Bourgeois et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BourgeoisWhite, LLP and Roy A. Bourgeois
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Joseph Hayes and Boston Hill Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv40051
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered withdrawing #17 Motion for Discovery. (Castles, Martin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Withdraw #17 First MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited Discovery. (Castles, Martin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 First MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited Discovery by Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP.(Duffy, James)
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Entry #16, counsel filed a motion and attached his brief, the brief should be filed as a separate entry, this is a reminder for future filings. (Jones, Sherry)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 First MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited Discovery filed by Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP. (Duffy, James)
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Discovery Limited Expedited Discovery by Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP.(Duffy, James)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Herman, Jonathan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Grossbaum on behalf of Joseph Hayes (Grossbaum, David)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa A. Aquino on behalf of Joseph Hayes (Aquino, Alyssa)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP. Joseph Hayes waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Duffy, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan Herman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Hasenkampf, Mitchell)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan M. Herman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8248599 by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Appendix)(Hasenkampf, Mitchell)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell P. Hasenkampf on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. (Hasenkampf, Mitchell)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Duffy, James)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt L. Binder on behalf of Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP (Binder, Kurt)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. White on behalf of Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP (White, Robert)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Entry #4, Attorney White filed an appearance for himself and Attorney Binder, this cannot be done, each attorney must log into cm/ecf using their own login and password and file their appearance. (Jones, Sherry)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. White on behalf of Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP (White, Robert)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Boston Hill Advisors, LLC, Joseph Hayes. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8230555 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Roy A. Bourgeois, BourgeoisWhite, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45)(Duffy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourgeois et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Herman
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hasenkampf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hayes
Represented By: David A. Grossbaum
Represented By: Alyssa A. Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Hill Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BourgeoisWhite, LLP
Represented By: James S. Duffy
Represented By: Robert S. White
Represented By: Kurt L. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A. Bourgeois
Represented By: James S. Duffy
Represented By: Robert S. White
Represented By: Kurt L. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?