Gary)
September 4, 2015 Filing 241 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dustin Sparman. (Crandell, Gary)
September 4, 2015 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM in Support re #239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dustin Sparman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Crandell, Gary)
September 4, 2015 Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dustin Sparman.(Crandell, Gary)
September 4, 2015 Filing 238 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #231 Motion for Leave to Waive Compliance with Local Rule 7.1. (Castles, Martin)
September 4, 2015 Filing 237 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #230 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
September 2, 2015 Filing 236 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #233 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Celio Da Silva, #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2015 at 1:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 1, 2015 Filing 235 EXHIBIT re #234 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,, /Attachments by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 2, #2 Attachment 3)(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 1, 2015 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to the Moving Defendants' Motions to Dismiss: Substantive issues filed by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
September 1, 2015 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Without Prejudice of Celio Da Silva by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 1, 2015 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint to Certain Moving Defendants' Motions to Dismiss: Standing and Personal Jurisdiction Issues filed by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
September 1, 2015 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File to Waive Compliance with Local Rule 7.1 by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
September 1, 2015 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Briefs by Plaintiffs.(Bonsignore, Robert)
August 25, 2015 Filing 229 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #228 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gary L Crandell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 20, 2015 Filing 228 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gary L Crandell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5712013 by Dustin Sparman and Vantage Payments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crandell, Gary) Modified on 8/25/2015 (Burgos, Sandra).
August 20, 2015 Filing 227 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gary L Crandell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5711961 by Dustin Sparman.(Crandell, Gary)
August 17, 2015 Filing 226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Petkov, Erica)
August 17, 2015 Filing 225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos.(Gardini, Ludovino)
August 14, 2015 Filing 224 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #223 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jason Borromei answer due 9/16/2015; Opt3 Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/16/2015. (Castles, Martin)
August 13, 2015 Filing 223 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint to File Answer with certificate of service by Jason Borromei, Opt3 Solutions, Inc..(Durken, Timothy)
August 5, 2015 Filing 222 Filing fee/payment: $ 200.00, receipt number 1BST050999 for #221 Notice by International Payout Systems, Inc. of Filing Affidavits in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 30, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE by International Payout Systems, Inc. of Filing Affidavits in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Affidavit P. SIlverberg, #2 Affidavit K. Weiss)(Silverberg, Paul)
July 17, 2015 Filing 220 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #219 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Joseph H. Craft answer due 9/25/2015; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 9/25/2015. (Castles, Martin)
July 16, 2015 Filing 219 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/25/2015 to File Answer by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan)
June 22, 2015 Filing 217 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 22, 2015 Filing 216 Transcript of Status Conference held on June 12, 2015, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 19, 2015 Filing 215 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by Daniil Shoyfer.(Shayefar, Matthew)
June 19, 2015 Filing 214 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #213 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jason Borromei answer due 8/17/2015; Opt3 Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/17/2015. (Castles, Martin)
June 18, 2015 Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/17/2015 to File Answer with certificate of service by Jason Borromei, Opt3 Solutions, Inc..(Durken, Timothy) Modified on 6/19/2015 (Burgos, Sandra).
