Graminex, L. L. C. v. AB Cernelle

Plaintiff: Graminex, L. L. C.
Defendant: AB Cernelle
Case Number: 1:2018cv13727
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 3:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman to District Judge David M. Lawson. (NAhm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Graminex, L. L. C. re #5 Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Counsel's Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order Dismissing Case, #2 Exhibit B Transcript of Hearing) (Petitjean, David)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for David Lee Petitjean to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 12/10/2018. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Petitjean, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Graminex, L. L. C. (Petitjean, David)
November 30, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *AB Cernelle* (DWor)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Graminex, L. L. C. against AB Cernelle. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7009736 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: Sweden. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Counsel Correspondence dated 09/08/2017, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Counsel Correspondence dated 10/17/2017, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Counsel Correspondence dated 07/19/2018) (Petitjean, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graminex, L. L. C. v. AB Cernelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graminex, L. L. C.
Represented By: David Lee Petitjean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB Cernelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?