City of Worcester v. Purdue Pharma LP, et al.

Plaintiff: City of Worcester
Defendant: Actavis Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Collegium Pharmaceutical Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., John Kapoor, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Case Number: 4:2018cv11958
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court Amicus Brief filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Feiner, Gillian)
November 14, 2018 34 REPLY to Response to #27 MOTION to Stay [Filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and McKesson Corporation] filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Dunlap, Joshua)
November 14, 2018 33 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Reply; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
November 14, 2018 32 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
November 13, 2018 31 Letter/request (non-motion) from Judith S. Scolnick Indicating Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to Reply. (Scolnick, Judith)
November 8, 2018 30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay)(Dunlap, Joshua)
November 1, 2018 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Stay [Filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and McKesson Corporation] filed by City of Worcester. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A: Jacksonville Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit B: Transfer Order of 12/12/17, #4 Exhibit C: Transfer Order 2/2/18, #5 Exhibit D: Transfer Order 4/5/18, #6 Exhibit E: Transfer Order 6/6/18, #7 Exhibit F: Transfer Order 8/2/18, #8 Exhibit G: Transfer Order 10/3/18, #9 Exhibit H: Report & Recommendation, #10 Exhibit I: Protocol for State-Federal Coordination)(Scolnick, Judith)
October 24, 2018 28 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief)(Feiner, Gillian)
October 18, 2018 27 MOTION to Stay [Filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and McKesson Corporation] by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Dunlap in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A to Dunlap Dec. - Transfer Order I, #3 Exhibit B to Dunlap Dec. - CTO-57, #4 Exhibit C to Dunlap Dec. - Minute Entry, #5 Exhibit D to Dunlap Dec. - Order Granting Motions to Stay, #6 Exhibit E to Dunlap Dec. - Opinion and Order, #7 Exhibit F to Dunlap Dec. - Order, #8 Exhibit G to Dunlap Dec. - Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit H to Dunlap Dec. - Transfer Order II, #10 Exhibit I to Dunlap Dec. - Transfer Order III)(Dunlap, Joshua)
October 18, 2018 26 Opposition re #22 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Dunlap, Joshua)
October 12, 2018 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur P. Kreiger on behalf of City of Worcester (Kreiger, Arthur)
October 9, 2018 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Zaleski on behalf of City of Worcester (Zaleski, Christine)
October 5, 2018 23 STATE COURT Record. (Dunlap, Joshua)
October 4, 2018 22 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Worcester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Judith S. Scolnick, #2 Exhibit A: Final Transfer Orders, #3 Exhibit B: W.Va. Remand Order, #4 Exhibit C: Okla. Remand Order, #5 Exhibit D: CTO-57, #6 Exhibit E: Notice of Opposition to CTO-57, #7 Exhibit F: Notice of Hearing Session, #8 Exhibit G: Order Regarding Remands, #9 Exhibit H: Transcript of Teleconference, #10 Exhibit I: Order Vacating CTO, #11 Exhibit J: Order Vacating CTO, #12 Exhibit K: Order Vacating CTO, #13 Exhibit L: Order Vacating CTO, #14 Exhibit M: Orders Vacating CTOs)(Scolnick, Judith)
September 28, 2018 21 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. (Castles, Martin)
September 27, 2018 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Collegium Pharmaceutical Inc..(Stein, Callan)
September 27, 2018 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Callan G. Stein on behalf of Collegium Pharmaceutical Inc. (Stein, Callan)
September 25, 2018 18 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin)
September 25, 2018 17 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin)
September 25, 2018 16 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Castles, Martin)
September 24, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Knights on behalf of John Kapoor (Knights, Mark)
September 24, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Kelly on behalf of John Kapoor (Kelly, Brian)
September 24, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen on behalf of John Kapoor (Mullen, Kurt)
September 24, 2018 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Dunlap, Joshua)
September 24, 2018 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John Kapoor.(Mullen, Kurt)
September 21, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew O'Connor on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc (O'Connor, Andrew)
September 21, 2018 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc.. (O'Connor, Brien)
September 20, 2018 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc.(O'Connor, Brien)
September 18, 2018 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
September 17, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
September 17, 2018 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 9/17/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-11958. (Alba, Robert)
September 17, 2018 4 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 17, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation for City of Worcester.. (Dunlap, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Jones, Sherry).
September 17, 2018 2 DISREGARD FILED THE WRONG DOCUMENT. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Worcester identifying Other Affiliate Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation for City of Worcester.. (Dunlap, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Jones, Sherry).
September 17, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7321677 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal: Process Served on ABCD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal: Consent of J. Kapoor, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Dunlap, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2018 (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Worcester v. Purdue Pharma LP, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Andrew O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Andrew O'Connor
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Joshua D. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegium Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Callan G. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Mark T. Knights
Represented By: Brian T. Kelly
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Worcester
Represented By: Joshua D. Dunlap
Represented By: Christine Zaleski
Represented By: Arthur P. Kreiger
Represented By: Judith S. Scolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Gillian R. Feiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?