June 12, 2015 Filing 212 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 6/12/2015, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Court and counsel discuss the pending motions to dismiss, The Trustee's actions, and the U.S. Attorney's position on the criminal case going forward re discovery, Court takes under advisement the proposed Orders staying discovery pending the criminal trail, Court orders responses to motions to dismiss to be filed by 9/1/15, Replies to be filed by 10/16/15, Court will schedule motion hearing and further status conference for a date after the motions to dismiss are ripe, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
June 12, 2015 Filing 211 SUMMONS Returned Executed PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP served on 5/29/2015, answer due 6/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 11, 2015 Filing 210 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ann Genet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgos, Sandra)
June 9, 2015 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 9, 2015 Filing 208 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #207 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
June 5, 2015 Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Proposed Order to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 4, 2015 Filing 206 SUMMONS Returned Executed Daniil Shoyfer served on 5/29/2015, answer due 6/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 4, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE by Liaison Counsel Notice of Appointment of Brown Rudnick LLP as Liaison Counsel (Baldiga, William)
June 3, 2015 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery (Plaintiffs' Motion) filed by United States of America. (Flashner, Cory)
June 3, 2015 Filing 203 SUMMONS Returned Executed Faith R. Sloan served on 5/20/2015, answer due 6/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R. Moskop on behalf of Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra, Richard W Waak, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC (Moskop, Katherine)
June 2, 2015 Filing 201 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #177 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joseph H. Craft answer due 7/16/2015; Craft Financial Solutions, LLC answer due 7/16/2015. (Castles, Martin)
June 2, 2015 Filing 200 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #186 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
June 2, 2015 Filing 199 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ann Genet answer due 6/11/2015. (Castles, Martin)
June 2, 2015 Filing 198 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by James M. Merrill.(Goldstein, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Goldstein on behalf of James M. Merrill (Goldstein, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 196 MEMORANDUM in Support re #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Snyder, Monica)
June 2, 2015 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Support re #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Snyder, Monica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM in Support re #193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Katia B. Wanzeler. (Commisso, John)
June 1, 2015 Filing 193 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Katia B. Wanzeler.(Commisso, John)
June 1, 2015 Filing 192 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dustin Sparman served on 5/28/2015, answer due 6/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
June 1, 2015 Filing 191 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by Carlos N. Wanzeler.(Commisso, John)
June 1, 2015 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher F. Robertson on behalf of Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra, Richard W Waak, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC (Robertson, Christopher)
June 1, 2015 Filing 189 AFFIDAVIT of Maddonna Jenkins in Support re #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit To Declaration, #2 Exhibit To Declaration, #3 Exhibit To Declaration, #4 Exhibit To Declaration, #5 Exhibit To Declaration, #6 Exhibit To Declaration, #7 Exhibit To Declaration, #8 Exhibit To Declaration)(McChesney, S.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM in Support re #187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra, Richard W Waak, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC. (Robertson, Christopher)
June 1, 2015 Filing 187 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Gerald P. Nehra, Richard W Waak, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC.(Robertson, Christopher)
June 1, 2015 Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Law Offices of Nehra and Waak.(Robertson, Christopher)
June 1, 2015 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Connolly on behalf of Fidelity Co-Operative Bank (Connolly, Matthew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM in Support re #183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (McChesney, S.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 183 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bank of America, N.A..(McChesney, S.) Modified on 6/11/2015 (Jones, Sherry).
June 1, 2015 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM in Support re #180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, John F. Merrill. (Roffman, Ian)
June 1, 2015 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint . (Pickering, Kenneth)
June 1, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, John F. Merrill.(Roffman, Ian)
June 1, 2015 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM in Support re #178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Synovus Bank. (Pickering, Kenneth)
June 1, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Synovus Bank.(Pickering, Kenneth)
June 1, 2015 Filing 177 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2015 to File Responsive Pleading by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Crafts, Jonathan) Modified on 6/2/2015 (Castles, Martin).
June 1, 2015 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM in Support re #175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Propay, Inc.. (Meadows, David)
June 1, 2015 Filing 175 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Propay, Inc..(Meadows, David)
June 1, 2015 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM in Support re #170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (O'Connor, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by International Payout Systems, Inc..(Cortinas, Angel)
June 1, 2015 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in Support re #171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Samson, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 171 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Samson, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 memorandum)(O'Connor, Paul)
June 1, 2015 Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jamsheed Amirie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Snyder, Monica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM in Support re #166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by TD Bank NA. (Hackett, Mary)
June 1, 2015 Filing 167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 6/15/2015) by Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit)(Snyder, Monica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 166 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by TD Bank NA.(Hackett, Mary)
June 1, 2015 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Snyder, Monica)
June 1, 2015 Filing 164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 6/15/2015) by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Snyder, Monica)
