Brenna v. Nexus Business Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kim Brenna
Defendant: Nexus Business Solutions, LLC and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv40033
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Kim Brenna of Refusal to Consent to Magistrate Judge (Feldman, Mitchell)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due; General Motors LLC 6/7/2019; Nexus Business Solutions, LLC 6/7/2019. (Belpedio, Lisa)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Mediation. "The Court is disinclined to grant any additional extensions of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Defendants' responses to the complaint will be due Friday, June 7, 2019 if private mediation is not attended on or before May 31, 2019." (Belpedio, Lisa)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion for Stay Pending Mediation)(Butte, Shawn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Motors LLC answer due 4/1/2019. (DHH, law3)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nexus Business Solutions, LLC answer due 4/1/2019. (DHH, law3)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2019 to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed by Plaintiff) by General Motors LLC.(Mason, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent General Motors Company for General Motors LLC.. (Mason, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Mason on behalf of General Motors LLC (Mason, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to April 1, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butte, Shawn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn N. Butte on behalf of Nexus Business Solutions, LLC (Butte, Shawn)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mitchell Feldman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mitch Feldman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7548842 by Kim Brenna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Pontikes, Rebecca)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed General Motors LLC served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Pontikes, Rebecca)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nexus Business Solutions, LLC served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Pontikes, Rebecca)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC, Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC, Nexus Business Solutions, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7539570 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kim Brenna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Pontikes, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenna v. Nexus Business Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexus Business Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Shawn N. Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: David P. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Brenna
Represented By: Rebecca G. Pontikes
Represented By: Mitchell L. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?