Maben v. Corizon Health Care et al
Plaintiff: James Maben
Defendant: Corizon Health Care, Badawi Abdellatiff, Hilda Mbidzo and Raul Tumada
Case Number: 1:2017cv11713
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Bay City Office
County: Lapeer
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Overruling 49 Objections, Adopting 46 Report and Recommendation, Granting 28 Motion to Dismiss, Denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief Without Prejudice, Denying Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Without Prejudice, and Dismissing 1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT TUMADA., ( Response due by 3/19/2018)--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 35 Motion to Strike; DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING without Prejudice Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 4 Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maben v. Corizon Health Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Maben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badawi Abdellatiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Mbidzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Tumada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?