T.R. et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: T. R. and Raeven Grissom
Defendant: United States of America and Covenant Medical Center, Inc. A Michigan Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv11104
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Boegehold, Mark)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Culaj, Ardiana)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Culaj, Ardiana)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Petition for Appointment of Next Friend. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
April 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SOso)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America* (SOso)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Covenant Medical Center, Inc. A Michigan Corporation* (SOso)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Appointment of Next Friend by All Plaintiffs. (Culaj, Ardiana)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7200017 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: Saginaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Culaj, Ardiana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.R. et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. R.
Represented By: Ardiana Culaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeven Grissom
Represented By: Ardiana Culaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Medical Center, Inc. A Michigan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?