Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Vincent Hemmeter, Inc. d/b/a Ralph's Rock Diner a/k/a Ralph's et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Paul Simon Music, Rice and Beans Music, 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Seasons Four Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Lovely Sorts of Death Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music, Lost Boys Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Galeneye Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., R and R Nomad Publishing Company, A Division of R & R Nomad Publishing Co. LLC and Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music
Defendant: Vincent Hemmeter, Inc. d/b/a Ralph's Rock Diner a/k/a Ralph's, Vincent P. Hemmeter and Vincent Hemmeter, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv40187
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vincent P. Hemmeter served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Strong, William)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vincent Hemmeter, Inc. served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Strong, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vincent P. Hemmeter, Vincent Hemmeter, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Galeneye Music, Lost Boys Music, Lovely Sorts of Death Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, A Division of R & R Nomad Publishing Co. LLC, Rice and Beans Music, Seasons Four Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music. (Strong, William)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Strong, William)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vincent Hemmeter, Inc. d/b/a Ralph's Rock Diner a/k/a Ralph's, Vincent P. Hemmeter Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7399601 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by 4U2asky Entertainment Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Evil Eye Music, Inc., Galeneye Music, Lost Boys Music, Lovely Sorts of Death Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Paul Simon Music, R and R Nomad Publishing Company, A Division of R & R Nomad Publishing Co. LLC, Rice and Beans Music, Seasons Four Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Strong, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Vincent Hemmeter, Inc. d/b/a Ralph's Rock Diner a/k/a Ralph's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rice and Beans Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4U2asky Entertainment Inc
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evil Eye Music, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seasons Four Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovely Sorts of Death Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lost Boys Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painted Desert Music Corporation
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. d/b/a EMI Longitude Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeneye Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R and R Nomad Publishing Company, A Division of R & R Nomad Publishing Co. LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Hemmeter, Inc. d/b/a Ralph's Rock Diner a/k/a Ralph's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent P. Hemmeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Hemmeter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?