American Automobile Association v. Patel et al

Plaintiff: American Automobile Association
Defendant: Narendra Patel, Rang Mahol Inc. and Hukam Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12266
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
1 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 7 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
September 11, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 9/25/2018 Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
August 6, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
July 27, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Ankers, Norman)
July 23, 2018 3 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Ankers, Norman)
July 23, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Norman C. Ankers. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
July 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 19, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Hukam Corp., Narendra Patel, Rang Mahol Inc.* (SKra)
July 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by American Automobile Association against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6824786 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Bay - County of 1st Defendant: Bay. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ankers, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Automobile Association v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Automobile Association
Represented By: Norman C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narendra Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rang Mahol Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hukam Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?