May 30, 2015 Filing 163 Opposition re #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery Joinder filed by Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC. (Robertson, Christopher)
May 29, 2015 Filing 162 Opposition re #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery filed by Synovus Bank. (Mirick, John)
May 29, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/11/2015 to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss or a Response re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, by Ann Genet.(Burgos, Sandra)
May 29, 2015 Filing 160 Opposition re #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery by Certain Defendants filed by Propay, Inc.. (Sumner, Phyllis)
May 29, 2015 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed Opt3 Solutions, Inc. served on 5/19/2015, answer due 6/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 29, 2015 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jason Borromei served on 5/19/2015, answer due 6/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 27, 2015 Filing 157 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #156 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
May 27, 2015 Filing 156 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Base Commerce, LLC, John Hughes.(Snyder, Monica)
May 26, 2015 Filing 155 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #154 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
May 26, 2015 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP.(O'Connor, Paul)
May 20, 2015 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Support re #152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 20, 2015 Filing 152 MOTION for Order to To Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Stay Discovery)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 15, 2015 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ann Genet served on 5/8/2015, answer due 5/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 12, 2015 Filing 150 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plaintiffs. John Hughes waiver sent on 5/4/2015, answer due 7/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 8, 2015 Filing 149 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RSB Citizens, N.A.. (Weida, Jason)
May 4, 2015 Filing 148 Summons Issued as to Faith R. Sloan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
May 1, 2015 Filing 147 Summons Issued as to Jason Borromei, Ann Genet, John Hughes, Scott Miller, Opt3 Solutions, Inc., Daniil Shoyfer, Dustin Sparman. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 30, 2015 Filing 146 EXHIBIT re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, Exhibits to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 30, 2015 Filing 145 EXHIBIT re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, Exhibits to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 30, 2015 Filing 144 EXHIBIT re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, Exhibits to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 30, 2015 Filing 143 EXHIBIT re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, Exhibits to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3.Part 2, #2 Exhibit 3.Part 3, #3 Exhibit 3.Part 4)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 30, 2015 Filing 142 EXHIBIT re #141 Amended Complaint,,,, Exhibits to Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Complaint)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 30, 2015 Filing 141 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Opt3 Solutions, Inc., Gerald P. Nehra, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC, Richard W Waak, Attorney at Law, PLLC, Telex Mobile Holdings, Inc., Paralegal Doe, Faith R. Sloan, Law Offices of Nehra and Waak, Doe Banks, Randy N. Crosby, Doe Professional Services Providers, Santiago De La Rosa, Katia B. Wanzeler, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Jason Borromei, Propay, Inc., TelexElectric, LLLP, Richard W Waak, Vantage Payments, LLC, Daniil Shoyfer, Dustin Sparman, Synovus Bank, Doe Payment Processors, John F. Merrill, Joseph H. Craft, Carlos D. Costa, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Processors Doe, Allied Wallet, Ltd., Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, Steven M. Labriola, Scott Miller, Base Commerce, LLC, James M. Merrill, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Carlos N. Wanzeler, Doe Inside Promoters, Ann Genet, Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos, International Payout Systems, Inc., TD Bank NA, John Hughes, RSB Citizens, N.A., filed by Celio Da Silva, Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 29, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Middlesex Savings Bank (Heffernan, Lawrence)
April 23, 2015 Filing 139 SEALED WRIT OF ATTACHMENT ISSUED. (Jones, Sherry)
April 23, 2015 Filing 138 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: SEALED ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Writ. (Jones, Sherry)
April 23, 2015 Filing 137 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "Plaintiffs have filed an Errata to the First Consolidated Amended Complaint (Docket No. 132), which among other things, appears to add party defendants. That filing is STRICKEN as this Courts rules do not provide for the filing of an errata to a pleading. The Master Consolidated Complaint filed on March 31, 2015 should not have been referred to as a First Consolidated Amended Complaint, as there was no operative pleading to amend and is contrary to this Courts directive in Paragraph 2 of MDL Case Management Order No. 4 (Docket No. 110)(MDL Order No. 4). Therefore, the question is whether Plaintiffs may file an amended Consolidated Complaint, as of right. The rules of procedure permit the Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint once, as of right, within 21 days of service. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a). Because the Court has given the Defendants at least 30 days to answer or respond to the Master Consolidated Complaint, the Court will allow Plaintiffs to file an amendment to the First Consolidated Amended Complaint, as of right, on or before April 30, 2015. Because of the terminology previously used by the Plaintiffs, this pleading shall be referred to as the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint electronically, and shall choose the event amended complaint when doing so. Defendants named in that pleading shall respond to the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint within the time provided in Paragraph 7 of MDL Order No. 4. Furthermore, the joint proposed scheduling order referred to in Paragraph 8 of MDL Order No. 4 shall be filed within 60 days of the filing of the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. If a Second Consolidated Amended Complaint is not filed, then the deadlines specified in Paragraphs 7 and 8 of MDL Order No. 4 shall each be extended by 14 days.This failure to understand and/or follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Courts Orders has resulted in unnecessary work for the Court. If this course of conduct persists, I will consider removing the law firm of Bonsignore, PLLC as Interim Lead Counsel." (Jones, Sherry)
April 22, 2015 Filing 136 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference is reset for 6/12/2015 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 135 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: SEALED ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTED without prejudice to reconsider upon motion by Daniil Shoyfer #40 Motion to waive bond requirement. (Jones, Sherry) Modified on 4/23/2015, clerks error changed from denying to granted. (Jones, Sherry).
