County of Cheboygan v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Cheboygan
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International PLC, SpecGx LLC, Noramco, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11769
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: Thomas L Ludington
3 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45636, filed 07/22/2019. (VLun)
July 10, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (SSch)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for MDL 2804 (SSch)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-101) to Northern District of Ohio for MDL # 2804. (SSch)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-101) for MDL # 2804. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.* (SKra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Bernard A. Friedman* and *Magistrate Judge David R. Grand* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (SSch)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.* (SKra)
June 14, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of County of Cheboygan. (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, by County of Cheboygan (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 91-In the Matter of Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.,, #3 Exhibit 92-Case Challenges in Pain Management, #4 Exhibit 93-Understanding Your Pain, #5 Exhibit 94-Resources for Education on Pain and Its Management, #6 Exhibit 95-AboutPainKnowledge.org, #7 Exhibit 96-Iraq War Veteran Amputee, Pain Advocate, #8 Exhibit 97-Press Release, U.S. Food & Drug Administration, #9 Exhibit 98-Narcotic Lollipop Becomes Big Seller, #10 Exhibit 99-Cephalon, Inc., #11 Exhibit 100-NDA 20 747 Letter from Cynthia McCormick, #12 Exhibit 101-Cephalon, Inc. Annual Report, #13 Exhibit 102-Press Release, U.S. Department of Justice, #14 Exhibit 103-Cephalon Used Improper Tactics, #15 Exhibit 104-Seeking Alpha, Transcript of Q1 2007 Cephalon, #16 Exhibit 105-Press Release, U.S. Food & Drug Administration, #17 Exhibit 106-Joint Meeting of Anesthetic and Life Support Drugs and Drug Safety, #18 Exhibit 107-An Integrated Risk Evaluation and Mitigation, #19 Exhibit 108-Pharmacologic Management of Breakthrough or Incident Pain, #20 Exhibit 109-Breakthrough Pain: Treatment Rationale With Opioids, #21 Exhibit 110-Oral Transmucosal Fentanyl Citrate, #22 Exhibit 111-Optimizing Opioid Treatment, #23 Exhibit 112-Opioid-Based Management, #24 Exhibit 113-The pain killer: A drug company putting profits above patients, #25 Exhibit 114-In the Matter of Insys Therapeutics, Inc, #26 Exhibit 115-Doubts Raised About Off-Label Use of Subsys, #27 Exhibit 116-Press Release, U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Massachusetts,, #28 Exhibit 117-United States v. Babich, et al., #29 Exhibit 118-Opioid Billionaire Arrested, #30 Exhibit 119-Mallinckrodt Announces Agreement with Xanodyne, #31 Exhibit 120-Pain Treatment Topics, #32 Exhibit 121-Oxycodone Safety Handout for Patients, #33 Exhibit 122-FAQs, Pain-Topics.org, #34 Exhibit 123-Commonsense Oxycodone Prescribing & Safety, #35 Exhibit 124-Donald Trumps Pick, #36 Exhibit 125-The governments struggle, #37 Exhibit 126-HDAs Annual Circle Sponsors, #38 Exhibit 127-Opioid epidemic: ex-DEA official says Congress is protecting drug makers, #39 Exhibit 128-Red Flags: Pharmacists Anti-Abuse Video, #40 Exhibit 129-Mallinckrodt to Pay $35M in Deal, #41 Exhibit 130-Press Release, U.S. Department of Justice, #42 Exhibit 131-Whistleblowers: DEA Attorneys Went Easy on McKesson, #43 Exhibit 132-Press Release, U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Maryland, #44 Exhibit 133-AmerisourceBergen, Wikipedia, #45 Exhibit 134-Drug Distribution Locations Mainland US, #46 Exhibit 135-Drug Firms Poured 780M Painkillers into WV) (Miller, E.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, by County of Cheboygan (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 61-Two Leaders in Pain Treatment, #3 Exhibit 62-Doctor: 1,500 pills dont prove Smith was addicted, #4 Exhibit 63-Follow the Money, #5 Exhibit 64-May 8, 2012 Letter, #6 Exhibit 65-Senators Hatch and Wyden, #7 Exhibit 66-Senator McCaskill opens investigation, #8 Exhibit 67-How big pharma got people hooked, #9 Exhibit 68-The Promotion and Marketing of OxyContin, #10 Exhibit 69-Opioid Painkiller Prescribing,, #11 Exhibit 70-OxyContin: Purdue Pharmas painful medicine, #12 Exhibit 71-Health Q&A, #13 Exhibit 72-Dilaudid Addiction, #14 Exhibit 73-OxyContins 12-Hour Problem, #15 Exhibit 74-Press Release, Purdue Pharma L.P, #16 Exhibit 75-In Guilty Plea, OxyContin Maker, #17 Exhibit 76-More than 1 