Mall v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Daniel Mall
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv40118
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for More Definite Statement. No opposition having been filed. The petitioner shall provide a more definite statement by 11/22/19. Petitioner's letter request #13 is denied as moot as the Government has not moved to dismiss for insufficient service of process. (Castles, Martin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Letter regarding service from Daniel Mall. (He states in his letter see an attachment, no attachment submitted.)(Jones, Sherry)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by United States of America. (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement by United States of America.(Balakrishna, Annapurna)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of United States of America (Balakrishna, Annapurna)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) from Daniel Mall. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at FMC Devens. (Castles, Martin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Castles, Martin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel Mall. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Mall.(Burgos, Sandra)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Daniel Mall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burgos, Sandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #2 cover letter) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mall v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?