April 22, 2015 Filing 134 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #119 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file their own proposed order and any objections to defenants on or before May 20, 2015. (Jones, Sherry)
April 22, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Carol E. Head effective April 22, 2015 (Head, Carol)
April 21, 2015 Filing 132 STRIKEN FROM THE RECORD Errata by Plaintiffs to First Consolidated Amended Complaint (Doc. #121) (with Certificate of Service). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised First Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Bonsignore, Robert) Modified on 6/11/2015 (Jones, Sherry).
April 10, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Synovus Financial Corporation, with Certificate of Service (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 10, 2015 Filing 130 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plaintiffs. Synovus Bank waiver sent on 4/8/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 129 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint Exhibits 11 through 21 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 128 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint Exhibits 4 through 10 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 127 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 Part 5 by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 126 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 Part 4 by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 125 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 Part 3 by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 124 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 Part 2 by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 123 EXHIBIT 3 PART 1 by Plaintiffs. (Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 122 EXHIBIT re #121 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 31, 2015 Filing 121 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT) against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 30, 2015 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #119 MOTION to Strike #117 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Certificate of Service /Certain Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike/ filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schacter, Kenneth)
March 27, 2015 Filing 119 MOTION to Strike #117 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 24, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Courtney R. Radow (Radow, Courtney)
March 23, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. /Certain Defendants' Notice of Proposed Order to Stay Discovery/ (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Stay Discovery)(Schacter, Kenneth) Modified on 3/24/2015 (Burgos, Sandra).
March 19, 2015 Filing 116 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered granting (4) Motion to Appoint lead Counsel. Appointed Svetlana Nayman and Igor Kunyanski in case 1:14-cv-12058-TSH Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH, 1:14-cv-12058-TSH(Castles, Martin)
March 13, 2015 Filing 115 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edward T. Dangel, III terminated (Castles, Martin)
March 12, 2015 Filing 114 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Co-Counsel by Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC.(Dangel, Edward)
March 10, 2015 Filing 113 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 5/11/2015 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
March 10, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Andrea Lynn Marconi (Marconi, Andrea)
March 10, 2015 Filing 111 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MDL CASE MANGEMENT ORDER NO.5 entered granting #62 Motion to Intervene and for a stay of discovery pending resolution of parallel criminal proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
March 10, 2015 Filing 110 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 entered in case 1:14-cv-12058-TSH; denying (33) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:14-cv-12437-TSH; denying (140) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:14-cv-12825-TSH; denying (40) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-cv-40093-TSH; denying (27) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-cv-40095-TSH; denying (63) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-cv-40138-TSH; denying (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-cv-40144-TSH; denying (67) Motion for Order; denying (85) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-md-02566-TSH; denying (14) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-cv-40154-TSH; denying (23) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:14-cv-40156-TSH Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH et al.(Jones, Sherry)
March 6, 2015 Filing 109 Recommendations for Scheduling Order and Supplement to Limited Opposition of the Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee to the Motion of the Department of Justice for Leave to Intervene and for a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings (Dkt. #62). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
March 4, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Shapiro on behalf of DLI Inc (Shapiro, Jordan)
March 4, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 4, 2015 Filing 106 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on March 2, 2015, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 3/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
March 2, 2015 Filing 105 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 3/2/2015, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Court hears arguments on pending motions, Court rules taking under advisement #62 Motion to stay case and taking under advisement #85 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Court and counsel discuss issues with the filing date of the amended complaint and other discovery issues, Court takes matters under advisement, Court will set s further status conference, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
