Farrar v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jamie Farrar
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv11750
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh Dun Rappaport on behalf of Andrew Saul (Dun Rappaport, Hugh)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis J. George on behalf of Andrew Saul (George, Louis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Farrar. (Tracy, Patrick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Jamie Farrar. Andrew Saul served on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Tracy, Patrick)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 9/25/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-11750. (Alba, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester). (Baker, Casey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8434387 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jamie Farrar. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrar v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Louis J. George
Represented By: Hugh Dun Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Farrar
Represented By: Patrick K.B. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?