Belozerov v. Gannett Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Serge Belozerov
Defendant: Gannett Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv10838
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Referring Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Jacob Steinberg on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc. (Steinberg, Blake)
June 24, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David Singh on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc. (Singh, David)
June 24, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Yohai on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc. (Yohai, David)
June 22, 2022 Filing 17 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 18, 2022 to File Answer re #1 Complaint , #1 Complaint Gannett Company, Inc. answer due 8/18/2022. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 16 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Blake J. Steinberg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David R. Singh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David L. Yohai. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 18, 2022 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Gannett Company, Inc..(O'Toole, Patrick)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gannett Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Gannett Company, Inc... (O'Toole, Patrick)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Blake J. Steinberg Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9376684 by Gannett Company, Inc..(O'Toole, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2022: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Blake J. Steinberg) (Warnock, Douglas). (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/21/2022 to separate exhibit from main document PDF) (Warnock, Douglas).
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David R. Singh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9376672 by Gannett Company, Inc..(O'Toole, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2022: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David R. Singh) (Warnock, Douglas). (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/21/2022 to separate exhibit from main document PDF) (Warnock, Douglas).
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David L. Yohai Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9376643 by Gannett Company, Inc..(O'Toole, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2022: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David L. Yohai) (Warnock, Douglas). (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/21/2022 to separate exhibit from main document PDF) (Warnock, Douglas).
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc. (O'Toole, Patrick)
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gannett Company, Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Jagher, Jonathan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Case redrawn according to Local Rule 40.1(i). District Judge Timothy S. Hillman no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gannett Company, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 6/2/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-10838. (Alba, Robert)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gannett Company, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9348185 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Serge Belozerov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Jagher, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belozerov v. Gannett Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serge Belozerov
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Singh
Represented By: David Yohai
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Toole, Jr.
Represented By: Blake Jacob Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?