MRP Properties Company, LLC v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: MRP Properties Company, LLC
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Doe Defendants 1 to 20 and 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv12149
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ludington
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:19-cv-02196, filed 08/06/2019. (VLun)
August 6, 2019 Case transferred to DIstrict of South Carolina. (SSch)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Transfer to the District of South Carolina for MDL 2873. (SSch)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) to District of South Carolina for MDL # 2873. (SSch)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) for MDL # 2873. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Ferroli on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC. (Ferroli, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John David Black appearing on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC (Black, John)
July 23, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Gratiot County Circuit Court, case number 2019-0321-NP. Receipt No: 0645-7333595 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the District of South Carolina Charleston Division, 2:18-mm-2873-RMG, Judge Richard Mark Gergel] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Infante, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRP Properties Company, LLC v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Joseph Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRP Properties Company, LLC
Represented By: Fred J. Fresard
Represented By: John David Black
Represented By: John A. Ferroli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?