Robinson v. Genesee County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Antwaun Robinson
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriff's Department, Genesee County Sheriff's Officers, or Other Employees, Gerald Joseph Park, FNU Rainwater, FNU Hoover and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv13805
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Saginaw
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Patricia T. Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Denying 141 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 91 , 112 , 113 Motions for Summary Judgment, Denying 104 Motion to Preclude Testimony, and Denying 135 Motion to Reconsider Appointment of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Granting 116 Motion for Extension of Time. (Plaintiff's Response to 91 , 112 & 113 Motions for Summary Judgment due by 7/20/2018; Defendants' Replies due 1 Week After Response. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting in Part 57 Motion to Strike Portions of the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, Granting 43 , 52 Motions to Strike Amended Complaint in Part, Denying 46 , 50 Motions for Alternate Service, and Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint due by 6/16/2017.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 6 Motion for More Definite Statement, 14 Motion to Dismiss the Genesee County Sheriff's Department, 25 Motion to Extend Summons, and 29 Motion to Quash, and Denying 18 Motion to Substitute Party, 23 Motion to Vacate, and 26 Motion to File Amended Complaint and Dismissing Genesee County Sheriff's Department. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Genesee County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Antwaun Robinson
Represented By: Hugh M. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriff's Officers, or Other Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Joseph Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?