Chaput v. Rolling Frito-Lay Sales
Plaintiff: David Chaput
Defendant: Rolling Frito-Lay Sales
Case Number: 4:2020cv40070
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record Rolling Frito-Lay Sales summons served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020.. (Han, Young)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rolling Frito-Lay Sales.(Han, Young)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Rolling Frito-Lay Sales. (Attachments: #1 Category Form)(Han, Young)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Civil Cover Sheet and a Local Category Form. The forms can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G Cohen on behalf of Rolling Frito-Lay Sales (Cohen, Adam)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Young B. Han on behalf of Rolling Frito-Lay Sales (Han, Young)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rolling Frito-Lay Sales. (Han, Young)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rolling Frito-Lay Sales ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8289632 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint & Summons, #2 Exhibit Corporate summary)(Cohen, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaput v. Rolling Frito-Lay Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling Frito-Lay Sales
Represented By: Adam G Cohen
Represented By: Young B. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chaput
Represented By: Thomas W. Beliveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?