Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. WizIQ, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Defendant: WizIQ, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv10694
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed WizIQ, Inc. served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Shortell, Brendan)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to WizIQ, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/27/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-10694. (Alba, Robert)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester). (Pacho, Arnold)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Shortell, Brendan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Shortell, Brendan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WizIQ, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8745144 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,856,221, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shortell, Brendan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/27/2021) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/27/2021 WITH Corrected Category Sheet) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 4/27/2021 (Finn, Mary).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. WizIQ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WizIQ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Brendan M. Shortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?