United States of America v. Currency $1,179,824.97 from Account No. XXXXXX0860 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency $1,179,824.97 from Account No. XXXXXX0860 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company, Currency $152,952.87 from Account No. XXXX6317 in the name of Vasso Godiali at American Funds Service Company, Currency $2,686,733.01 from Account No. XXXX-0371 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Robert W. Baird and Company, Milwaukee, WI, Currency $23,206.24 from Account No. XXXXXXXX9180 in the name of Anna Godiali ITF Vasso Godiali at Huntington National Bank, Currency $4,379,673.12 from Account No. XX-XXX7139 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Currency $1,482,724.89 from Account No. XXXXX5882 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Nationwide Insurance Company, Currency $157,575.92 from Account No. XXXX8656 in the name of Vasso Godiali at American Funds Service Company, Currency $32,714.85 from Account No. XXXXXX4747 in the name of Vasso and Anna Godiali at Huntington National Bank, Currency $1,281,668.22 from Account No. XXXXX2482 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Nationwide Insurance Company, Currency $6,362.31 from Account No. XXXXX1501 in the name of Bay City Vascular at Thumb National Bank and Trust, Currency $147,033.13 from Account No. XXXX6219 in the name of Vasso Godiali at American Funds Service Company, Currency $990,298.28 from Account No. XX-XX6249 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Currency $1,062,477.31 from Account No. XXXXX5632 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Sorrento Pacific Life LLC, Currency $926,665.26 from Account No. XXXXXX0266 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company, Currency $484,984.09 from Account No. XXXXX1974 in the name of Vasso and Anna Godiali at Thumb National Bank and Trust, Currency $1,847,654.02 from Account No. XXXXXX0270 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company, Currency $2,516,193.21 from Account No. XXXXXX0403 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company, Currency $160,855.76 from Account No. XXXXX4062 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Western and Southern Financial Group, Currency $1,794,488.25 from Account No. XX-XXX7770 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Currency $1,066,876.89 from Account No. XXXXX3374 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Western and Southern Financial Group, Currency $7,818,116 from Account No. XXXXX9982 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Nationwide Insurance Company, Currency $3,373,472.59 from Account No. XXXXX0385 in the name of Vasso and Anna Godiali at Thumb National Bank and Trust and Currency $4,902,789.97 from Account No. XXXXXX3135 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Claimant: Vasso Godiali and Anna Godiali
Case Number: 1:2019cv12056
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Thomas L Ludington
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
3 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 30 CLAIM by Vasso Godiali. (Borgula, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Borgula on behalf of Vasso Godiali. (Borgula, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Ross, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 CLAIM by Anna Godiali. (Gezon, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Gezon on behalf of Anna Godiali. (Gezon, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (NAhm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $157,575.92 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $4,902,789.97 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $7,818,116 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $6,362.31 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $23,206.24 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $32,714.85 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $147,033.13 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $152,952.87 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $160,855.76 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $484,984.09 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $926,665.26 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $990,298.28 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $4,379,673.12 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $3,373,472.59 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $2,686,733.01 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $2,516,193.21 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,847,654.02 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,794,488.25 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,482,724.89 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,281,668.22 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,179,824.97 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,066,876.89 (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued re: Currency $1,062,477.31 (SSch)
July 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture filed by United States of America against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Bay - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court Eastern District, 19-20431, Judge Thomas L. Ludington] (Ross, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency $1,179,824.97 from Account No. XXXXXX0860 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,179,824.97 from Account No. XXXXXX0860 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $152,952.87 from Account No. XXXX6317 in the name of Vasso Godiali at American Funds Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $2,686,733.01 from Account No. XXXX-0371 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Robert W. Baird and Company, Milwaukee, WI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $23,206.24 from Account No. XXXXXXXX9180 in the name of Anna Godiali ITF Vasso Godiali at Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $4,379,673.12 from Account No. XX-XXX7139 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,482,724.89 from Account No. XXXXX5882 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Nationwide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $157,575.92 from Account No. XXXX8656 in the name of Vasso Godiali at American Funds Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $32,714.85 from Account No. XXXXXX4747 in the name of Vasso and Anna Godiali at Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,281,668.22 from Account No. XXXXX2482 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Nationwide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $6,362.31 from Account No. XXXXX1501 in the name of Bay City Vascular at Thumb National Bank and Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $147,033.13 from Account No. XXXX6219 in the name of Vasso Godiali at American Funds Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $990,298.28 from Account No. XX-XX6249 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,062,477.31 from Account No. XXXXX5632 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Sorrento Pacific Life LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $926,665.26 from Account No. XXXXXX0266 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $484,984.09 from Account No. XXXXX1974 in the name of Vasso and Anna Godiali at Thumb National Bank and Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,847,654.02 from Account No. XXXXXX0270 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $2,516,193.21 from Account No. XXXXXX0403 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Pacific Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $160,855.76 from Account No. XXXXX4062 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Western and Southern Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,794,488.25 from Account No. XX-XXX7770 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,066,876.89 from Account No. XXXXX3374 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Western and Southern Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $7,818,116 from Account No. XXXXX9982 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Nationwide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $3,373,472.59 from Account No. XXXXX0385 in the name of Vasso and Anna Godiali at Thumb National Bank and Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $4,902,789.97 from Account No. XXXXXX3135 in the name of Safe Investments, LLP at Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Vasso Godiali
Represented By: Matthew G. Borgula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anna Godiali
Represented By: Thomas J. Gezon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?