Rourke v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: James Rourke
Defendant: USAF and President Jimmy Carter
Case Number: 4:2019cv40052
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by James Rourke. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by James Rourke re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Sherry)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee/payment: $ 400, receipt number WOR001807 for #1 Complaint.(Burgos, Sandra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued at the counter as to Jimmy Carter, USAF (Jones, Sherry)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must, within 35 days, provide the Court with additional information concerning the claim he made with the USAF that was denied in or about August 2017. He shall provide a copy of the claim and the governments letter denying the claim. (Castles, Martin)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Rourke.(Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Rourke. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Burgos, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rourke v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Jimmy Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?