Axis Reinsurance Company v. GeoStar Corporation
Plaintiff: Axis Reinsurance Company
Defendant: Thom E Robinson, GeoStar Corporation, Tony P Ferguson, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., John W Parrott, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Spencer D Plummer, GeoStar Financial Corporation, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., ClassicStar Farms, LLC, First Source Wyoming, Inc., S David Plummer and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2009cv12608
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: Binder
Presiding Judge: Ludington
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Canceling Hearing re 77 MOTION for Order GeoStar Insureds' Expedited Motion regarding Advancement of Defense Costs and 80 Cross MOTION for Order Modifying the Relief Awarded by the Court on March 5, 2010. [May 18, 2010 motion hearing before District Judge Thomas Ludington canceled] Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Resolving Motions: granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss and allowing Axis until 3/24/2010 to amend its complaint; granting 45 Motion to Expedite; denying without prejudice 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axis Reinsurance Company v. GeoStar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thom E Robinson
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoStar Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony P Ferguson
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Parrott
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoStar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer D Plummer
Represented By: Lawrence W. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoStar Financial Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geostar Equine Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Source Wyoming, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Johnson - NOT SWORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S David Plummer
Represented By: Lawrence W. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axis Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?