Unibank for Savings v. 999 Private Jet, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Unibank for Savings
Defendant: Elina Sargsyan, Edgar Sargsyan and 999 Private Jet, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: SBK Holdings USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv40134
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. Case stayed pending appeal.(Castles, Martin)
June 15, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Heather B. Repicky (Repicky, Heather)
June 14, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Rossman on behalf of Unibank for Savings (Rossman, Gabriel)
June 14, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Magnuson on behalf of Unibank for Savings (Magnuson, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 60 USCA Case Number 21-1184 for #58 Notice of Appeal, filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 59 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #58 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
March 6, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #56 Order on Motion to Set Aside by SBK Holdings USA, Inc. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-8668208 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 3/26/2021. (Geragos, Mark)
February 4, 2021 Filing 57 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #41 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: ECF Nos. 55 and 56 (Paine, Matthew)
February 4, 2021 Filing 56 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered denying #49 Motion to Set Aside Order on Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER of USCA as to #41 Notice of Appeal filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. In view of the district court's order dated December 1, 2020, appellate proceedings are stayed for 45 days from the date of this order. See Com. of Puerto Rico v. SS Zoe Colocotroni, 601 F.2d 39, 42 & n.3 (1st Cir. 1979); Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1. If the district court decides that it would grant the Rule 60(b) motion or that the motion raises a substantial issue, the court should issue an indicative ruling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1.
December 2, 2020 Filing 54 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #41 Notice of Appeal Documents included: ECF No. 48 and 53 (Paine, Matthew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 53 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered Stating Reasons for Final and Separate Judgement re #48 USCA Order. (Castles, Martin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 52 DECLARATION re #51 Opposition to Motion of Heather B. Repicky by Unibank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Repicky, Heather)
November 25, 2020 Filing 51 Opposition re #49 MOTION to Set Aside ORDER ON PLAINTIFF UNIBANKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY filed by Unibank for Savings. (Repicky, Heather)
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather B. Repicky on behalf of Unibank for Savings (Repicky, Heather)
November 12, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Set Aside ORDER ON PLAINTIFF UNIBANKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST TO REOPEN DISCOVERY by SBK Holdings USA, Inc..(Geragos, Mark)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER of USCA as to #41 Notice of Appeal filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc. (Paine, Matthew)Plaintiff-intervenor/appellant SBK Holdings USA, Inc. has responded to this court's show-cause order questioning appellate jurisdiction. Appellant responds that the district court entered partial judgment on November 20, 2019 (D.E. 46), pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). We note, however, that the district court granted the parties' joint motion for entry of partial judgment under Rule 54(b) in an electronic order without elaboration. Consequently, we retain jurisdiction but remand to the district court for an express determination that "there is no just reason for delay" and a statement of reasons in support of the entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). The district court is requested to furnish its reasons within thirty days of the date of this order.
December 4, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Sally P. McDonald (McDonald, Sally)
November 20, 2019 Filing 46 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SEPARATE AND FINAL JUDGMENT against SBK Holdings USA, Inc.(Castles, Martin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 45 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Parties to file a proposed form of separate and final judgment. (Castles, Martin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) as to SBK Holdings USA, Inc. by Unibank for Savings.(Gibbons, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 43 USCA Case Number 19-1990 for #41 Notice of Appeal filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc.. (Paine, Matthew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 42 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #41 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEAL #40 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM by SBK Holdings USA, Inc. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-7904160 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 10/21/2019. (McDonald, Sally) (Modified on 10/2/2019 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Document Link) (Paine, Matthew).
September 12, 2019 Filing 40 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered granting #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 38 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 10, 2019, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 10/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2019 re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unibank for Savings, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Gibbons/Humphrey) (Castles, Martin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Humphrey on behalf of SBK Holdings USA, Inc. (Humphrey, Richard)
August 20, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 34 Reply to response to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply Brief) filed by Unibank for Savings. (Gibbons, Robert) Modified docket text on 6/17/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
May 30, 2019 Filing 33 Opposition re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement SBKs Statement of Material Facts in Support of its Opp to Ps MSJ, #2 Supplement SBKs Memo in Support of its Opp to Ps MSJ, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Dan McDyre filed October 10, 2018, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - FAA Aircraft Title Search Report dated March 17, 2017, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of Levon Termendzhyan filed September 26, 2018)(McDonald, Sally)
May 9, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Reall re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Unibank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Gibbons, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/9/2019) (Burgos, Sandra).
May 9, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unibank for Savings. (Gibbons, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 30 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unibank for Savings. (Gibbons, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Unibank for Savings.(Gibbons, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 28 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #27 Complaint Intervention by Unibank for Savings.(Gibbons, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion to Intervene. (Castles, Martin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 25 Withdrawal of motion: #20 Opposition to Motion filed by Unibank for Savings.. (Gibbons, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Filing 27 Intervention COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc..(Burgos, Sandra)
February 6, 2019 Filing 24 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of #19 Motion to Intervene filed by SBK Holdings USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Kupetz In Support of SBK Holdings USA, Inc.s Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Intervene, #2 Supplement Intervention Complaint for Relief)(McDonald, Sally) Modified on 2/7/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
January 31, 2019 Filing 23 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to File reply. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion to Intervene by SBK Holdings USA, Inc..(McDonald, Sally)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #20 Opposition to Motion . (Gibbons, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 Opposition re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Unibank for Savings. (Gibbons, Robert)
October 31, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by SBK Holdings USA, Inc..(McDonald, Sally)
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Castles, Martin)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Edgar Sargsyan, Elina Sargsyan (Castles, Martin)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Request for notice of default filed by Unibank for Savings and #15 Request for notice of default filed by Unibank for Savings. (Castles, Martin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 Request for notice of default by Unibank for Savings (Re: Elina Sargsyan). (Gibbons, Robert)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 Request for notice of default by Unibank for Savings (Re: Edgar Sargsyan). (Gibbons, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered GRANTING #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Unibank for Savings. (Castles, Martin)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered granting #2 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Unibank for Savings. (Castles, Martin)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2018 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Unibank for Savings, Case called, Counsel for plaintiff appears for motion hearing, No appearance for dfts, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Order to issue, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Gibbons) (Castles, Martin)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing time reset for 9/7/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Counsel shall serve a copy of this notice on the defendants.(Castles, Martin)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Unibank for Savings. Elina Sargsyan served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Unibank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Unibank for Savings. Edgar Sargsyan served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Unibank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Unibank for Savings. 999 Private Jet, LLC served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Unibank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Robert)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 999 Private Jet, LLC, Edgar Sargsyan, Elina Sargsyan. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Unibank for Savings. (Gibbons, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Unibank for Savings.(Gibbons, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7263985 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Unibank for Savings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Gibbons, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unibank for Savings v. 999 Private Jet, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unibank for Savings
Represented By: Robert B. Gibbons
Represented By: Eric P. Magnuson
Represented By: Heather B. Repicky
Represented By: Gabriel Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elina Sargsyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Sargsyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 999 Private Jet, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: SBK Holdings USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Richard S. Humphrey
Represented By: Sally P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?