Croteau et al v. Eastern Recovery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Croteau and Patricia Croteau
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corp. and Eastern Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv40051
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Castles, Martin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Korth, Sebastian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Credit Acceptance Corp..(Polansky, Kevin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Credit Acceptance Corp. answer due 7/8/2019. (Castles, Martin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 8, 2019 to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by Credit Acceptance Corp..(Kingston, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Credit Acceptance Corp. answer due 6/26/2019. (Castles, Martin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 26, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #6 Amended Complaint Second Assented To Motion for Extension of it Responsive Pleading Deadline by Credit Acceptance Corp..(Polansky, Kevin) Modified on 6/13/2019 (Castles, Martin).
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Credit Acceptance Corp. answer due 6/12/2019. (Castles, Martin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Acceptance Corp.. (Polansky, Kevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 12, 2019 to File its Responsive Pleading by Credit Acceptance Corp..(Polansky, Kevin) Modified on 6/10/2019 (Castles, Martin).
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kingston on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corp. (Kingston, Christine)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Polansky on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corp. (Polansky, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Credit Acceptance Corp. served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Korth, Sebastian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by James Croteau, Patricia Croteau. Eastern Recovery, Inc. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Acknowledgement filed by James Croteau; Patricia Croteau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Korth, Sebastian)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Croteau, Patricia Croteau.(Korth, Sebastian)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion to Amend complaint. Counsel shall now e-file the amended complaint in CM/ECF. (Castles, Martin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by James Croteau, Patricia Croteau. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Korth, Sebastian)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7629092 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by James Croteau, Patricia Croteau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Category Sheet)(Korth, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croteau et al v. Eastern Recovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corp.
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Croteau
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Croteau
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?