Lloyd v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Lloyd
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc., Bateman Community Living, LLC and Elior, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv10757
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bateman Community Living, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Elior, Inc. for Bateman Community Living, LLC.. (Wilk, Ryan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elior, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TrustHouse Services Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Gourmet Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Gourmet Acquisition Holdings, Inc. for Elior, Inc... (Wilk, Ryan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Elior, Inc..(Wilk, Ryan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 STATE COURT Record. (Pinarchick, Cheryl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles Lloyd. (Rudolf, Benjamin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ryan J Wilk. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Elior, Inc. re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ryan J. Wilk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7665410 Refiling to Correct Typographical Errors in Original Document (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaka, Philip)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ryan J. Wilk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7665410 by Elior, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaka, Philip)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Elior, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanaka, Philip)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Nadreau, Joshua)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Nadreau, Joshua)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Elior, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Consent to Removal (Hanaka, Philip)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Compass Group USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Compass Group PLC for Compass Group USA, Inc... (Nadreau, Joshua)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl B. Pinarchick on behalf of Compass Group USA, Inc. (Pinarchick, Cheryl)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/19/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-10757. (Alba, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Compass Group USA, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7643794 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Nadreau, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D. Nadreau
Represented By: Cheryl B. Pinarchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bateman Community Living, LLC
Represented By: Ryan J Wilk
Represented By: Philip M. Hanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elior, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J Wilk
Represented By: Philip M. Hanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lloyd
Represented By: Benjamin C. Rudolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?