Farm Bureau General Insurance of Michigan, as subrogee of Roxanne Bradfield v. Magic Chef, Inc.
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau General Insurance of Michigan, as subrogee of Roxanne Bradfield
Defendant: WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc. and Magic Chef, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv12942
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
2 Judge: Thomas L Ludington
3 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Magic Chef, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc.. (Gorcyca, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Bernard A. Friedman* and *Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (SSch)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc. (Pellegrino, Brandon)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc. (Gorcyca, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M. Pellegrino on behalf of WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc.. (Pellegrino, Brandon)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Gorcyca on behalf of WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc.. (Gorcyca, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc. from Midland County Circuit Court, case number 19-6486-NP. Receipt No: 0645-7436357 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Gorcyca, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau General Insurance of Michigan, as subrogee of Roxanne Bradfield v. Magic Chef, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WiniaDaewoo Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon M. Pellegrino
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Gorcyca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Chef, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau General Insurance of Michigan, as subrogee of Roxanne Bradfield
Represented By: Andrew J. VanBronkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?