Penn-America Insurance Company v. Beshere Electric Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Penn-America Insurance Company
Defendant: Northern Energy Services, Inc., Beshere Electric Inc. and Thiado Machado
Case Number: 4:2020cv10749
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Penn-America Insurance Company. Beshere Electric Inc. waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Kober, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Penn-America Insurance Company. Thiado Machado waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Kober, Peter)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Penn-America Insurance Company. Northern Energy Services, Inc. waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Kober, Peter)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Conley on behalf of Thiado Machado (Conley, J.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Coakley on behalf of Penn-America Insurance Company (Coakley, John)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Beshere Electric Inc., Thiado Machado, Northern Energy Services, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Alba, Robert)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/17/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-10749. (Alba, Robert)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Kelly, Danielle)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Penn-America Insurance Company. (Kober, Peter) Modified on 4/21/2020 (Jones, Sherry).
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8200945 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Penn-America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #6 Attachment to Civil Action cover)(Kober, Peter) Modified on 4/16/2020: Corrected docket text to properly reflect filing against Defendants. (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn-America Insurance Company v. Beshere Electric Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beshere Electric Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thiado Machado
Represented By: J. Michael Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-America Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter C. Kober
Represented By: John P. Coakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?