March 2, 2015 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Holmes on behalf of PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP (Holmes, Matthew)
March 2, 2015 Filing 103 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: AMENDED MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 entered. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH et al.(Jones, Sherry)
February 28, 2015 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to #62 MOTION to Intervene and For a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings, and Memorandum In Support PLAINTIFFS' ABBREVIATED REPLY TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR AN ORDER GRANTING DISCOVERY AND STAYING MOTIONS filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 27, 2015 Filing 101 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #98 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lee M. Pollack terminated (Castles, Martin)
February 26, 2015 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to #62 MOTION to Intervene and For a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings, and Memorandum In Support filed by Stephen B. Darr as Trustee of the Chapter 11 Estates of TelexFree, Inc. and TelexFree, LLC. (Bennett, Charles)
February 26, 2015 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to #62 MOTION to Intervene and For a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings, and Memorandum In Support filed by United States of America. (Lelling, Andrew)
February 25, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Citizens Financial Group and Citizens Bank of Massachusetts (now Citizens Bank N.A.) by Lee M. Pollack.(Pollack, Lee)
February 24, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE to counsel. The Court will hear arguments on all pending motions at the status conference set for 3/2/15. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH et al.(Castles, Martin)
February 24, 2015 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC (Dwyer, Thomas)
February 24, 2015 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Crafts on behalf of Joseph H. Craft, Craft Financial Solutions, LLC (Crafts, Jonathan)
February 20, 2015 Filing 94 Response by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Base Commerce, LLC, Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., International Payout Systems, Inc., Middlesex Savings Bank, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Propay, Inc., TD Bank NA, Waddell & Reed Financial, Inc., Waddell & Reed, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. to #84 Opposition to Motion, . (Fuller, Robert)
February 19, 2015 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed Katia B. Wanzeler served on 2/4/2015, answer due 2/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 19, 2015 Filing 92 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Gayan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 19, 2015 Filing 91 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William L. Coulthard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 18, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Dennis J. Kelly as to Thomas A. Zaccaro (Kelly, Dennis)
February 18, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Dennis J. Kelly as to Certain Pro Hac Vice Counsel (Kelly, Dennis)
February 18, 2015 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Gayan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5413013 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael J. Gayan in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 18, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William L. Coulthard Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5412988 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of William L. Coulthard in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonsignore, Robert)
February 17, 2015 Filing 86 Conditional Transfer order number 1 in MDL 2566 dated 2/17/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the listed actions to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to Judge Timothy S. Hillman for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
February 11, 2015 Filing 85 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Certain Defendants' Motion to Consolidate, To Set a Schedule for Filing a Consolidated Amended Complaint, and for Related Procedural Relief by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kean, Seth)
January 30, 2015 Filing 84 Opposition re #62 MOTION to Intervene and For a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings, and Memorandum In Support filed by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee. (Baldiga, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 83 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 3/2/2015 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
January 21, 2015 Filing 82 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #62 MOTION to Intervene and For a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings, and Memorandum In Support. Response due by 1/30/2015. (Castles, Martin)
January 20, 2015 Filing 81 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/30/2015 to Respond to the Motion of the United States (Department of Justice) for Leave to Intervene and for a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings [Docket No. 62] by Interim Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Interim Executive Committee.(Baldiga, William) Modified docket text on 1/21/2015 (Burgos, Sandra).
December 23, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Pickering on behalf of Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation (Pickering, Kenneth)
December 23, 2014 Filing 79 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 entered granting #20 Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Class Counsel. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 3/2/2015 (Jones, Sherry).
