United States of America v. Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #308, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #91, Currency $18,948.92 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX2593, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #110, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Savings Bonds from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #148, Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Currency $112,692.75 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX3413, 6 Boxes of Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Assorted Silver Bars Seized in May 2014 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X5635 Valued at $228,457.34, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #173, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #309, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X7984 Valued at $1,305,841.18, Currency $33,072.87 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX9169, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #102, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectibles from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #519, Currency $2,981, Currency $622,800.18 from Proceeds of Sale of Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Jewelry from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #149, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #307, Currency $328,975.22 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX7731, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #503, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X8161 Valued at $219,558.91, Currency $30,414.15 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX5381, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Collectible Currency from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #7062700003, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Metal Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377001664, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #310, Assorted Coin Collection and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #311 and Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377003256
Claimant: Jerome Awerbuch, Lisa Spearman, Eric Awerbuch, Adam Awerbuch, Danielle Geraditis, Howard Goldfaden, Amy Awerbuch and Gavin Ira Awerbuch
Case Number: 1:2015cv12124
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Saginaw
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Partial Stipulated Consent Judgment Withdrawing Claims and ORDER Dismissing Civil Forfeiture Case. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
January 22, 2019 Filing 53 STIPULATED Partial Consent Judgment as to the Defendant In Rem $622,800 in U.S. Currency from Seaver Title Agency LLC Check No. 58434, Representing Funds Seized on or About July 1, 2014, as Proceeds From the Sale of Real Property Located at 6550 Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED Forfeiture Restraining Order and Stipulated Interlocutory Sale Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
December 12, 2016 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT by United States of America (Ross, Philip)
August 8, 2016 Filing 50 Status REPORT by United States of America (Ross, Philip)
May 9, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE by United States of America Government's Status Report (Ross, Philip)
April 19, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Ross on behalf of United States of America. (Ross, Philip)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER Administratively Closing Civil Forfeiture Proceedings, Directing United States to File Status Updates, and Cancelling Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
January 25, 2016 Filing 46 STIPULATED PARTIAL CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
December 21, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE TO APPEAR: In Person Status Conference set for 2/11/2016 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
August 13, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorin G. Rubin on behalf of Adam Awerbuch, Amy Awerbuch, Eric Awerbuch. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 13, 2015 Filing 43 ERRATA Sheet re: #33 Claim,,,,,,,,,, filed by 6 Boxes of Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Assorted Silver Bars Seized in May 2014 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Currency $622,800.18 from Proceeds of Sale of Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #110, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X7984 Valued at $1,305,841.18, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X8161 Valued at $219,558.91, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectibles from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #519, Currency $2,981, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #309, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #308, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377003256, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Jewelry from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #149, Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Assorted Coin Collection and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #311, Currency $112,692.75 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX3413, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Collectible Currency from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #7062700003, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Metal Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377001664, Currency $18,948.92 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX2593, Currency $33,072.87 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX9169, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #503, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Savings Bonds from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #148, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #91, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #310, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #307, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X5635 Valued at $228,457.34, Currency $328,975.22 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX7731, Currency $30,414.15 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX5381, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #102, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #173. by Gavin Ira Awerbuch (Kriger, Mark)
August 13, 2015 Filing 42 ERRATA Sheet re: #34 Attorney Appearance filed by Gavin Ira Awerbuch. by Gavin Ira Awerbuch (Kriger, Mark)
August 10, 2015 Filing 41 CLAIM of Interest by Lisa Spearman. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 40 CLAIM of Interest by Danielle Geraditis. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 39 CLAIM of Interest by Howard Goldfaden. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 38 CLAIM of Interest by Eric Awerbuch. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 37 CLAIM of Interest by Adam Awerbuch. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 36 CLAIM of Interest by Jerome Awerbuch. (Rubin, Jorin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 35 CLAIM of Interest by Amy Awerbuch. (Rubin, Jorin)
July 31, 2015 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark J. Kriger appearing on behalf of Gavin Ira Awerbuch (Kriger, Mark)
July 31, 2015 Filing 33 CLAIM by 6 Boxes of Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Assorted Silver Bars Seized in May 2014 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #307, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #310, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Jewelry from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #149, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Savings Bonds from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #148, Assorted Coin Collection and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #311, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #308, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #309, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Collectible Currency from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #7062700003, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Metal Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377001664, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #102, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #110, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377003256, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #503, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #91, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #173, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectibles from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #519, Currency $112,692.75 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX3413, Currency $18,948.92 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX2593, Currency $2,981, Currency $30,414.15 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX5381, Currency $328,975.22 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX7731, Currency $33,072.87 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX9169, Currency $622,800.18 from Proceeds of Sale of Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X5635 Valued at $228,457.34, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X7984 Valued at $1,305,841.18, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X8161 Valued at $219,558.91, Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan. (Kriger, Mark)
