United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al v. National Grid et al
Plaintiff: United Steelworkers of America, Local 12003 and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Defendant: National Grid and Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv11491
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Master Plan, #3 Exhibit Amendment No. 6, #4 Exhibit Summary Plan Description)(Collins, Patrick)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid. (Collins, Patrick)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid.(Collins, Patrick)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed National Grid served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(Gordon O'Connell, Alfred)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company answer due 9/29/2020; National Grid answer due 9/29/2020. (Castles, Martin)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid.(Collins, Patrick)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Gordon O'Connell, Alfred)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed National Grid served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Gordon O'Connell, Alfred)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Patrick M. Collins. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Reingold Mandel on behalf of Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid (Mandel, Rachel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Patrick M. Collins Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8384656 by Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mandel, Rachel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 8/7/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-11491. (Alba, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Weyland, Loren)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benefit Committee of National Grid USA Service Company, National Grid Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8364532 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, United Steelworkers of America, Local 12003. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Gordon O'Connell, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al v. National Grid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steelworkers of America, Local 12003
Represented By: Alfred Gordon O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
Represented By: Alfred Gordon O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Rachel Reingold Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefits Committee of National Grid USA Service Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Rachel Reingold Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?