Paulino et al v. Bank of New York Mellon N.A.
Plaintiff: Altagracia Paulino and Miledy Paulino Peralta
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon N.A. and The Bank of New York
Case Number: 4:2022cv10261
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (Remote only) before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Castles, Martin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #17 Opposition to Motion by Bank of New York Mellon N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Seeley, Donald)
April 1, 2022 Filing 17 Opposition re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bank of New York Mellon N.A.. (Pisano, Vanessa)
March 18, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Altagracia Paulino, Miledy Paulino Peralta. (Russell, Glenn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Altagracia Paulino, Miledy Paulino Peralta.(Russell, Glenn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon N.A..(Pisano, Vanessa)
March 8, 2022 Filing 13 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 3/18/22. (Castles, Martin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Seeley, Donald)
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2022 to Respond to the Verified Complaint by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon N.A.. (Seeley, Donald)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2022 to Respond to the Verified Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon N.A..(Seeley, Donald) Modified on 3/8/2022 (Castles, Martin).
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Pisano, Vanessa)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn F Russell, Jr on behalf of Altagracia Paulino, Miledy Paulino Peralta (Russell, Glenn)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon N.A. (Seeley, Donald)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Alba, Robert)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 2/17/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-10261. (Alba, Robert)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of New York Mellon N.A., f/k/a The of Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-11 ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9189330 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Pisano, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulino et al v. Bank of New York Mellon N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon N.A.
Represented By: Vanessa V. Pisano
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Vanessa V. Pisano
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altagracia Paulino
Represented By: Glenn F Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miledy Paulino Peralta
Represented By: Glenn F Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?