July 22, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE by United States of America of Declaration of Publication (Grey, Jonathan)
June 16, 2015 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Grey, Jonathan)
June 11, 2015 Filing 30 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 29 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 28 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 27 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 26 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 25 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 24 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 23 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 22 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 21 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 20 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 19 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 18 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 17 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 16 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 15 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 14 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 13 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 12 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 11 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 9 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 7 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (DPer)
June 11, 2015 Filing 2 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge David M. Lawson* and *Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (SSch)
June 11, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against 6 Boxes of Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Assorted Silver Bars Seized in May 2014 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #307, Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #310, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Jewelry from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #149, Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Savings Bonds from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #148, Assorted Coin Collection and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #311, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #308, Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #309, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Collectible Currency from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #7062700003, Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Metal Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377001664, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #102, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #110, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377003256, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #503, Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #91, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #173, Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectibles from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #519, Currency $112,692.75 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX3413, Currency $18,948.92 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX2593, Currency $2,981, Currency $30,414.15 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX5381, Currency $328,975.22 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX7731, Currency $33,072.87 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX9169, Currency $622,800.18 from Proceeds of Sale of Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X5635 Valued at $228,457.34, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X7984 Valued at $1,305,841.18, Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X8161 Valued at $219,558.91, Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 11-mj-30216 and 14-cv-12045, Judge Duty Court criminal matter; Ludington for civil matter] (Grey, Jonathan)
June 11, 2015 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #308
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #91
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $18,948.92 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX2593
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #110
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Savings Bonds from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #148
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miscellaneous Collectible Coins and Medals Seized in January 2012 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $112,692.75 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX3413
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Boxes of Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Assorted Silver Bars Seized in May 2014 from Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X5635 Valued at $228,457.34
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #173
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #309
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X7984 Valued at $1,305,841.18
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $33,072.87 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX9169
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #102
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins, Assorted Collectible Currency and Other Miscellaneous Collectibles from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #519
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $2,981
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $622,800.18 from Proceeds of Sale of Real Property Located on Lakeshore Street, West Bloomfield, Michigan
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection and Miscellaneous Jewelry from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #149
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #307
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $328,975.22 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX7731
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #503
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Account No. XXX-X8161 Valued at $219,558.91
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $30,414.15 from Fifth Third Bank Account No. XXXXXX5381
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Collectible Currency from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #7062700003
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins and Assorted Metal Items from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377001664
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection and Assorted Collectible Currency from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #310
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Coin Collection and Other Miscellaneous Collectible Items from Fifth Third Bank Safe Deposit Box #311
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Collectible Coins from PNC Bank Safe Deposit Box #377003256
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jerome Awerbuch
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lisa Spearman
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eric Awerbuch
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adam Awerbuch
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Danielle Geraditis
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Howard Goldfaden
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amy Awerbuch
Represented By: Jorin G. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gavin Ira Awerbuch
Represented By: Mark J. Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip A. Ross
Represented By: Jonathan J.C. Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?