Noddin et al v. V&J, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael E Noddin and Linda H. Noddin
Defendant: V&J, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv12177
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(George, Wayne)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (George, Wayne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 10/22/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-12177. (Alba, Robert)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Danieli, Chris)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (George, Wayne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7372200 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noddin et al v. V&J, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V&J, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Noddin
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda H. Noddin
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?