Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2019cv40159
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Teresa Rubinger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Teresa Rubinger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8070268 by Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feeney, Matthew)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Feeney, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thaddeus S. Kirk. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey M. Zielinski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thaddeus S. Kirk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8034501 by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Cohn, Jason)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey M. Zielinski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8034493 by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Cohn, Jason)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership.(Feeney, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Feeney on behalf of Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership (Feeney, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership. (Feeney, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8020975 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Feeney, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership
Represented By: Matthew L. Feeney
Represented By: Teresa M. Rubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason E. Cohn
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus S. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?