Newell v. Northwood University
Plaintiff: Jennifer Newell
Defendant: Northwood University
Case Number: 1:2019cv12087
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case Management and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/11/2020; Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/13/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington; Jury Trial set for 8/11/2020 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Refer to image for additional dates) (KWin)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Short Statements Submitted to CM/Utilities/Proposed Orders due by 9/9/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Northwood University (Waslawski, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Kelly appearing on behalf of Jennifer Newell (Kelly, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Northwood University. (Waslawski, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. (Response due by 8/23/2019.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Northwood University served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Mastromarco, Victor)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Waslawski on behalf of Northwood University. (Waslawski, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marlo J. Roebuck on behalf of Northwood University. (Roebuck, Marlo)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Northwood University* (LGra)
July 18, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7323290 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland - County Where Action Arose: Midland - County of 1st Defendant: Midland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Mastromarco, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. Northwood University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Newell
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwood University
Represented By: Marlo J. Roebuck
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?