million OxyContin pills, #18 Exhibit 77-Purdue Pharma agrees to restrict marketing of opioids, #19 Exhibit 78-Safe and Effective Opioid Rotation, #20 Exhibit 79-American Pain Foundation Partner Report, #21 Exhibit 80-Press Release, U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Virginia, #22 Exhibit 81-NDA 19-813 Letter from Spencer Salis, #23 Exhibit 82-Warning Letter from Thomas W. Abrams, #24 Exhibit 83-Finding Relief, Pain Management for Older Adults, #25 Exhibit 84-Legal Notice, #26 Exhibit 85-Use of Opioid Analgesics in Pain Management, #27 Exhibit 86-What a Prescriber Should Know, #28 Exhibit 87-Opana gets FDA approval, #29 Exhibit 88-How A Painkiller Designed To Deter Abuse, #30 Exhibit 89-Outbreak of Recent HIV and HCV Infections, #31 Exhibit 90-Press Release, Attorney General Eric T. Schneiderman) (Miller, E.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, by County of Cheboygan (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 31-A 5-sentence letter, #3 Exhibit 32-The Presidents Commission on Combating Drug Addiction, #4 Exhibit 33-Who Is Responsible for the Pain-Pill Epidemic, #5 Exhibit 34-Opioids for Chronic Pain, #6 Exhibit 35-AAPM Facts and Figures on Pain, #7 Exhibit 36-A Pain-Drug Champion Has Second Thoughts, #8 Exhibit 37-June 8, 2012 Letter, #9 Exhibit 38-Pain: Current Understanding, #10 Exhibit 39-U.S. General Accounting Office, #11 Exhibit 40-American Pain Foundation Shuts Down, #12 Exhibit 41-A Guide for People Living with Pain, #13 Exhibit 42-Episode 1: Safe Use of Opioids, #14 Exhibit 43-Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality, #15 Exhibit 44-Reducing the Risks of Relief, #16 Exhibit 45-Opioid Abuse in Chronic Pain, #17 Exhibit 46-Pain: Opioid Facts, #18 Exhibit 47-A Policymakers Guide to Understanding Pain & Its Management, #19 Exhibit 48-Opioids for chronic noncancer pain, #20 Exhibit 49-Patient advocacy group, #21 Exhibit 50-Clinical Guidelines, #22 Exhibit 51-About AfPA, #23 Exhibit 52-Non-profit Alliance for Patient Access, #24 Exhibit 53-FBI seizes records, #25 Exhibit 54-Prescription Pain Medication, #26 Exhibit 55-Letter from Alliance for Patient Access, #27 Exhibit 56-Ex-DEA Agent: Opioid Crisis Fueled by Drug Industry, #28 Exhibit 57-Current Navigation Points in Drug Diversion Law:, #29 Exhibit 58-Even amid crisis, opioid makers plied doctors with perks, #30 Exhibit 59-The Speakers bureau system, #31 Exhibit 60-Best Practices for Academic Medical Centers) (Miller, E.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by County of Cheboygan against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7283264 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cheboygan County - County Where Action Arose: Cheboygan County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Press Release Office of Governor Rick Snyder, #3 Exhibit 2-Michigan Prescription Drug and Opioid Abuse Commission, #4 Exhibit 3-Overdose Death Rates, #5 Exhibit 4-Vietnam War U.S. Military Fatal Casualty Statistics, #6 Exhibit 5-Increases in Drug and Opioid-Involved Overdose Deaths, #7 Exhibit 6-Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, #8 Exhibit 7-Prescription Opioid Overdose Data, #9 Exhibit 8-Heroin use and heroin use risk behaviors, #10 Exhibit 9-Drug Dealer, MD, #11 Exhibit 10-Purdue Pharma: Corporate Fraud, #12 Exhibit 11-CDC releases grim new opioid overdose figures, #13 Exhibit 12-Inside a Killer Drug Epidemic, #14 Exhibit 13-Drug overdoses now kill more Americans than guns, #15 Exhibit 14-The Family that Built an Empire Of Pain, #16 Exhibit 15-Press Release, U.S. Department of Justice, #17 Exhibit 16-How the opioid epidemic became Americas worst drug crisis ever, #18 Exhibit 17-2017 Individual Drug Utilization Report, #19 Exhibit 18-U.S. County Prescribing Rates, #20 Exhibit 19-Quarter of Michigan counties see rise in opioids, #21 Exhibit 20-High School: Oxycontin, Codeine, Vicodin or Percocet Use, #22 Exhibit 21-Michigan County Prosecutors Prescription Drug and Heroin Abuse Survey, #23 Exhibit 22-Northern Michigan not spared by opiate crisis, #24 Exhibit 23-OxyContin goes global, #25 Exhibit 24-Fueling an Epidemic, #26 Exhibit 25-Systematic Review: Opioid Treatment, #27 Exhibit 26-The risk of a single 5-day opioid prescription, #28 Exhibit 27-Opioid Painkiller Prescribing infographic, #29 Exhibit 28-The Prescription Opioid and Heroin Crisis, #30 Exhibit 29-Drug Distributors Penalized, #31 Exhibit 30-Letter may have launched the opioid epidemic) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Cheboygan v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Cheboygan
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?