Bridges v. Lafler
Petitioner: Arthur Bridges
Respondent: Blaine Lafler
Case Number: 1:2009cv11665
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Montcalm
Presiding Judge: Ludington
Presiding Judge: Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 46 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Arthur Bridges. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 44 Motion for Appellate Notice Extension. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Late Response; denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER granting 13 Motion for leave to file supplemental pleadings, withdrawing 14 Motion to stay habeas corpus petition, granting 15 Motion to withdraw stay request and for leave to file supplemental pleading, staying habeas corpus proceeding and administratively closing case. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (DPer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Lafler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Blaine Lafler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?