Robinson v. Speedway LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Robinson
Defendant: Speedway LLC and Marathon Petroleum Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv13355
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/18/2019; Settlement Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/18/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 11/19/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Giroux, Erika)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders due by 12/17/2018.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Why Case Should Not Be Remanded by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Medical Records, #3 Exhibit B - Halsey v AGCO Corp, #4 Exhibit C - Bass v IKEA US East, #5 Exhibit D - Rhynard v State Farm) (Galecki, Samantha)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Removal filed by John Robinson. (Toth, James)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Show Cause as to Why Case Should Not be Remanded. Written Show Cause Response due by 11/27/2018. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Speedway LLC. (Galecki, Samantha)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal of Marathon Petroleum Company LP Formerly Known as Marathon Petroleum Company LLC. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika L. Giroux on behalf of Speedway LLC. (Giroux, Erika)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy M. Johnston on behalf of Speedway LLC. (Johnston, Amy)
October 26, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC for Speedway LLC. (Galecki, Samantha)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Saginaw County Circuit Court, case number 18-036812-NO. Receipt No: 0645-6964430 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Voter Registration, #4 Exhibit C - Delaware Corporate Detail, #5 Exhibit D - Delaware Corporate Registry, #6 Exhibit E - Jury Verdict Research) (Galecki, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Speedway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robinson
Represented By: James C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Samantha S. Galecki
Represented By: Erika L. Giroux
Represented By: Amy M. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LLC
Represented By: Samantha S. Galecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?