December 16, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 16, 2014 Filing 77 Transcript of Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on December 15, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 1/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 16, 2014 Filing 76 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs Post-Hearing Brief filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 16, 2014 Filing 74 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION for Writ filed by Nmah Abbah, Esam Abdelgadir, Anthony Cellucci, Chinedu Chidebe, Todd Cook, Rita Dos Santos, Samuel Elekwachi, Maduako C Ferguson, Sr, Paulo Eduardo Ferrari, Jeremiah Githere, Felicia Guevara, LUCKY IMAFIDON, CHIMA IRECHUKWU, Ojebe Ifegwu, Bernadette Igboanugo, Ihuoma Igboanugo, Kingsley Igboanugo, Suru Iyesi, Merrill F. John, JOHN KALU, FESTO KYANDA, Jamilly Lake, ALICE MBUTHIA, Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes, Waldermara Martin, Christopher McCormick, EBERECHUKWU NWOBODO, EMEKA NWOKORO, Bose Ndukwe, Okoji Ndukwe, Gerald P. Nehra, Hannah Ngugi, John Nkata, ANTHONIA A. OCHIJE, UCHECHUCKWU OKAM, UKACHI OKEHIE, EZINNE P. ONYEGBULE, Uduka Okoafor, Stanley Onyeabo, LISA PATTON, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Edivaldo Reis, Veronica Saccoh, Rafaela Serrano, Joseph Shikhman, Violet Smart, Leandro Valentim, RUBY G. WALKER, Ngozi Wakama. (Jones, Sherry)
December 15, 2014 Filing 75 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 12/15/2014 and Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2014 re #20 MOTION to Appoint lead Counsel, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference/motion hearing, Court and counsel discuss various issues, Among them: case consolidation, Amendment of the complaint, PSLRA, Govt's motion to stay, Appointment of lead counsel and sub classes, etc., Court hears arguments of counsel on motion to appoint lead counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #20 Motion to Appoint lead Counsel and taking under advisement #67 Motion for case management Order.(Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Several) (Castles, Martin)
December 15, 2014 Filing 73 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William N. Withrow, Jr.; granting #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas E. Reilly. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 72 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gabor Balassa; granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joshua Z. Rabinovitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 71 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alan Snipes; granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas Gristina. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 15, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Wyman on behalf of Base Commerce, LLC, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc. (Wyman, John)
December 14, 2014 Filing 69 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Plaintiffs. Document received: Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 14, 2014 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 12, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION for Order to Approve Certain Defendants' Proposed Case Management Order No. 3 by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certain Defendants' Proposed Case Management Order)(McChesney, S.)
December 12, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Ludovino P. Gardini on behalf of Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos (Gardini, Ludovino)
December 12, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William N. Withrow, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5320082 by Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Withrow, Jr.)(Mirick, John). Added MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on 12/12/2014 (Jones, Sherry).
December 12, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas E. Reilly Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5320068 by Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vidal)(Mirick, John) Modified on 12/12/2014 (Burgos, Sandra). Added MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on 12/12/2014 (Jones, Sherry). Modified on 12/12/2014 (Jones, Sherry). (Main Document 64 replaced on 12/12/2014) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/12/2014) (Burgos, Sandra).
December 12, 2014 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs filed by Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Griffith Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Magalhaes Docket Sheet)(Carter, Evans)
December 12, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION to Intervene and For a Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Parallel Criminal Proceedings, and Memorandum In Support by United States of America.(Lelling, Andrew)
December 12, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua Z. Rabinowitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5319821 by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Good Standing Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3)(O'Connor, Paul)
December 12, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gabor Balassa Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5319778 by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Good Standing Local Rule 83.5.3)(O'Connor, Paul)
December 12, 2014 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Base Commerce, LLC, Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., FMR LLC, Fidelity Co-Operative Bank, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc., International Payout Systems, Inc., Middlesex Savings Bank, Propay, Inc., TD Bank NA, Waddell & Reed Financial, Inc., Waddell & Reed, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Meadows, David)
December 12, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory S. Flashner on behalf of United States of America (Flashner, Cory)
December 12, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Lelling on behalf of United States of America (Lelling, Andrew) (Main Document 57 replaced on 12/12/2014) (Jones, Sherry).
