Beekman v. Wilkie et al
Plaintiff: Corey R Beekman
Defendant: Amber Blevons, Midland County Prosecutor's Office, Robert Wilkie, USAA Federal Savings Bank, NationStar Mortgage, Acres & Homes Realty Inc., Trott Law P.C., Midland County Sheriff's Office Jail Division, Schneiderman & Sherman P.C. and Midland County Clerk
Case Number: 1:2018cv12878
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Thomas L Ludington
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
3 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria L. Convertino on behalf of Amber Blevons, Midland County Clerk, Midland County Prosecutor's Office, Midland County Sheriff's Office Jail Division. (Convertino, Victoria)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by NationStar Mortgage, USAA Federal Savings Bank (Amended) (Edwards, Ian)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Requiring Response to #16 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 10/30/2018, Reply due by 11/13/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by NationStar Mortgage, USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Order Granting Motion for More Definite Statement) (Edwards, Ian)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by USAA Federal Savings Bank (Edwards, Ian)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NationStar Mortgage (Edwards, Ian)
October 10, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Corey R Beekman at 842 W. Chippewa River Road, Midland, MI 48640. (KCas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Schneiderman & Sherman P.C. (Jacobs, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Jacobs on behalf of Schneiderman & Sherman P.C.. (Jacobs, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trott Law P.C. (Kinggo, Robert)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kinggo, III on behalf of Trott Law P.C.. (Kinggo, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Kennedy Edwards on behalf of NationStar Mortgage, USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Edwards, Ian)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Response to #3 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 10/12/2018, Reply due by 10/26/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring All Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris and #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
September 26, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Corey R Beekman, 842 W. Chippewa River Rd., Midland, MI 48640. (KWin)
September 26, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Corey R Beekman at 842 W. Chippewa River Road, Midland, MI 48640. (KCas)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (SSch)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Notice of Appearance by NationStar Mortgage, USAA Federal Savings Bank Amended Certificate of Service (Chang, Jong-Ju)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jong-Ju Chang on behalf of NationStar Mortgage, USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Chang, Jong-Ju)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert Wilkie. (Carty, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Brege on behalf of Amber Blevons, Midland County Clerk, Midland County Prosecutor's Office, Midland County Sheriff's Office Jail Division. (Brege, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Wilkie from 75th Judicial District, case number 18-03609-GC. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Pleadings) (Carty, James)
September 14, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beekman v. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Blevons
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland County Prosecutor's Office
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Represented By: James J. Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Ian Kennedy Edwards
Represented By: Jong-Ju Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NationStar Mortgage
Represented By: Ian Kennedy Edwards
Represented By: Jong-Ju Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acres & Homes Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott Law P.C.
Represented By: Robert J. Kinggo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland County Sheriff's Office Jail Division
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneiderman & Sherman P.C.
Represented By: Steven A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland County Clerk
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Represented By: Victoria L. Convertino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey R Beekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?