U.S. Security Associates, Inc. et al v. Parretti et al
Plaintiff: Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services, U.S. Security Associates, Inc. and Universal Protection Service, LLC
Defendant: Central Public Safety, LLC, John Parretti and Aury Maldonado
Case Number: 4:2019cv40100
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2019 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Parretti, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: McCart/Merrill/O'Leary) (Castles, Martin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Counterclaim by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC.(McCart, Wes)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCart, Wes)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Expedite hearing. (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Moccia on behalf of U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC (Moccia, Anthony)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Protection Service, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Partners Group Holding AG, Corporate Parent Allied Universal Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent Allied Universal Topco LLC, Corporate Parent Wendel SE, Corporate Parent Universal Protection Service, LP, Corporate Parent Universal Services of America, LP, Corporate Parent Universal Group Holdings LLC for Universal Protection Service, LLC.. (Bednar, Charlotte)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Security Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Security Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Partners Group Holding AG, Corporate Parent U.S. Security Associates Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent U.S. Security Associates Holdings II Corp., Corporate Parent U.S. Security Associates Holding Corp., Corporate Parent USAGM Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent Allied Universal Holdco LLC, Corporate Parent Allied Universal Topco LLC, Corporate Parent Wendel SE for U.S. Security Associates, Inc... (Bednar, Charlotte)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Injunction Motion by John Parretti.(Merrill, Jack)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Parretti. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Merrill, Jack)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack K. Merrill, Jr on behalf of John Parretti (Merrill, Jack)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 John Parretti's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Security Associates, Inc. by John Parretti.(Merrill, Jack)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Central Public Safety, LLC.(O'Leary, Kathryn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Central Public Safety, LLC answer due 9/6/2019. (Castles, Martin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Central Public Safety, LLC of Extension of time to respond to Complaint (O'Leary, Kathryn) Modified on 8/22/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn A. O'Leary on behalf of Central Public Safety, LLC (O'Leary, Kathryn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Wes R. McCart. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Wes R. McCart Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7827203 by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Bednar, Charlotte)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Wes R. McCart Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7827203 by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1DISREGARD, ATTACHED THE WRONG EXHIBIT, SEE ENTRY #5 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT. Exhibit A)(Bednar, Charlotte) Modified on 8/12/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
July 30, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 07/26/2019, receipt number 0101-7802710. (Tran, Henry)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Parretti, Central Public Safety, LLC, Aury Maldonado. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7802768 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Security Associates, Inc., Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Category Sheet)(Bednar, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Security Associates, Inc. et al v. Parretti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Public Safety, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn A. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Parretti
Represented By: Jack K. Merrill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aury Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal Security Services
Represented By: Charlotte L. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Charlotte L. Bednar
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Represented By: Wes R. McCart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Protection Service, LLC
Represented By: Charlotte L. Bednar
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Represented By: Wes R. McCart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?