December 12, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas Gristina Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5318910 by Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gristina)(Mirick, John)
December 12, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alan Snipes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5318890 by Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Snipes)(Mirick, John)
December 11, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. Dangel, III on behalf of Joseph H. Craft (Dangel, Edward)
December 11, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Mirick on behalf of Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation (Mirick, John)
December 10, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul P. O'Connor on behalf of PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP (O'Connor, Paul)
December 10, 2014 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs : Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2014 at 1:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. Counsel who wish to be heard on motion to appoint lead counsel shall appear in person for hearing.(Castles, Martin)
December 9, 2014 Filing 50 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs and Opposition to Motion by Svetlana Nayman and Igor Kunyanski for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 8, 2014 Filing 49 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #41 MOTION for Writ. The moving parties have not adequately addressed the issue of this Court's authority to grant the requested relief. They are directed to file under seal, within seven days, a memorandum setting forth the authority of this Court to attach real estate in Florida. The moving parties shall address: (1) based on the current state of the pleadings, i.e, the complaint(s) naming Daniil Shoyfer as a defendant, which State law the Court should apply in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 64 (requiring application of law of State where court is located); and (2) whether this Court has authority under that law and the U.S. Constitution to attach real property in Florida. However, should they determine that Florida law applies, the moving parties need not repeat their arguments regarding whether the Florida attachment statute has been satisfied.(Castles, Martin)
December 5, 2014 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT and Certification of Rita Dos Santos Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws by Rita Dos Santos. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 5, 2014 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT and Certification of Edivaldo Reis Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws by Edivaldo Reis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
December 5, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiersten Taylor on behalf of Esam Abdelgadir (Taylor, Kiersten)
December 4, 2014 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Esam Adbelgadir by Esam Abdelgadir. (Baldiga, William)
December 4, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Esam Abdelgadir (Baldiga, William)
December 4, 2014 Filing 43 DISREGARD SHOULD HAVE FILED IN THE BANKRUPTCY COURT. Assented to MOTION for Order Approving Stipulated Order Respecting Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee To Conduct Rule 2004 Examination of TD Bank, N.A. by TD Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Order)(Hestin, Nellie) Modified on 12/5/2014 (Jones, Sherry).
December 2, 2014 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION for Attachment of Real Property of the Defendant, Danil Shoyfer filed by Nmah Abbah, Esam Abdelgadir, Anthony Cellucci, Chinedu Chidebe, Todd Cook, Rita Dos Santos, Samuel Elekwachi, Maduako C Ferguson, Sr, Paulo Eduardo Ferrari, Jeremiah Githere, Felicia Guevara, LUCKY IMAFIDON, CHIMA IRECHUKWU, Ojebe Ifegwu, Bernadette Igboanugo, Ihuoma Igboanugo, Kingsley Igboanugo, Suru Iyesi, Merrill F. John, JOHN KALU, FESTO KYANDA, Jamilly Lake, ALICE MBUTHIA, Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes, Waldermara Martin, Christopher McCormick, EBERECHUKWU NWOBODO, EMEKA NWOKORO, Bose Ndukwe, Okoji Ndukwe, Hannah Ngugi, John Nkata, ANTHONIA A. OCHIJE, UCHECHUCKWU OKAM, UKACHI OKEHIE, EZINNE P. ONYEGBULE, Uduka Okoafor, Stanley Onyeabo, LISA PATTON, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Veronica Saccoh, Rafaela Serrano, Joseph Shikhman, Violet Smart, Leandro Valentim, RUBY G. WALKER, Ngozi Wakama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgos, Sandra)
December 2, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Attachment of Real Property of the Defendant, Danil Shoyfer by Nmah Abbah, Esam Abdelgadir, Anthony Cellucci, Chinedu Chidebe, Todd Cook, Rita Dos Santos, Samuel Elekwachi, Maduako C Ferguson, Sr, Paulo Eduardo Ferrari, Jeremiah Githere, Felicia Guevara, LUCKY IMAFIDON, CHIMA IRECHUKWU, Ojebe Ifegwu, Bernadette Igboanugo, Ihuoma Igboanugo, Kingsley Igboanugo, Suru Iyesi, Merrill F. John, JOHN KALU, FESTO KYANDA, Jamilly Lake, ALICE MBUTHIA, Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes, Waldermara Martin, Christopher McCormick, EBERECHUKWU NWOBODO, EMEKA NWOKORO, Bose Ndukwe, Okoji Ndukwe, Hannah Ngugi, John Nkata, ANTHONIA A. OCHIJE, UCHECHUCKWU OKAM, UKACHI OKEHIE, EZINNE P. ONYEGBULE, Uduka Okoafor, Stanley Onyeabo, LISA PATTON, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Veronica Saccoh, Rafaela Serrano, Joseph Shikhman, Violet Smart, Leandro Valentim, RUBY G. WALKER, Ngozi Wakama. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Attachment)(Burgos, Sandra)
