del Rosario v Nashoba Regional School District, et al.
Plaintiff: BSEA, NRSD and Maria b. del Rosario
Defendant: Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Nashoba Regional School District
Case Number: 4:2019cv40107
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bureau of Special Education Appeals answer due 11/4/2019; Nashoba Regional School District answer due 11/4/2019. (Castles, Martin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 4, 2019 to File Responsive Pleadings with Plaintiff's Assent by Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Nashoba Regional School District.(Baker, Megan) Modified on 10/4/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K. Baker on behalf of Nashoba Regional School District (Baker, Megan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Maria B. del Rosario, Case called, Counsel appear for second motion hearing, Plaintiff calls James Kelly to testify, Direct/cross/redirect, Court hears limited arguments of counsel, Court inquires about possible mediation, Counsel to confer and inform the Clerk if they agree on referral to mediation, Court rules taking under advisement #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Burke/Ryan) (Castles, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing (Evidentiary) set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2019 to File a Response to the Second Inquiry of the Supplemental Information Request Required by the Court filed by Nashoba Regional School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Regina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 Response to the Second Inquiry of the Supplemental Information Request Required by the Court filed by Nashoba Regional School District. (Louison, Douglas) Modified on 9/17/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nashoba Regional School District answer due 10/4/2019. (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to September 20, 2019 to File a Response to the Second Inquiry of the Supplemental Information Request Required by the Court. (Castles, Martin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Maria b. del Rosario re #14 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burke, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 20, 2019 to File a Response to the Second Inquiry of the Supplemental Information Request Required by the Court by Nashoba Regional School District.(Ryan, Regina)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint by Nashoba Regional School District.(Ryan, Regina) Modified on 9/16/2019 (Castles, Martin).
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra F. Graskemper on behalf of Nashoba Regional School District (Graskemper, Alexandra)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bureau of Special Education Appeals answer due 10/4/2019. (Castles, Martin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. Notice of Supplemental Information Required by the Court.(Castles, Martin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10-04-2019 to File Answer by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Reynolds, Maryanne)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Maria b. del Rosario, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Burke/Ryan/Reynolds) (Castles, Martin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as to Count VI of Plaintiff's Verified Complaint filed by Nashoba Regional School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Louison, Douglas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryanne Reynolds on behalf of Bureau of Special Education Appeals (Reynolds, Maryanne)
September 2, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Service of Process filed by Maria b. del Rosario. Individual(s)/Entities served: NRSD, BSEA, OAG. (Burke, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina M. Ryan on behalf of Nashoba Regional School District (Ryan, Regina)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas I. Louison on behalf of Nashoba Regional School District (Louison, Douglas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 First MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Maria b. del Rosario. (Burke, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Maria b. del Rosario.(Burke, Brian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Nashoba Regional School District. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nashoba Regional School District and Bureau of Special Education Appeals. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7833125 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Maria b. del Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 case Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Burke, Brian) Modified on 8/16/2019 (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: del Rosario v Nashoba Regional School District, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NRSD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria b. del Rosario
Represented By: Brian P. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Special Education Appeals
Represented By: Maryanne Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashoba Regional School District
Represented By: Regina M. Ryan
Represented By: Megan K. Baker
Represented By: Douglas I. Louison
Represented By: Alexandra F. Graskemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?