Burnham v. Evangelidas
Plaintiff: Arthur A Burnham
Defendant: Sherriff Lewis Evangelidas
Case Number: 4:2020cv40032
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered denying #10 Motion for release. (Castles, Martin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Enlargement on Personal Recognizance by Arthur A Burnham.(Burgos, Sandra)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to petition. (Castles, Martin)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/11/2020 to File Motion to Dismiss by Lewis Evangelidas.(Zalnasky, Jennifer)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer K. Zalnasky on behalf of Lewis Evangelidas (Zalnasky, Jennifer)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order.(Castles, Martin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Order mailed to Mr. Burnham.) (Jones, Sherry)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Arthur A Burnham. (Jones, Sherry)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur A Burnham.(Jones, Sherry)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Arthur A Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnham v. Evangelidas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherriff Lewis Evangelidas
Represented By: Jennifer K. Zalnasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur A Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?