December 2, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION to Waive Bond Requirement in Connection with the Attachment of Real Property by Nmah Abbah, Esam Abdelgadir, Anthony Cellucci, Chinedu Chidebe, Todd Cook, Rita Dos Santos, Samuel Elekwachi, Maduako C Ferguson, Sr, Paulo Eduardo Ferrari, Jeremiah Githere, Felicia Guevara, LUCKY IMAFIDON, CHIMA IRECHUKWU, Ojebe Ifegwu, Bernadette Igboanugo, Ihuoma Igboanugo, Kingsley Igboanugo, Suru Iyesi, Merrill F. John, JOHN KALU, FESTO KYANDA, Jamilly Lake, ALICE MBUTHIA, Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes, Waldermara Martin, Christopher McCormick, EBERECHUKWU NWOBODO, EMEKA NWOKORO, Bose Ndukwe, Okoji Ndukwe, Hannah Ngugi, John Nkata, ANTHONIA A. OCHIJE, UCHECHUCKWU OKAM, UKACHI OKEHIE, EZINNE P. ONYEGBULE, Uduka Okoafor, Stanley Onyeabo, LISA PATTON, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Veronica Saccoh, Rafaela Serrano, Joseph Shikhman, Violet Smart, RUBY G. WALKER, Ngozi Wakama.(Burgos, Sandra)
December 2, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #35 Affidavit by Defendants Base Commerce, LLC, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-5302569. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Radow, Courtney)
December 1, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 1, 2014 Filing 37 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 24, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Scalfani, Deborah).
November 25, 2014 Filing 36 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel of Interim Lead Counsel and Steering Committee by Plaintiffs filed by Nmah Abbah, Esam Abdelgadir, Anthony Cellucci, Chinedu Chidebe, Todd Cook, Rita Dos Santos, Samuel Elekwachi, Maduako C Ferguson, Sr, Paulo Eduardo Ferrari, Jeremiah Githere, Felicia Guevara, LUCKY IMAFIDON, CHIMA IRECHUKWU, Ojebe Ifegwu, Bernadette Igboanugo, Ihuoma Igboanugo, Kingsley Igboanugo, Suru Iyesi, JOHN KALU, FESTO KYANDA, Jamilly Lake, ALICE MBUTHIA, Olavo Ferreira Magalhaes, Waldermara Martin, Christopher McCormick, EBERECHUKWU NWOBODO, EMEKA NWOKORO, Bose Ndukwe, Okoji Ndukwe, Hannah Ngugi, John Nkata, ANTHONIA A. OCHIJE, UCHECHUCKWU OKAM, UKACHI OKEHIE, EZINNE P. ONYEGBULE, Uduka Okoafor, Stanley Onyeabo, LISA PATTON, Gerivaldo Pacheco, Veronica Saccoh, Rafaela Serrano, Joseph Shikhman, Violet Smart, Leandro Valentim, RUBY G. WALKER, Ngozi Wakama. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bonsignore, Robert)
November 25, 2014 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Courtney R. Radow re Good Standing by Base Commerce, LLC, Global Payroll Gateway, Inc.. (Radow, Courtney)
November 24, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Carol E. Head (Head, Carol)
November 24, 2014 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Allied Wallet, Ltd., Gerald P. Nehra Attorney at Law, PLLC, PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Daniil Shoyfer, Synovus Bank, Synovus Financial Corporation, Katia B. Wanzeler. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 24, 2014 Filing 32 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting #13 Motion. (Castles, Martin)
November 24, 2014 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 11/24/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Court and counsel discuss status of case and procedural issues, Deficiencies and the need for corrections are placed on the record, Parties are working out a time table for the filing of answers to the amended complaint, Court discusses motion for appointment of lead counsel, Court orders parties to file proposed scheduling order deadlines within 3 weeks, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 12/15/2014 at 1:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Several) Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02566-TSH et al.(Castles, Martin)
November 24, 2014 Filing 30 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David E. Meadows. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 24, 2014 Filing 29 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Phyllis B. Sumner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 24, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #25 Notice of Appearance by Defendant International Payout Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-5292967. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Kaskel, Jonathan)
November 24, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #24 Notice of Appearance by Defendant International Payout Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-5292946. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Hill, William)