Scalia v. SVR GROUP LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: SAILAJA SETTY, SVR GROUP FOODS, INC., RAMANAIAH VAVILLA, SVR GROUP LLC and VR & VR GROUP INC. (collectively, d/b/a Mayuri Indian Cuisine)
Case Number: 4:2019cv40149
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. SAILAJA SETTY waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Glickman, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. RAMANAIAH VAVILLA waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Glickman, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. VR & VR GROUP INC. (collectively, d/b/a Mayuri Indian Cuisine) waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Glickman, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. SVR GROUP FOODS, INC. waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Glickman, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. SVR GROUP LLC waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Glickman, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pedulla on behalf of Eugene Scalia (Pedulla, Mark)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SAILAJA SETTY, SVR GROUP FOODS, INC., SVR GROUP LLC, RAMANAIAH VAVILLA, VR & VR GROUP INC. (collectively, d/b/a Mayuri Indian Cuisine). Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Employees, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Catagory Form, #4 Summons-SVR Group LLC, #5 Summons-SVR Group Foods Inc., #6 Summons-VR & VR Group Inc., #7 Summons-Ramanaiah Vavilla, #8 Summons-Sailaja Setty)(Glickman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. SVR GROUP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAILAJA SETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVR GROUP FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMANAIAH VAVILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVR GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VR & VR GROUP INC. (collectively, d/b/a Mayuri Indian Cuisine)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: James Glickman
Represented By: Mark A. Pedulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?