Farmer v. Hunter

Plaintiff: Willie E. Farmer
Defendant: Jeffrey Hunter and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv13189
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
1 Judge: Thomas L Ludington
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
3 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order Vacating an Order to Show Cause, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #9 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Willie E. Farmer at 2105 Maple Street, Saginaw, MI 48602. (KCas)
November 9, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 11/30/2018, Reply due by 12/14/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
November 9, 2018 8 Featured Case Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause, filed by Jeffrey Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
November 9, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Willie E. Farmer, 2105 Maple St., Saginaw, MI. (KWin)
November 9, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER Referring All Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris With #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 8, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DIVISION. CASE REASSIGNED from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (SSch)
October 31, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by United States of America. (Carty, James)
October 19, 2018 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #3 by United States of America. (Carty, James) Modified on 10/19/2018 (EKar).
October 17, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER for Jeffrey Hunter to Show Cause whether the case should have been removed to the Northern Division pursuant to Local Rule 83.10. Show Cause Response, in writing, due by 10/24/2018 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 16, 2018 2 NOTICE by Jeffrey Hunter of Substitution (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Carty, James)
October 15, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffrey Hunter from Michigan 70th District Court for the County of Saginaw, case number 18-003993-GC. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Scope of Employment, #2 Exhibit B State Court Documents) (Carty, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hunter
Represented By: James J. Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James J. Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie E. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?